Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2815369

EP2815369 - REALTIME ADVERTISING FOR SEARCH RESULTS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  09.09.2016
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip09.09.2016Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 12.10.2016  [2016/41]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Microsoft Technology Licensing, LLC
One Microsoft Way
Redmond, WA 98052 / US
[2015/20]
Former [2014/52]For all designated states
Microsoft Corporation
One Microsoft Way
Redmond, WA 98052-6399 / US
Inventor(s)01 / REDDY, Nagareddy S.
c/o Microsoft Corporation
LCA - International Patents
One Microsoft Way
Redmond Washington 98052-6399 / US
02 / CHIPLONKAR, Harsh
c/o Microsoft Corporation
LCA - International Patents
One Microsoft Way
Redmond Washington 98052-6399 / US
 [2014/52]
Representative(s)Goddar, Heinz J.
Boehmert & Boehmert
Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB
Pettenkoferstrasse 22
80336 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/52]Goddar, Heinz J.
Boehmert & Boehmert
Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB
Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte
Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22
80336 München / DE
Application number, filing date13748495.204.02.2013
WO2013US24560
Priority number, dateUS20121337253214.02.2012         Original published format: US201213372532
[2014/52]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013122759
Date:22.08.2013
Language:EN
[2013/34]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2815369
Date:24.12.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.08.2013
[2014/52]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR22.08.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.08.2015
ClassificationInternational:G06Q30/02, G06F17/30
[2014/52]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/52]
TitleGerman:WERBUNG IN ECHTZEIT FÜR SUCHERGEBNISSE[2014/52]
English:REALTIME ADVERTISING FOR SEARCH RESULTS[2014/52]
French:PUBLICITÉ EN TEMPS RÉEL POUR RÉSULTATS DE RECHERCHE[2014/52]
Entry into regional phase01.07.2014National basic fee paid 
01.07.2014Search fee paid 
01.07.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
01.07.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure01.07.2014Examination requested  [2014/52]
22.03.2016Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2016/41]
02.05.2016Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2016/41]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.02.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
10.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[I]US2008114759  (YAHIA SIHEM AMER [US] ET AL) [I] 1-10 * abstract * * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0009] * * paragraph [0018] * * paragraph [0020] * * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0027] *;
 [A]US2011289015  (MEI TAO [CN] ET AL) [A] 1-10 * abstract *;
 [A]US2008243783  (SANTI JIM W DELLI [US] ET AL) [A] 1-10 * abstract *
International search[X]US2011282741  (PARK SUNG BUM);
 [Y]KR20060103034  (DAUM COMMUNICATION CORP.);
 [A]US2011071898  (FENG JUN ET AL.);
 [A]US2011178856  (MICAELIAN HAVEN LORENZINI);
 [A]KR20110111666  (NTOM AD CO., LTD.)