Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2815078

EP2815078 - GAS TURBINE ENGINE COMPONENT WITH IMPINGEMENT AND LOBED COOLING HOLE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  21.11.2014
Database last updated on 12.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip22.02.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
United Technologies Corporation
10 Farm Springs Road
Farmington, CT 06032 / US
[2016/43]
Former [2014/52]For all designated states
United Technologies Corporation
One Financial Plaza
Hartford, CT 06101 / US
Inventor(s)01 / XU, JinQuan
30 Frederick T. Miller Way
East Greenwich, RI 02818 / US
 [2014/52]
Representative(s)Dehns
St. Bride's House
10 Salisbury Square
London EC4Y 8JD / GB
[N/P]
Former [2014/52]Leckey, David Herbert
Dehns
St Bride's House
10 Salisbury Square
London
EC4Y 8JD / GB
Application number, filing date13749061.114.02.2013
WO2013US26040
Priority number, dateUS201261599315P15.02.2012         Original published format: US 201261599315 P
US20121354425709.07.2012         Original published format: US201213544257
[2014/52]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013123120
Date:22.08.2013
Language:EN
[2013/34]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2815078
Date:24.12.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.08.2013
[2014/52]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR22.08.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP01.12.2015
ClassificationInternational:F01D5/18, F01D9/06, F23R3/00, F23R3/06
[2016/01]
Former International [2014/52]F01D5/18, F01D25/12, F02C7/12
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/52]
TitleGerman:GASTURBINENMOTORKOMPONENTE MIT PRALL- UND GELAPPTEN KÜHLUNGSLÖCHERN[2014/52]
English:GAS TURBINE ENGINE COMPONENT WITH IMPINGEMENT AND LOBED COOLING HOLE[2014/52]
French:COMPOSANT DE MOTEUR À TURBINE À GAZ AYANT UN TROU DE CONTACT ET DE REFROIDISSEMENT À LOBES[2014/52]
Entry into regional phase09.09.2014National basic fee paid 
09.09.2014Search fee paid 
09.09.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
09.09.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure09.09.2014Examination requested  [2014/52]
28.06.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.02.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
25.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
23.02.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
22.02.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
20.02.2019Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[XYI]EP1691033  (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [X] 1,3,4,6-8,15 * figures 3,6 * [Y] 5,10,11,13,14 [I] 2,9,12;
 [Y]WO9412775  (UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORP [US]) [Y] 1-15 * figures 5-7b *;
 [YA]EP1609949  (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [Y] 1-10,12,15 * figures 6-8 * [A] 11,13,14;
 [YA]JPH1089005  (TOSHIBA CORP) [Y] 1-4,6-10,12,15 * figures 16-18 * [A] 5,11,13,14;
 [YA]EP2083147  (IHI CORP [JP]) [Y] 1-9,11,12,15 * figure 4 * [A] 10,13,14;
 [Y]EP0798448  (ABB RESEARCH LTD [CH]) [Y] 13,14 * figure 3 *
International search[Y]US2011293423  (BUNKER ET AL.);
 [Y]US4153386  (LEOGRANDE ET AL.);
 [A]US2010068068  (LIANG, GEORGE);
 [A]US2009074575  (PROPHETER-HINCKEY ET AL.);
 [A]US7997868  (LIANG, GEORGE)
by applicantEP1691033
 WO9412775
 EP1609949
 JPH1089005
 EP2083147
 EP0798488