Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2815255

EP2815255 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR DETECTION AND CLASSIFICATION OF SEISMIC TERMINATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  05.01.2018
Database last updated on 19.10.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  27.01.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  13.01.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip21.06.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MC
published on 24.07.2019  [2019/30]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ExxonMobil Upstream Research Company
22777 Springwoods Village Parkway
Spring TX 77389 / US
[2015/50]
Former [2014/52]For all designated states
Exxonmobil Upstream Research Company
Corp-URC-SW-359 P.O. Box 2189
Houston, TX 77252-2189 / US
Inventor(s)01 / IMHOF, Matthias, G.
4111 Spyglass Hills Drive
Katy, TX 77450 / US
 [2014/52]
Representative(s)ExxonMobil Chemical Europe Inc.
IP Law Europe
Hermeslaan 2
1831 Machelen / BE
[2017/09]
Former [2014/52]Catana, Gabriela , et al
ExxonMobil Chemical Europe Inc.
IP Law Europe
Hermeslaan 2
1831 Machelen / BE
Application number, filing date13748593.411.01.2013
[2017/09]
WO2013US21179
Priority number, dateUS201261598233P13.02.2012         Original published format: US 201261598233 P
[2014/52]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013122704
Date:22.08.2013
Language:EN
[2013/34]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2815255
Date:24.12.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.08.2013
[2014/52]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2815255
Date:01.03.2017
Language:EN
[2017/09]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US22.08.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP16.09.2015
ClassificationInternational:G01V1/00, G01V1/30, G01V1/34
[2015/42]
Former International [2014/52]G01V1/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/52]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR DETEKTION UND KLASSIFIZIERUNG VON SEISMISCHEN ABSCHLÜSSEN[2014/52]
English:SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR DETECTION AND CLASSIFICATION OF SEISMIC TERMINATIONS[2014/52]
French:SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE DÉTECTION ET DE CLASSIFICATION DE TERMINAISONS SISMIQUES[2014/52]
Entry into regional phase01.09.2014National basic fee paid 
01.09.2014Search fee paid 
01.09.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
01.09.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure22.07.2013Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
01.09.2014Examination requested  [2014/52]
05.04.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
16.09.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.01.2017Fee for grant paid
10.01.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
10.01.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  16.09.2016
Opposition(s)04.12.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2018/06]
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
08.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
09.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT01.03.2017
CZ01.03.2017
DK01.03.2017
EE01.03.2017
ES01.03.2017
FI01.03.2017
HR01.03.2017
IT01.03.2017
LT01.03.2017
LV01.03.2017
MC01.03.2017
NL01.03.2017
PL01.03.2017
RO01.03.2017
RS01.03.2017
SE01.03.2017
SI01.03.2017
SK01.03.2017
SM01.03.2017
BG01.06.2017
GR02.06.2017
IS01.07.2017
PT03.07.2017
[2019/30]
Former [2018/14]AT01.03.2017
CZ01.03.2017
DK01.03.2017
EE01.03.2017
ES01.03.2017
FI01.03.2017
HR01.03.2017
IT01.03.2017
LT01.03.2017
LV01.03.2017
NL01.03.2017
PL01.03.2017
RO01.03.2017
RS01.03.2017
SE01.03.2017
SI01.03.2017
SK01.03.2017
SM01.03.2017
BG01.06.2017
GR02.06.2017
IS01.07.2017
PT03.07.2017
Former [2018/09]AT01.03.2017
CZ01.03.2017
DK01.03.2017
EE01.03.2017
ES01.03.2017
FI01.03.2017
HR01.03.2017
LT01.03.2017
LV01.03.2017
NL01.03.2017
PL01.03.2017
RO01.03.2017
RS01.03.2017
SE01.03.2017
SK01.03.2017
SM01.03.2017
BG01.06.2017
GR02.06.2017
IS01.07.2017
PT03.07.2017
Former [2017/51]AT01.03.2017
CZ01.03.2017
EE01.03.2017
ES01.03.2017
FI01.03.2017
HR01.03.2017
LT01.03.2017
LV01.03.2017
NL01.03.2017
PL01.03.2017
RO01.03.2017
RS01.03.2017
SE01.03.2017
SK01.03.2017
SM01.03.2017
BG01.06.2017
GR02.06.2017
IS01.07.2017
PT03.07.2017
Former [2017/50]AT01.03.2017
CZ01.03.2017
EE01.03.2017
ES01.03.2017
FI01.03.2017
HR01.03.2017
LT01.03.2017
LV01.03.2017
NL01.03.2017
PL01.03.2017
RO01.03.2017
RS01.03.2017
SE01.03.2017
SK01.03.2017
BG01.06.2017
GR02.06.2017
IS01.07.2017
Former [2017/49]AT01.03.2017
CZ01.03.2017
EE01.03.2017
ES01.03.2017
FI01.03.2017
HR01.03.2017
LT01.03.2017
LV01.03.2017
NL01.03.2017
RO01.03.2017
RS01.03.2017
SE01.03.2017
SK01.03.2017
BG01.06.2017
GR02.06.2017
IS01.07.2017
Former [2017/48]AT01.03.2017
CZ01.03.2017
ES01.03.2017
FI01.03.2017
HR01.03.2017
LT01.03.2017
LV01.03.2017
NL01.03.2017
RS01.03.2017
SE01.03.2017
BG01.06.2017
GR02.06.2017
Former [2017/41]AT01.03.2017
ES01.03.2017
FI01.03.2017
HR01.03.2017
LT01.03.2017
LV01.03.2017
NL01.03.2017
RS01.03.2017
SE01.03.2017
BG01.06.2017
GR02.06.2017
Documents cited:Search[X]US2008175478  (WENTLAND ROBERT [US] ET AL) [X] 1-7,16 * paragraphs [0014] - [0018] - [0 99] - [0109] - [ 160] - [0194] - [ 208] - [0250] - [ 732] *;
 [X]US2010149917  (IMHOF MATTHIAS [US] ET AL) [X] 1-7,13,16 * paragraphs [0002] , [0 91] - [0101] - [ 116] , [ 125] , [ 164] - [0171]; figures 10A, 13 *;
 [X]WO2011149609  (EXXONMOBIL UPSTREAM RES CO [US]; IMHOF MATTHIAS G [US]; DIMITROV PAVEL) [X] 1,3-12,14-16 * paragraphs [0002] , [0 55] - [0078] *
International search[X]US2008175478  (WENTLAND R. ET AL.)