Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2815545

EP2815545 - METHODS AND ARRANGEMENTS FOR PACKET FLOWS IN WIRELESS NETWORKS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  27.09.2019
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  27.05.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  19.04.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  12.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip27.09.2019(Expected) grantpublished on 30.10.2019 [2019/44]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Intel Corporation
2200 Mission College Boulevard
Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US
[2019/44]
Former [2014/52]For all designated states
Intel Corporation
2200 Mission College Boulevard
Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US
Inventor(s)01 / TETZLAFF, Thomas, A.
922 NW 11th Avenue 515
Portland Oregon 97209 / US
 [2014/52]
Representative(s)HGF Limited
Fountain Precinct
Balm Green
Sheffield S1 2JA / GB
[2014/52]
Application number, filing date13748906.813.02.2013
[2019/44]
WO2013US25928
Priority number, dateUS201261600040P17.02.2012         Original published format: US 201261600040 P
US20121373098329.12.2012         Original published format: US201213730983
[2014/52]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013123042
Date:22.08.2013
Language:EN
[2013/34]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2815545
Date:24.12.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.08.2013
[2014/52]
Type: B1  Patent specification
No.:EP2815545
Date:30.10.2019
Language:EN
[2019/44]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR22.08.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.09.2015
ClassificationInternational:H04L12/70
[2014/52]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/52]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND ANORDNUNGEN FÜR PAKETSTRÖMEN IN DRAHTLOSEN NETZWERKEN[2014/52]
English:METHODS AND ARRANGEMENTS FOR PACKET FLOWS IN WIRELESS NETWORKS[2014/52]
French:PROCÉDÉS ET AGENCEMENTS POUR FLUX DE PAQUETS DANS DES RÉSEAUX SANS FIL[2014/52]
Entry into regional phase25.07.2014National basic fee paid 
25.07.2014Search fee paid 
25.07.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
25.07.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure25.07.2014Examination requested  [2014/52]
11.04.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
13.12.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.04.2019Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
27.05.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.09.2019Fee for grant paid
18.09.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
18.09.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  13.12.2018
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.02.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
10.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
10.02.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
14.02.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
13.02.2019Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[A]EP1775899  (MALIBU NETWORKS INC [US]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0138] - paragraph [0156] * * paragraph [0322] - paragraph [0395]; figures 6-12 *;
 [A]US2010121971  (SHAO HUAI-RONG [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0024]; figures 1-3 * * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0039]; figure 4 *
International search[X]US2005249222  (VAN KAMPEN HARALD [NL], et al);
 [Y]US7920590  (LE KHIEM [US], et al);
 [A]US2010142560  (SHARIVKER OFER [IL], et al);
 [A]US2011019695  (WU CHIH-CHIANG [TW], et al);
 [A]US2002142730  (HSU RAYMOND T [US])
by applicantEP1775899
 US2010121971
 US2005249222
 US7920590