Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2813090

EP2813090 - CONTROL METHOD AND APPARATUS OF ELECTRONIC DEVICE USING CONTROL DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  15.06.2018
Database last updated on 21.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip26.08.2019New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.
129, Samsung-ro
Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 443-742 / KR
[2014/51]
Inventor(s)01 / KIM, Jae-Won
131-1805
363 Hyowon-ro
Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 443-751 / KR
02 / KIM, So-Young
401
58 Jayang-ro 3-gil
Gwangjin-gu
Seoul 143-873 / KR
03 / LEE, Woo-Hyoung
114-1601
2 Yeonwon-ro 42beon-gil
Giheung-gu
Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do 446-938 / KR
 [2014/51]
Representative(s)HGF Limited
Saviour House
9 St. Saviourgate
York YO1 8NQ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2014/51]Jenkins, Richard Gavin
HGF Limited
Saviour House
9 St Saviourgate
York YO1 8NQ / GB
Application number, filing date13747296.524.01.2013
WO2013KR00551
Priority number, dateKR2012001356210.02.2012         Original published format: KR 20120013562
[2014/51]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013118987
Date:15.08.2013
Language:EN
[2013/33]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2813090
Date:17.12.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.08.2013
[2014/51]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR15.08.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.11.2015
ClassificationInternational:H04Q9/00, G06F3/033, H04N5/44, H04N21/422, H04N21/485, G06F3/0481
[2015/34]
Former International [2014/51]H04Q9/00, G06F3/033
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/51]
TitleGerman:STEUERVERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG EINER ELEKTRONISCHER VORRICHTUNG UNTER VERWENDUNG EINER STEUERVORRICHTUNG[2014/51]
English:CONTROL METHOD AND APPARATUS OF ELECTRONIC DEVICE USING CONTROL DEVICE[2014/51]
French:PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE COMMANDE DE DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRONIQUE UTILISANT UN DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE[2014/51]
Entry into regional phase27.06.2014National basic fee paid 
27.06.2014Search fee paid 
27.06.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
27.06.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure27.06.2014Examination requested  [2014/51]
27.05.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
19.06.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
25.10.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.08.2019Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  19.06.2018
Fees paidRenewal fee
05.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
12.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
19.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
12.12.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.01.201907   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]EP2157498  (SONY CORP [JP]) [X] 1-6,11,12 * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0189] *
International search[X]US2009249257  (THOMAS BOVE ET AL.);
 [A]US2007176906  (ANDREW I. WARRE);
 [A]US2011122062  (HAK-YOUNG CHUNG ET AL.);
 [A]US2011199299  (KEN MIYASGUTA);
 [A]US2011080340  (ROBERT CAMPESI ET AL.)
by applicantEP2157498