Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2815078


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
22.02.2019 New entry: Renewal fee paid
23.05.2018 Change - representative
27.02.2018 New entry: Renewal fee paid
27.02.2017 New entry: Renewal fee paid
23.09.2016 Change - applicant published on  26.10.2016  [2016/43]
30.06.2016 Amendment by applicant
29.02.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
27.11.2015 Change - classification published on  30.12.2015  [2015/53]
27.11.2015 Change - classification published on  30.12.2015  [2015/53]
27.11.2015 Change - date of supplementary search report published on  30.12.2015  [2015/53]
08.05.2015 Amendment by applicant
17.04.2015 Change - extension states published on  20.05.2015  [2015/21]
14.02.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
21.11.2014 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  24.12.2014  [2014/52]
21.11.2014 Request for examination filed published on  24.12.2014  [2014/52]
01.11.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
10.10.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
12.09.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
10.09.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
06.09.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
23.08.2013 PCT data prior to European publication