Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2815309

EP2815309 - GENERATING AND CACHING SOFTWARE CODE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  20.01.2017
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip08.03.2019New entry: Reply to examination report 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Microsoft Technology Licensing, LLC
One Microsoft Way
Redmond, WA 98052 / US
[2015/19]
Former [2014/52]For all designated states
Microsoft Corporation
One Microsoft Way
Redmond, WA 98052-6399 / US
Inventor(s)01 / FISHER, Jomo
c/o Microsoft Corporation
LCA - International Patents
One Microsoft Way
Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US
02 / JACKSON, Michael Wayne
c/o Microsoft Corporation
LCA - International Patents
One Microsoft Way
Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US
03 / KILIC, Yunus
c/o Microsoft Corporation
LCA - International Patents
One Microsoft Way
Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US
04 / LUCCO, Steven Edward
c/o Microsoft Corporation
LCA - International Patents
One Microsoft Way
Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US
05 / MCGATHA, Jesse D.
c/o Microsoft Corporation
LCA - International Patents
One Microsoft Way
Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US
06 / MIADOWICZ, Jedrzej Z.
c/o Microsoft Corporation
LCA - International Patents
One Microsoft Way
Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US
07 / STEINER, Steven J.
c/o Microsoft Corporation
LCA - International Patents
One Microsoft Way
Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US
 [2014/52]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstraße 4
80802 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/52]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
Application number, filing date13748809.404.02.2013
WO2013US24559
Priority number, dateUS20121337147913.02.2012         Original published format: US201213371479
[2014/52]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013122758
Date:22.08.2013
Language:EN
[2013/34]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2815309
Date:24.12.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.08.2013
[2014/52]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR22.08.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.10.2015
ClassificationInternational:G06F9/06, G06F9/30, G06F9/44, G06F9/45, G06F9/445
[2015/45]
Former International [2014/52]G06F9/06, G06F9/30, G06F9/44
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/52]
TitleGerman:ERZEUGUNG UND ZWISCHENSPEICHERUNG VON SOFTWARECODES[2014/52]
English:GENERATING AND CACHING SOFTWARE CODE[2014/52]
French:PRODUCTION ET MISE EN MÉMOIRE CACHE DE CODE DE LOGICIEL[2014/52]
Entry into regional phase04.08.2014National basic fee paid 
04.08.2014Search fee paid 
04.08.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
04.08.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure04.08.2014Examination requested  [2014/52]
01.04.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
02.09.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
12.01.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.08.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
07.03.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  02.09.2016
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.02.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
10.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
10.02.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
14.02.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
13.02.2019Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[XI]  - EDWARD C BAILEY, "Maximum RPM - Taking the Red Hat Package Manager to the Limit", INTERNET CITATION, (20000229), URL: http://www.redhat.com/docs/books/max-rpm/max-rpm.pdf, (20080123), XP007903923 [X] 1 * page 33 - page 59 * * page 155 - page 158 * * page 371 - page 373 * [I] 2-10
International search[A]US2010030891  (KIM JONG HYUN [KR], et al);
 [A]US2008010594  (HOERENTRUP JOBST [DE], et al);
 [A]US7596554  (DA PALMA WILLIAM V [US], et al);
 [A]US2005240732  (CRICK DARL A [CA], et al)
by applicant   - EDWARD C BAILEY, "Maximum RPM - Taking the Red Hat Package Manager to the Limit", INTERNET CITATION, URL: http://www.redhat.com/docs/books/max-rpm/max-rpm.pdf