Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2816129

EP2816129 - COLD-ROLLED STEEL SHEET, PLATED STEEL SHEET, AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2014/52]COLD-ROLLED STEEL SHEET, PLATED STEEL SHEET, METHOD FOR PRODUCING COLD-ROLLED STEEL SHEET, AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING PLATED STEEL SHEET
[2017/40]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  10.08.2018
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  01.09.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  11.04.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip25.01.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IE
published on 27.02.2019  [2019/09]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Nippon Steel & Sumitomo Metal Corporation
6-1, Marunouchi 2-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8071 / JP
[2014/52]
Inventor(s)01 / KONDO Yusuke
c/o NIPPON STEEL & SUMITOMO METAL CORPORATION
6-1, Marunouchi 2-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8071 / JP
02 / HAYASHI Kunio
c/o NIPPON STEEL & SUMITOMO METAL CORPORATION
6-1, Marunouchi 2-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8071 / JP
03 / OGAWA Toshio
c/o NIPPON STEEL & SUMITOMO METAL CORPORATION
6-1, Marunouchi 2-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8071 / JP
04 / MATSUTANI Naoki
c/o NIPPON STEEL & SUMITOMO METAL CORPORATION
6-1, Marunouchi 2-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8071 / JP
05 / GOTO Koichi
c/o NIPPON STEEL & SUMITOMO METAL CORPORATION
6-1, Marunouchi 2-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8071 / JP
 [2017/40]
Former [2014/52]01 / KONDO Yusuke
c/o NIPPON STEEL&SUMITOMO METAL CORPORATION
6-1 Marunouchi 2-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8071 / JP
02 / HAYASHI Kunio
c/o NIPPON STEEL&SUMITOMO METAL CORPORATION
6-1 Marunouchi 2-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8071 / JP
03 / OGAWA Toshio
c/o NIPPON STEEL&SUMITOMO METAL CORPORATION
6-1 Marunouchi 2-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8071 / JP
04 / MATSUTANI Naoki
c/o NIPPON STEEL&SUMITOMO METAL CORPORATION
6-1 Marunouchi 2-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8071 / JP
05 / GOTO Koichi
c/o NIPPON STEEL&SUMITOMO METAL CORPORATION
6-1 Marunouchi 2-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8071 / JP
Representative(s)Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
[2017/40]
Former [2014/52]Vossius & Partner
Siebertstrasse 4
81675 München / DE
Application number, filing date13748796.306.02.2013
[2017/40]
WO2013JP52762
Priority number, dateJP2012002827113.02.2012         Original published format: JP 2012028271
[2014/52]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013121953
Date:22.08.2013
Language:JA
[2013/34]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2816129
Date:24.12.2014
Language:EN
[2014/52]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2816129
Date:04.10.2017
Language:EN
[2017/40]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP22.08.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.10.2015
ClassificationInternational:C21D9/46, C22C38/14, C23C2/02, C23C2/06, C23C2/28, C23C2/40, C22C38/02, C22C38/04, C22C38/06, C22C38/08, C22C38/12, C22C38/16, C22C38/18, C22C38/20, C22C38/22, C22C38/26, C22C38/28, C22C38/38, C22C38/50, C22C38/44, C21D8/02, // C22C38/00
[2017/12]
Former International [2014/52]C22C38/00, C21D9/46, C22C38/14, C22C38/58, C23C2/02, C23C2/06, C23C2/28
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/52]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:KALTGEWALZTES STAHLBLECH, PLATTIERTES STAHLBLECH, UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR[2017/40]
English:COLD-ROLLED STEEL SHEET, PLATED STEEL SHEET, AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING THE SAME[2017/40]
French:FEUILLE D'ACIER LAMINÉE À FROID, FEUILLE D'ACIER PLAQUÉE, ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DE CELLES-CI[2017/40]
Former [2014/52]KALTGEWALZTES STAHLBLECH, PLATTIERTES STAHLBLECH, VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES KALTGEWALZTEN STAHLBLECHES UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON PLATTIERTEM STAHLBLECH
Former [2014/52]COLD-ROLLED STEEL SHEET, PLATED STEEL SHEET, METHOD FOR PRODUCING COLD-ROLLED STEEL SHEET, AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING PLATED STEEL SHEET
Former [2014/52]FEUILLE D'ACIER LAMINÉE À FROID, FEUILLE D'ACIER PLAQUÉE, PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DE FEUILLE D'ACIER LAMINÉE À FROID ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DE FEUILLE D'ACIER PLAQUÉE
Entry into regional phase22.07.2014Translation filed 
13.08.2014National basic fee paid 
13.08.2014Search fee paid 
13.08.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
13.08.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure13.08.2014Examination requested  [2014/52]
12.01.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
12.04.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.08.2017Fee for grant paid
22.08.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
22.08.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  12.04.2017
Opposition(s)05.07.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/37]
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.02.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
22.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
21.02.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT04.10.2017
CZ04.10.2017
DK04.10.2017
EE04.10.2017
FI04.10.2017
HR04.10.2017
LT04.10.2017
LV04.10.2017
MC04.10.2017
NL04.10.2017
RS04.10.2017
SI04.10.2017
SK04.10.2017
SM04.10.2017
BG04.01.2018
NO04.01.2018
GR05.01.2018
IS04.02.2018
IE06.02.2018
LU06.02.2018
CH28.02.2018
LI28.02.2018
[2019/09]
Former [2018/52]AT04.10.2017
CZ04.10.2017
DK04.10.2017
EE04.10.2017
FI04.10.2017
HR04.10.2017
LT04.10.2017
LV04.10.2017
MC04.10.2017
NL04.10.2017
RS04.10.2017
SI04.10.2017
SK04.10.2017
SM04.10.2017
BG04.01.2018
NO04.01.2018
GR05.01.2018
IS04.02.2018
LU06.02.2018
CH28.02.2018
LI28.02.2018
Former [2018/44]AT04.10.2017
CZ04.10.2017
DK04.10.2017
EE04.10.2017
FI04.10.2017
HR04.10.2017
LT04.10.2017
LV04.10.2017
MC04.10.2017
NL04.10.2017
RS04.10.2017
SK04.10.2017
SM04.10.2017
BG04.01.2018
NO04.01.2018
GR05.01.2018
IS04.02.2018
Former [2018/37]AT04.10.2017
CZ04.10.2017
DK04.10.2017
EE04.10.2017
FI04.10.2017
HR04.10.2017
LT04.10.2017
LV04.10.2017
NL04.10.2017
RS04.10.2017
SK04.10.2017
SM04.10.2017
BG04.01.2018
NO04.01.2018
GR05.01.2018
IS04.02.2018
Former [2018/35]AT04.10.2017
CZ04.10.2017
DK04.10.2017
EE04.10.2017
FI04.10.2017
HR04.10.2017
LT04.10.2017
LV04.10.2017
NL04.10.2017
RS04.10.2017
SK04.10.2017
BG04.01.2018
NO04.01.2018
GR05.01.2018
IS04.02.2018
Former [2018/24]AT04.10.2017
FI04.10.2017
HR04.10.2017
LT04.10.2017
LV04.10.2017
NL04.10.2017
RS04.10.2017
BG04.01.2018
NO04.01.2018
GR05.01.2018
IS04.02.2018
Former [2018/22]FI04.10.2017
LT04.10.2017
NL04.10.2017
NO04.01.2018
Former [2018/17]NL04.10.2017
Documents cited:Search[A]JP2011241430  (SUMITOMO METAL IND) [A] 1-6 * abstract *
International search[A]JP2010248601  (SUMITOMO METAL INDUSTRIES, LTD.);
 [A]JP2010285657  (NIPPON STEEL CORP.);
 [A]JP2008156680  (NIPPON STEEL CORP.)
by applicantJP2010285656
 JP2010285657
 JP2008106352
 JP2008190032
 JP2009114523