blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2885182

EP2885182 - SPEED CONTROL SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR OPERATING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  10.07.2020
Database last updated on 18.05.2024
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  07.06.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  12.02.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  15.06.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip01.07.2022Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MK
published on 03.08.2022  [2022/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Jaguar Land Rover Limited
Abbey Road
Whitley
Coventry, Warwickshire CV3 4LF / GB
[2015/26]
Inventor(s)01 / FAIRGRIEVE, Andrew
c/o Jaguar Land Rover
Patents Department W/1/073
Abbey Road
Whitley
Coventry Warwickshire CV3 4LF / GB
02 / KELLY, James
c/o Jaguar Land Rover
Patents W/1/073
Abbey Road
Whitley
Coventry Warwickshire CV3 4LF / GB
03 / WOOLLISCOFT, Daniel
c/o Jaguar Land Rover
Patents W/1/073
Abbey Road
Whitley
Coventry Warwickshire CV3 4LF / GB
 [2015/26]
Representative(s)Holmes, Matthew William, et al
Jaguar Land Rover
Patent Department W/1/073
Abbey Road
Whitley, Coventry CV3 4LF / GB
[N/P]
Former [2019/28]Holmes, Matthew William, et al
Jaguar Land Rover
Patent Department W/1/073
Abbey Road
Whitley
Coventry CV3 4LF / GB
Former [2015/26]Bhimani, Alan
Jaguar Land Rover
Patents Department W/1/073
Abbey Road
Whitley
Coventry CV3 4LF / GB
Application number, filing date13748058.813.08.2013
[2019/28]
WO2013EP66907
Priority number, dateGB2012001465116.08.2012         Original published format: GB 201214651
GB2013000465314.03.2013         Original published format: GB 201304653
[2015/26]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2014026986
Date:20.02.2014
Language:EN
[2014/08]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2885182
Date:24.06.2015
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.02.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2015/26]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2885182
Date:10.07.2019
Language:EN
[2019/28]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP20.02.2014
ClassificationIPC:B60W30/14
[2015/26]
CPC:
B60W30/143 (EP,GB,US); B60T8/175 (EP,US); B60W30/146 (EP,US);
B60W30/18 (GB); B60W30/18027 (GB); B60W30/18172 (EP,US);
F16H61/0213 (EP,US); B60T2201/04 (EP,US); B60T2210/14 (EP,US);
B60T2210/16 (EP,US); B60T2220/04 (EP,US); B60T2260/06 (EP,US);
B60W2552/05 (EP,US); B60W2720/10 (EP,US); B60W2720/12 (US);
B60W2720/30 (EP,US); B60Y2200/20 (EP,US); F16H2061/0234 (EP,US);
F16H59/66 (EP,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/28]
Former [2015/26]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:GESCHWINDIGKEITSREGELUNGSSYSTEM UND BETRIEBSVERFAHREN DAFÜR[2019/10]
English:SPEED CONTROL SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR OPERATING THE SAME[2015/26]
French:SYSTÈME DE RÉGULATION DE VITESSE ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE FONCTIONNEMENT[2015/26]
Former [2015/26]DREHZAHLSTEUERUNGSSYSTEM UND BETRIEBSVERFAHREN DAFÜR
Entry into regional phase16.03.2015National basic fee paid 
16.03.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
16.03.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure05.02.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
16.03.2015Examination requested  [2015/26]
14.06.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.06.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.02.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.06.2019Fee for grant paid
03.06.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
03.06.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  14.06.2018
Opposition(s)03.06.2020No opposition filed within time limit [2020/33]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.08.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
31.08.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
31.08.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
31.08.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU13.08.2013
AL10.07.2019
AT10.07.2019
CY10.07.2019
CZ10.07.2019
DK10.07.2019
EE10.07.2019
ES10.07.2019
FI10.07.2019
HR10.07.2019
IT10.07.2019
LT10.07.2019
LV10.07.2019
MC10.07.2019
MK10.07.2019
MT10.07.2019
NL10.07.2019
PL10.07.2019
RO10.07.2019
RS10.07.2019
SE10.07.2019
SI10.07.2019
SK10.07.2019
SM10.07.2019
TR10.07.2019
IE13.08.2019
LU13.08.2019
BE31.08.2019
CH31.08.2019
LI31.08.2019
BG10.10.2019
NO10.10.2019
GR11.10.2019
IS10.11.2019
PT11.11.2019
[2022/31]
Former [2021/34]HU13.08.2013
AL10.07.2019
AT10.07.2019
CY10.07.2019
CZ10.07.2019
DK10.07.2019
EE10.07.2019
ES10.07.2019
FI10.07.2019
HR10.07.2019
IT10.07.2019
LT10.07.2019
LV10.07.2019
MC10.07.2019
MT10.07.2019
NL10.07.2019
PL10.07.2019
RO10.07.2019
RS10.07.2019
SE10.07.2019
SI10.07.2019
SK10.07.2019
SM10.07.2019
TR10.07.2019
IE13.08.2019
LU13.08.2019
BE31.08.2019
CH31.08.2019
LI31.08.2019
BG10.10.2019
NO10.10.2019
GR11.10.2019
IS10.11.2019
PT11.11.2019
Former [2021/32]HU13.08.2013
AL10.07.2019
AT10.07.2019
CY10.07.2019
CZ10.07.2019
DK10.07.2019
EE10.07.2019
ES10.07.2019
FI10.07.2019
HR10.07.2019
IT10.07.2019
LT10.07.2019
LV10.07.2019
MC10.07.2019
NL10.07.2019
PL10.07.2019
RO10.07.2019
RS10.07.2019
SE10.07.2019
SI10.07.2019
SK10.07.2019
SM10.07.2019
TR10.07.2019
IE13.08.2019
LU13.08.2019
BE31.08.2019
CH31.08.2019
LI31.08.2019
BG10.10.2019
NO10.10.2019
GR11.10.2019
IS10.11.2019
PT11.11.2019
Former [2021/26]AL10.07.2019
AT10.07.2019
CY10.07.2019
CZ10.07.2019
DK10.07.2019
EE10.07.2019
ES10.07.2019
FI10.07.2019
HR10.07.2019
IT10.07.2019
LT10.07.2019
LV10.07.2019
MC10.07.2019
NL10.07.2019
PL10.07.2019
RO10.07.2019
RS10.07.2019
SE10.07.2019
SI10.07.2019
SK10.07.2019
SM10.07.2019
TR10.07.2019
IE13.08.2019
LU13.08.2019
BE31.08.2019
CH31.08.2019
LI31.08.2019
BG10.10.2019
NO10.10.2019
GR11.10.2019
IS10.11.2019
PT11.11.2019
Former [2020/37]AL10.07.2019
AT10.07.2019
CZ10.07.2019
DK10.07.2019
EE10.07.2019
ES10.07.2019
FI10.07.2019
HR10.07.2019
IT10.07.2019
LT10.07.2019
LV10.07.2019
MC10.07.2019
NL10.07.2019
PL10.07.2019
RO10.07.2019
RS10.07.2019
SE10.07.2019
SI10.07.2019
SK10.07.2019
SM10.07.2019
TR10.07.2019
IE13.08.2019
LU13.08.2019
BE31.08.2019
CH31.08.2019
LI31.08.2019
BG10.10.2019
NO10.10.2019
GR11.10.2019
IS10.11.2019
PT11.11.2019
Former [2020/36]AL10.07.2019
AT10.07.2019
CZ10.07.2019
DK10.07.2019
EE10.07.2019
ES10.07.2019
FI10.07.2019
HR10.07.2019
IT10.07.2019
LT10.07.2019
LV10.07.2019
MC10.07.2019
NL10.07.2019
PL10.07.2019
RO10.07.2019
RS10.07.2019
SE10.07.2019
SK10.07.2019
SM10.07.2019
TR10.07.2019
IE13.08.2019
LU13.08.2019
CH31.08.2019
LI31.08.2019
BG10.10.2019
NO10.10.2019
GR11.10.2019
IS10.11.2019
PT11.11.2019
Former [2020/27]AL10.07.2019
AT10.07.2019
CZ10.07.2019
DK10.07.2019
EE10.07.2019
ES10.07.2019
FI10.07.2019
HR10.07.2019
IT10.07.2019
LT10.07.2019
LV10.07.2019
MC10.07.2019
NL10.07.2019
PL10.07.2019
RO10.07.2019
RS10.07.2019
SE10.07.2019
SK10.07.2019
SM10.07.2019
TR10.07.2019
LU13.08.2019
CH31.08.2019
LI31.08.2019
BG10.10.2019
NO10.10.2019
GR11.10.2019
PT11.11.2019
IS24.02.2020
Former [2020/25]AL10.07.2019
AT10.07.2019
CZ10.07.2019
DK10.07.2019
EE10.07.2019
ES10.07.2019
FI10.07.2019
HR10.07.2019
IT10.07.2019
LT10.07.2019
LV10.07.2019
MC10.07.2019
NL10.07.2019
PL10.07.2019
RO10.07.2019
RS10.07.2019
SE10.07.2019
SK10.07.2019
TR10.07.2019
LU13.08.2019
CH31.08.2019
LI31.08.2019
BG10.10.2019
NO10.10.2019
GR11.10.2019
PT11.11.2019
IS24.02.2020
Former [2020/24]AL10.07.2019
AT10.07.2019
DK10.07.2019
EE10.07.2019
ES10.07.2019
FI10.07.2019
HR10.07.2019
IT10.07.2019
LT10.07.2019
LV10.07.2019
MC10.07.2019
NL10.07.2019
PL10.07.2019
RO10.07.2019
RS10.07.2019
SE10.07.2019
TR10.07.2019
CH31.08.2019
LI31.08.2019
BG10.10.2019
NO10.10.2019
GR11.10.2019
PT11.11.2019
IS24.02.2020
Former [2020/23]AL10.07.2019
AT10.07.2019
DK10.07.2019
EE10.07.2019
ES10.07.2019
FI10.07.2019
HR10.07.2019
IT10.07.2019
LT10.07.2019
LV10.07.2019
NL10.07.2019
PL10.07.2019
RO10.07.2019
RS10.07.2019
SE10.07.2019
TR10.07.2019
BG10.10.2019
NO10.10.2019
GR11.10.2019
IS10.11.2019
PT11.11.2019
Former [2020/22]AL10.07.2019
AT10.07.2019
DK10.07.2019
EE10.07.2019
ES10.07.2019
FI10.07.2019
HR10.07.2019
LT10.07.2019
LV10.07.2019
NL10.07.2019
RS10.07.2019
SE10.07.2019
TR10.07.2019
BG10.10.2019
NO10.10.2019
GR11.10.2019
IS10.11.2019
PT11.11.2019
Former [2020/17]AL10.07.2019
AT10.07.2019
ES10.07.2019
FI10.07.2019
HR10.07.2019
LT10.07.2019
LV10.07.2019
NL10.07.2019
RS10.07.2019
SE10.07.2019
TR10.07.2019
BG10.10.2019
NO10.10.2019
GR11.10.2019
IS10.11.2019
PT11.11.2019
Former [2020/15]AL10.07.2019
AT10.07.2019
ES10.07.2019
FI10.07.2019
HR10.07.2019
LT10.07.2019
LV10.07.2019
NL10.07.2019
RS10.07.2019
SE10.07.2019
BG10.10.2019
NO10.10.2019
GR11.10.2019
IS10.11.2019
PT11.11.2019
Former [2020/12]AT10.07.2019
ES10.07.2019
FI10.07.2019
HR10.07.2019
LT10.07.2019
LV10.07.2019
NL10.07.2019
RS10.07.2019
SE10.07.2019
BG10.10.2019
NO10.10.2019
GR11.10.2019
IS10.11.2019
PT11.11.2019
Former [2020/11]AT10.07.2019
ES10.07.2019
FI10.07.2019
HR10.07.2019
LT10.07.2019
LV10.07.2019
NL10.07.2019
RS10.07.2019
SE10.07.2019
BG10.10.2019
NO10.10.2019
GR11.10.2019
PT11.11.2019
Former [2020/10]AT10.07.2019
FI10.07.2019
LT10.07.2019
NL10.07.2019
SE10.07.2019
BG10.10.2019
NO10.10.2019
PT11.11.2019
Former [2020/09]FI10.07.2019
LT10.07.2019
NL10.07.2019
NO10.10.2019
Former [2020/08]LT10.07.2019
NL10.07.2019
NO10.10.2019
Former [2020/07]NL10.07.2019
Cited inInternational search[Y]DE19914428  (MANNESMANN SACHS AG [DE]) [Y] 4,5,15,16 * column 5, line 60 - column 6, line 6 *;
 [IAY]US2009005945  (TAKEDA MASAYOSHI [JP], et al) [I] 1-3,6,8,12-14,17,19-21 * paragraph [0093] - paragraph [0094] * * figures 6, 9A, 9B * [A] 9 [Y] 4,5,7,15,16,18;
 [XY]US2010286886  (O'LEARY PATRICK J [US], et al) [X] 9-11 * paragraph [0021] * * figure 6B *[Y] 7,18
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.