Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2814559


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
08.11.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  11.12.2019 [2019/50]
08.11.2019 No opposition filed within time limit published on  11.12.2019 [2019/50]
01.11.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  04.12.2019 [2019/49]
25.10.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  27.11.2019 [2019/48]
18.10.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.11.2019 [2019/47]
11.10.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  13.11.2019  [2019/46]
23.08.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  25.09.2019  [2019/39]
16.08.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  18.09.2019  [2019/38]
09.08.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  11.09.2019  [2019/37]
26.07.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  28.08.2019  [2019/35]
19.07.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  21.08.2019  [2019/34]
12.07.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  14.08.2019  [2019/33]
21.06.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  24.07.2019  [2019/30]
11.01.2019 Change - divisional application(s) published on  13.02.2019  [2019/07]
30.11.2018 (Expected) grant published on  02.01.2019  [2019/01]
23.11.2018 New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
23.11.2018 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
23.11.2018 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
09.07.2018 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
22.06.2018 Change - classification published on  25.07.2018  [2018/30]
22.06.2018 Change - classification published on  25.07.2018  [2018/30]
27.02.2018 New entry: Renewal fee paid
06.10.2017 Change - applicant published on  08.11.2017  [2017/45]
11.08.2017 Change - applicant published on  13.09.2017  [2017/37]
21.02.2017 New entry: Renewal fee paid
16.09.2016 Amendment by applicant
25.02.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
19.02.2016 Change - classification published on  23.03.2016  [2016/12]
19.02.2016 Change - classification published on  23.03.2016  [2016/12]
12.02.2016 Change - date of supplementary search report published on  16.03.2016  [2016/11]
16.10.2015 Change - classification published on  18.11.2015  [2015/47]
16.10.2015 Change - classification published on  18.11.2015  [2015/47]
21.04.2015 Amendment by applicant
17.04.2015 Change - extension states published on  20.05.2015  [2015/21]
26.02.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
21.11.2014 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  24.12.2014  [2014/52]
21.11.2014 Request for examination filed published on  24.12.2014  [2014/52]
30.10.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
07.10.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
29.08.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
06.09.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
23.08.2013 PCT data prior to European publication