Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2814559 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2814559



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 354
06.11.2019 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
14.01.2019 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
06.12.2018 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
20.11.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
20.11.2018 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
20.11.2018 French translation of claims Search / examination 3
20.11.2018 German translation of the claims Search / examination 3
20.11.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
10.07.2018 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
10.07.2018 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
10.07.2018 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
10.07.2018 Text intended for grant Search / examination 43
10.07.2018 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 43
15.06.2018 Examination started Search / examination 1
06.10.2017 Communication concerning corrected entries of the applicant Search / examination 1
10.08.2017 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 2
03.08.2017 Annexes in respect of a request for a change Search / examination 46
03.08.2017 Request for change of address - applicant Search / examination 1
14.09.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
14.09.2016 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
14.09.2016 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
14.09.2016 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 6
14.09.2016 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 6
14.09.2016 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 6
14.09.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
04.03.2016 Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
17.02.2016 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
17.02.2016 European search opinion Search / examination 4
17.02.2016 Information on Search Strategy Search / examination 1
17.02.2016 Supplementary European search report Search / examination 6
23.12.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
23.12.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
23.12.2015 Letter concerning search matters Search / examination 1
21.10.2015 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 2
21.10.2015 Partial European search report Search / examination 4
13.10.2015 Search started Search / examination 1
14.04.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
14.04.2015 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
14.04.2015 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 6
14.04.2015 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 1
14.04.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
26.11.2014 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
15.10.2014 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 1
14.10.2014 Communication regarding possible amendment of the application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 3
10.10.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
10.10.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
10.10.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
02.09.2014 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 9
28.08.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
28.08.2014 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
28.08.2014 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
27.06.2014 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
11.09.2013 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 55
22.08.2013 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 3
22.08.2013 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 46