Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2813401 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

CN201380001671 EP13747097



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US9358952Global Dossier 07.06.2016B2
US2014145021 29.05.2014A1
Priority number Date
JP2012027504 10.02.2012
WO2013JP52757 06.02.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
KR101711509BGlobal Dossier 02.03.2017B1
KR20140124745 27.10.2014A
Priority number Date
JP2012027504 10.02.2012
WO2013JP52757 06.02.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN103608218BGlobal Dossier 05.04.2017B
CN103608218 26.02.2014A
Priority number Date
JP2012027504 10.02.2012
WO2013JP52757 06.02.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2813401Global Dossier 06.09.2017B1
EP2813401 21.10.2015A4
EP2813401 17.12.2014A1
Priority number Date
JP2012027504 10.02.2012
WO2013JP52757 06.02.2013
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2013118780Global Dossier 15.08.2013A1
Priority number Date
JP2012027504 10.02.2012
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
JP5734889BGlobal Dossier 17.06.2015B2
JP2013163443 22.08.2013A
Priority number Date
JP2012027504 10.02.2012