Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2814559

EP2814559 - LOW FRICTION CANNULA SEALS FOR MINIMALLY INVASIVE ROBOTIC SURGERY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  30.11.2018
Database last updated on 12.10.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  09.07.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip11.10.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AT, IT, MC
published on 13.11.2019 [2019/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Intuitive Surgical Operations, Inc.
1020 Kifer Road
Sunnyvale, CA 94086 / US
[2017/45]
Former [2017/37]For all designated states
Intuitive Surgical Operations Inc.
1020 Kifer Road
Sunnyvale, California 94086 / US
Former [2014/52]For all designated states
Intuitive Surgical Operations, Inc.
1266 Kifer Road, Building 101
Sunnyvale, CA 94086 / US
Inventor(s)01 / BLUMENKRANZ, Stephen J.
25223 La Loma Drive
Los Altos Hills, California 94022 / US
02 / SCHENA, Bruce Michael
414 Pope Street
Menlo Park, California 94025 / US
03 / GOLDBERG, Randal
912 Campisi Way
Unit 217
Campbell, California 95008 / US
 [2014/52]
Representative(s)MacDougall, Alan John Shaw , et al
Mathys & Squire LLP The Shard
32 London Bridge Street
London SE1 9SG / GB
[2014/52]
Application number, filing date13748661.915.02.2013
[2019/01]
WO2013US26519
Priority number, dateUS201261599288P15.02.2012         Original published format: US 201261599288 P
[2014/52]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013123455
Date:22.08.2013
Language:EN
[2013/34]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2814559
Date:24.12.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.08.2013
[2014/52]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2814559
Date:02.01.2019
Language:EN
[2019/01]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR22.08.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.02.2016
ClassificationInternational:A61M39/06, A61M25/01, B25J19/00, A61B34/30, A61B17/34
[2018/30]
Former International [2016/12]A61M39/06, A61B90/00, A61M25/01, B25J19/00, // A61B17/34
Former International [2015/47]A61M39/06, A61B19/00, A61M25/01, B25J19/00, // A61B17/34
Former International [2014/52]A61M39/06, A61B19/00, A61M25/01, B25J19/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/52]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:REIBUNGSARME KANÜLENDICHTUNGEN FÜR MINIMALINVASIVE ROBOTERGESTÜTZTE CHIRURGIE[2014/52]
English:LOW FRICTION CANNULA SEALS FOR MINIMALLY INVASIVE ROBOTIC SURGERY[2014/52]
French:JOINTS DE CANULE À FAIBLE FROTTEMENT POUR CHIRURGIE ROBOTISÉE MINIMALEMENT INVASIVE[2014/52]
Entry into regional phase28.08.2014National basic fee paid 
28.08.2014Search fee paid 
28.08.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
28.08.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure28.08.2014Examination requested  [2014/52]
14.09.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
10.07.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.11.2018Fee for grant paid
20.11.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
20.11.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)EP18248197.8  / EP3488894
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  10.07.2018
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.02.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
22.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
17.02.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
22.02.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT02.01.2019
ES02.01.2019
FI02.01.2019
HR02.01.2019
IT02.01.2019
LT02.01.2019
LV02.01.2019
MC02.01.2019
NL02.01.2019
PL02.01.2019
RS02.01.2019
SE02.01.2019
BG02.04.2019
NO02.04.2019
GR03.04.2019
IS02.05.2019
PT02.05.2019
[2019/46]
Former [2019/39]ES02.01.2019
FI02.01.2019
HR02.01.2019
LT02.01.2019
LV02.01.2019
NL02.01.2019
PL02.01.2019
RS02.01.2019
SE02.01.2019
BG02.04.2019
NO02.04.2019
GR03.04.2019
IS02.05.2019
PT02.05.2019
Former [2019/38]ES02.01.2019
FI02.01.2019
LT02.01.2019
NL02.01.2019
PL02.01.2019
SE02.01.2019
BG02.04.2019
NO02.04.2019
GR03.04.2019
PT02.05.2019
Former [2019/37]ES02.01.2019
FI02.01.2019
LT02.01.2019
NL02.01.2019
PL02.01.2019
SE02.01.2019
NO02.04.2019
GR03.04.2019
PT02.05.2019
Former [2019/35]ES02.01.2019
FI02.01.2019
LT02.01.2019
NL02.01.2019
PL02.01.2019
SE02.01.2019
NO02.04.2019
PT02.05.2019
Former [2019/34]FI02.01.2019
LT02.01.2019
NL02.01.2019
SE02.01.2019
NO02.04.2019
PT02.05.2019
Former [2019/33]FI02.01.2019
LT02.01.2019
NL02.01.2019
NO02.04.2019
PT02.05.2019
Former [2019/30]NL02.01.2019
Documents cited:Search[XYI]US2008065111  (BLUMENKRANZ STEPHEN J [US], et al) [X] 1,5,10 * paragraph [0084]; figure 18 * [Y] 7,8,10,13,15 [I] 9;
 [XI]US5788676  (YOON INBAE [US]) [X] 1,2,5,10,11 * column 6, line 3 - line 59; figure 6 * [I] 9;
 [X]US2009326460  (BEARDSLEY JOHN W [US]) [X] 1,2,10,11 * paragraph [0039]; figure 5b *;
 [A]US2010168675  (CINDRICH CHRIS [US], et al) [A] 1,2,10,11 * paragraph [0062] - paragraph [0066]; figures 15-18 *;
 [A]US2011087170  (INSIGNARES ROGELIO A [US]) [A] 9 * abstract *;
 [A]US4895346  (STEIGERWALD CARL J [US]) [A] 1,2,10,11 * abstract *;
 [A]WO2008109408  (MOENNING STEPHEN P [US]) [A] 1,2,10,11 * paragraph [0018]; figure 2A *;
 [I]US2011152788  (HOTTER JOSEPH [FR]) [I] 1,6,10,13,14 * abstract *;
 [I]US2007260186  (LANG DIETER [DE]) [I] 1,6,10,13,14 * paragraph [0069] - paragraph [0085]; figures 1-5b *;
 [Y]US6142981  (HECK ALICIA F [US], et al) [Y] 7,8,10,13,15 * column 6, line 12 - line 24; figure 3 *;
 [A]US5997515  (DE LA TORRE ROGER A [US], et al) [A] 7 * column 10, line 59 - line 63; figure 17 *;
 [A]US2009240204  (TAYLOR SCOTT V [US], et al) [A] 7 * paragraph [0040] *;
 [A]US2006241671  (GREENHALGH E S [US]) [A] 7 * paragraph [0025]; figure 5 *;
 [A]US2008290605  (BROCKMEIER OIVIND [US], et al) [A] 8 * abstract *
International search[X]US2008065111  (BLUMENKRANZ STEPHEN J [US], et al);
 [A]US2009275898  (WENCHELL THOMAS [US]);
 [A]US2009234293  (ALBRECHT JEREMY J [US], et al);
 [A]US2011040255  (SCHWEITZER TOM [DE], et al);
 [A]US2009318868  (RACENET DAVID C [US], et al)
by applicantUS2008065111
 US5788676
 US2009326460