Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2814043

EP2814043 - POWDER FOR MAGNETIC CORE AND POWDER MAGNETIC CORE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  04.08.2017
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip11.05.2019New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NTN Corporation
3-17, Kyomachibori 1-chome Nishi-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 550-0003 / JP
[2014/51]
Inventor(s)01 / ARAKI, Hikaru
c/o NTN Corporation
105, Hidamarinooka 5-chome
Kuwana-shi
Mie 511-0867 / JP
02 / MUNEDA, Norikazu
c/o NTN Corporation
105, Hidamarinooka 5-chome
Kuwana-shi
Mie 511-0867 / JP
03 / SHIMAZU, Eiichirou
c/o NTN Corporation
105, Hidamarinooka 5-chome
Kuwana-shi
Mie 511-0867 / JP
 [2014/51]
Representative(s)Eder, Thomas
Eder Schieschke & Partner mbB
Patentanwälte
Elisabethstrasse 34/II
80796 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/51]Eder, Thomas
Eder & Schieschke
Patentanwälte
Elisabethstrasse 34
80796 München / DE
Application number, filing date13747321.104.02.2013
WO2013JP52462
Priority number, dateJP2012002318706.02.2012         Original published format: JP 2012023187
JP2012025034714.11.2012         Original published format: JP 2012250347
JP2013001701731.01.2013         Original published format: JP 2013017017
[2014/51]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013118677
Date:15.08.2013
Language:JA
[2013/33]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2814043
Date:17.12.2014
Language:EN
[2014/51]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP15.08.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP01.06.2015
ClassificationInternational:H01F1/24, B22F1/02, B22F3/00, H01F27/255, H01F41/02
[2014/51]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/51]
TitleGerman:PULVER FÜR EINEN MAGNETKERN UND PULVERMAGNETKERN[2014/51]
English:POWDER FOR MAGNETIC CORE AND POWDER MAGNETIC CORE[2014/51]
French:POUDRE POUR NOYAU MAGNÉTIQUE ET NOYAU MAGNÉTIQUE EN POUDRE[2014/51]
Entry into regional phase22.08.2014Translation filed 
22.08.2014National basic fee paid 
22.08.2014Search fee paid 
22.08.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
22.08.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure22.08.2014Examination requested  [2014/51]
17.12.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
02.08.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
02.02.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.05.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  02.08.2017
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.02.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
29.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
28.02.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
12.03.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
28.02.2019Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
28.02.201806   M06   Fee paid on   12.03.2018
Documents cited:Search[XY]US2011024671  (OTSUKI ETSUO [JP] ET AL) [X] 1-4,11,13 * abstract * [Y] 5;
 [X]EP2330602  (PANASONIC CORP [JP]) [X] 1,3,4,13,15 * abstract *;
 [XP]WO2012084801  (HOEGANAES AB PUBL [SE]; YE ZHOU [SE]; PERSSON HANNA [SE]) [XP] 1-4,7,10,11,13-15 * page 10 - page 11; examples 1,4,5; claim 1, *;
 [X]JP2005187918  (JFE STEEL KK) [X] 1,3,4,11-15 * abstract *;
 [X]GB1216486  (WESTERN ELECTRIC CO [US]) [X] 1-3,9,10,13 * page 4, lines 99-117; claims 1-2; table 1 *;
 [X]US2791561  (HANS BELLER ET AL) [X] 1,3,6,10,13,15 * examples 5,6 *;
 [Y]JP2011105990  (CANON DENSHI KK) [Y] 5 * paragraph [0013] *
International search[Y]JP2008004864  (NISSAN MOTOR CO., LTD.);
 [Y]JP2011105990  (CANON ELECTRONICS INC.);
 [Y]WO2010038441  (PANASONIC CORP.);
 [Y]JP2005272956  (TOKYO JIKI INSATSU KABUSHIKI KAISHA);
 [A]JP2005340290  (DAIDO STEEL CO., LTD.)
by applicantJP2001085211
 JP4589374B
 JP2010043361