Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2879575

EP2879575 - PRESSURE SENSOR CATHETER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2015/24]PRESSURE SENSOR CATHETER AND ASSOCIATED METHOD
[2017/23]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  08.09.2017
Database last updated on 15.08.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  15.06.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip10.08.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): PL, SM
published on 12.09.2018 [2018/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Wellinq Medical B.V.
Kamerlingh-Onnesstraat 5
9351 VD Leek / NL
[2015/24]
Inventor(s)01 / LUDOPH, Bas
Aan de Vaart 3
NL-9301 ZH Roden / NL
 [2015/24]
Representative(s)Verdijck, Gerardus , et al
Arnold & Siedsma
Bezuidenhoutseweg 57
2594 AC The Hague / NL
[2017/41]
Former [2015/24]Lubberdink, Pim , et al
Arnold & Siedsma
Bezuidenhoutseweg 57
2594 AC The Hague / NL
Application number, filing date13747898.806.08.2013
[2017/41]
WO2013NL50582
Priority number, dateNL2012200928506.08.2012         Original published format: NL 2009285
NL2012200994007.12.2012         Original published format: NL 2009940
[2015/24]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014025255
Date:13.02.2014
Language:EN
[2014/07]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2879575
Date:10.06.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.02.2014
[2015/24]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2879575
Date:11.10.2017
Language:EN
[2017/41]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP13.02.2014
ClassificationInternational:A61B5/0215, A61B5/00
[2015/24]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/24]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:DRUCKSENSORKATHETER[2017/23]
English:PRESSURE SENSOR CATHETER[2017/23]
French:CATHÉTER À CAPTEUR DE PRESSION[2017/23]
Former [2015/24]DRUCKSENSORKATHETER UND ZUGEHÖRIGES VERFAHREN
Former [2015/24]PRESSURE SENSOR CATHETER AND ASSOCIATED METHOD
Former [2015/24]CATHÉTER À CAPTEUR DE PRESSION ET PROCÉDÉ ASSOCIÉ
Entry into regional phase13.02.2015National basic fee paid 
13.02.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
13.02.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure13.02.2015Examination requested  [2015/24]
08.05.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
16.06.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.08.2017Fee for grant paid
10.08.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
04.09.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  16.06.2017
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
29.08.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
28.08.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.08.201503   M06   Fee paid on   29.01.2016
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT11.10.2017
CZ11.10.2017
DK11.10.2017
EE11.10.2017
ES11.10.2017
FI11.10.2017
HR11.10.2017
LT11.10.2017
LV11.10.2017
PL11.10.2017
RS11.10.2017
SE11.10.2017
SK11.10.2017
SM11.10.2017
BG11.01.2018
NO11.01.2018
GR12.01.2018
IS11.02.2018
[2018/37]
Former [2018/35]AT11.10.2017
CZ11.10.2017
DK11.10.2017
EE11.10.2017
ES11.10.2017
FI11.10.2017
HR11.10.2017
LT11.10.2017
LV11.10.2017
RS11.10.2017
SE11.10.2017
SK11.10.2017
BG11.01.2018
NO11.01.2018
GR12.01.2018
IS11.02.2018
Former [2018/24]AT11.10.2017
ES11.10.2017
FI11.10.2017
HR11.10.2017
LT11.10.2017
LV11.10.2017
RS11.10.2017
SE11.10.2017
BG11.01.2018
NO11.01.2018
GR12.01.2018
IS11.02.2018
Former [2018/22]ES11.10.2017
FI11.10.2017
LT11.10.2017
NO11.01.2018
Cited inInternational search[A]WO8910089  (MILLAR INSTRUMENTS [US]) [A] 1-17 * page 3, lines 8-20 * * page 11, lines 4-16 * * page 14, lines 8-34; figure 6; claim - *;
 [A]WO9956612  (FLORENCE MEDICAL LTD [IL], et al) [A] 1 * page 21, line 14 - page 22, line 4; figure 11a *;
 [A]US2003191400  (SHALMAN EVGENY [IL], et al) [A] 1 * paragraph [0024]; figure 1 *