Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2814559 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

EP13748661 EP18248197



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
WO2013123455Global Dossier 22.08.2013A1
Priority number Date
US201261599288 15.02.2012
US201313769036 15.02.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2019269437Global Dossier 05.09.2019A1
Priority number Date
US201615057080 29.02.2016
US201261599288 15.02.2012
US201916407158 08.05.2019
US201313769036 15.02.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US10327808Global Dossier 25.06.2019B2
US2016220272 04.08.2016A1
Priority number Date
US201615057080 29.02.2016
US201261599288 15.02.2012
US201313769036 15.02.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US9295523Global Dossier 29.03.2016B2
US2013211423 15.08.2013A1
Priority number Date
US201261599288 15.02.2012
US201313769036 15.02.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP3488894Global Dossier 29.05.2019A1
Priority number Date
WO2013US26519 15.02.2013
US201261599288 15.02.2012
EP13748661 15.02.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2814559Global Dossier 02.01.2019B1
EP2814559 16.03.2016A4
EP2814559 24.12.2014A1
Priority number Date
WO2013US26519 15.02.2013
US201261599288 15.02.2012
TypeType Divisional application
 EP3488894