Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2814947

EP2814947 - PHENOTYPE PROFILE OF HUMAN RETINAL PROGENITOR CELLS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  27.09.2019
Database last updated on 19.10.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  19.10.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  30.05.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  07.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip18.10.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): LU
published on 20.11.2019 [2019/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Schepens Eye Research Institute
20 Staniford Street
Boston, MA 02114 / US
[2018/47]
Former [2014/52]For all designated states
Schepens Eye Research Institute
20 Staniford Street
Boston, MA 02114 / US
Inventor(s)01 / YOUNG, Michael, J.
80 Prospect Street Apt. 1
Gloucester, MA 01930 / US
02 / BARANOV, Petr, Y.
19 Loring Street Apt. 2
Somerville, MA 02143 / US
 [2014/52]
Representative(s)Elkington and Fife LLP
Prospect House
8 Pembroke Road
Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB
[N/P]
Former [2018/47]Truscott, Glyn John
Elkington and Fife LLP
Thavies Inn House
3-4 Holborn Circus
London EC1N 2HA / GB
Former [2014/52]Carpmaels & Ransford LLP
One Southampton Row
London WC1B 5HA / GB
Application number, filing date13749143.715.02.2013
[2018/47]
WO2013US26286
Priority number, dateUS201261600288P17.02.2012         Original published format: US 201261600288 P
[2014/52]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013123292
Date:22.08.2013
Language:EN
[2013/34]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2814947
Date:24.12.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.08.2013
[2014/52]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2814947
Date:21.11.2018
Language:EN
[2018/47]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US22.08.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP10.07.2015
ClassificationInternational:C12N5/00, C12N5/0797, G01N33/569, A61K35/30
[2015/33]
Former International [2014/52]C12N5/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/52]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:PHÄNOTYPENPROFIL MENSCHLICHER RETINA-VORLÄUFERZELLEN[2014/52]
English:PHENOTYPE PROFILE OF HUMAN RETINAL PROGENITOR CELLS[2014/52]
French:PROFIL PHÉNOTYPIQUE DE CELLULES PROGÉNITRICES HUMAINES DE LA RÉTINE[2014/52]
Entry into regional phase11.09.2014National basic fee paid 
11.09.2014Search fee paid 
11.09.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
11.09.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure16.12.2013Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
11.09.2014Examination requested  [2014/52]
05.02.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
25.04.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
02.11.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.07.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
30.11.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
31.05.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.10.2018Fee for grant paid
09.10.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
09.10.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)EP18207320.5  / EP3492586
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  25.04.2016
Opposition(s)22.08.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/44]
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.02.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
10.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
10.02.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
26.02.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL21.11.2018
AT21.11.2018
CZ21.11.2018
DK21.11.2018
EE21.11.2018
FI21.11.2018
HR21.11.2018
LT21.11.2018
LV21.11.2018
MC21.11.2018
PL21.11.2018
RO21.11.2018
RS21.11.2018
SE21.11.2018
SK21.11.2018
SM21.11.2018
LU15.02.2019
BG21.02.2019
NO21.02.2019
GR22.02.2019
IS21.03.2019
PT21.03.2019
[2019/47]
Former [2019/45]AL21.11.2018
AT21.11.2018
CZ21.11.2018
DK21.11.2018
EE21.11.2018
FI21.11.2018
HR21.11.2018
LT21.11.2018
LV21.11.2018
MC21.11.2018
PL21.11.2018
RO21.11.2018
RS21.11.2018
SE21.11.2018
SK21.11.2018
SM21.11.2018
BG21.02.2019
NO21.02.2019
GR22.02.2019
IS21.03.2019
PT21.03.2019
Former [2019/40]AL21.11.2018
AT21.11.2018
CZ21.11.2018
DK21.11.2018
EE21.11.2018
FI21.11.2018
HR21.11.2018
LT21.11.2018
LV21.11.2018
PL21.11.2018
RO21.11.2018
RS21.11.2018
SE21.11.2018
SK21.11.2018
SM21.11.2018
BG21.02.2019
NO21.02.2019
GR22.02.2019
IS21.03.2019
PT21.03.2019
Former [2019/37]AL21.11.2018
AT21.11.2018
CZ21.11.2018
DK21.11.2018
EE21.11.2018
FI21.11.2018
HR21.11.2018
LT21.11.2018
LV21.11.2018
PL21.11.2018
RO21.11.2018
RS21.11.2018
SE21.11.2018
SM21.11.2018
BG21.02.2019
NO21.02.2019
GR22.02.2019
IS21.03.2019
PT21.03.2019
Former [2019/35]AL21.11.2018
AT21.11.2018
CZ21.11.2018
DK21.11.2018
FI21.11.2018
HR21.11.2018
LT21.11.2018
LV21.11.2018
PL21.11.2018
RS21.11.2018
SE21.11.2018
BG21.02.2019
NO21.02.2019
GR22.02.2019
IS21.03.2019
PT21.03.2019
Former [2019/34]AL21.11.2018
AT21.11.2018
DK21.11.2018
FI21.11.2018
HR21.11.2018
LT21.11.2018
LV21.11.2018
RS21.11.2018
SE21.11.2018
BG21.02.2019
NO21.02.2019
GR22.02.2019
IS21.03.2019
PT21.03.2019
Former [2019/26]AL21.11.2018
AT21.11.2018
FI21.11.2018
HR21.11.2018
LT21.11.2018
LV21.11.2018
RS21.11.2018
SE21.11.2018
BG21.02.2019
NO21.02.2019
GR22.02.2019
IS21.03.2019
PT21.03.2019
Former [2019/25]AT21.11.2018
FI21.11.2018
HR21.11.2018
LT21.11.2018
LV21.11.2018
RS21.11.2018
SE21.11.2018
BG21.02.2019
NO21.02.2019
GR22.02.2019
IS21.03.2019
Former [2019/24]AT21.11.2018
FI21.11.2018
HR21.11.2018
LT21.11.2018
LV21.11.2018
SE21.11.2018
BG21.02.2019
NO21.02.2019
GR22.02.2019
IS21.03.2019
Former [2019/23]AT21.11.2018
FI21.11.2018
HR21.11.2018
LT21.11.2018
LV21.11.2018
BG21.02.2019
NO21.02.2019
IS21.03.2019
Former [2019/22]FI21.11.2018
LT21.11.2018
BG21.02.2019
NO21.02.2019
IS21.03.2019
Former [2019/21]FI21.11.2018
LT21.11.2018
NO21.02.2019
IS21.03.2019
Former [2019/20]LT21.11.2018
NO21.02.2019
Documents cited:Search[XY]WO0158460  (SCHEPENS EYE RES INST [US]; YOUNG MICHAEL J [US]; KLASSEN HENRY [US];) [X] 1-3,11,13,14 * the whole document * * example 2 * * page 13, line 27 - line 30 * * claims 27-45 * [Y] 4-10,12,15;
 [XP]WO2012158910  (UNIV CALIFORNIA [US]; KLASSEN HENRY [US]; YANG JING [US]) [XP] 1-3,11,13,14 * the whole document *;
 [XY]  - P YANG, "In Vitro Isolation and Expansion of Human Retinal Progenitor Cells", EXPERIMENTAL NEUROLOGY, (20020901), vol. 177, no. 1, doi:10.1006/exnr.2002.7955, ISSN 0014-4886, pages 326 - 331, XP055196869 [X] 1-3,11 * the whole document * [Y] 4-10,12,15

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/exnr.2002.7955
 [A]  - B. L. K. COLES ET AL, "Facile isolation and the characterization of human retinal stem cells", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES, (20041102), vol. 101, no. 44, doi:10.1073/pnas.0401596101, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 15772 - 15777, XP055196879 [A] 1-15 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.0401596101
International search[Y]US2011064701  (YOUNG ET AL);
 [Y]US2006223177  (HARRIS ET AL);
 [Y]US2009170101  (LEWIS ET AL);
 [Y]  - KLASSEN ET AL., "Isolation of Retinal Progenitor Cells From Post-Mortem Human Tissue and Comparison With Autologous Brain Progenitors.", JOURNAL OF NEUROSCIENCE RESEARCH, (200406), vol. 77, pages 334 - 343, XP055080904

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/jnr.20183
 [A]  - HERRERA ET AL., "Isolation and Characterization of a Stem Cell Population from Adult Human Liver", STEM CELLS, (20060831), vol. 24, no. 12, pages 2840 - 2850, XP008146144

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1634/stemcells.2006-0114
Examination   - AFTAB U ET AL, "Growth kinetics and transplantation of human retinal progenitor cells", EXPERIMENTAL EYE RESEARCH, ACADEMIC PRESS LTD, LONDON, vol. 89, no. 3, ISSN 0014-4835, (20090901), pages 301 - 310, (20090612), XP026396008
    - JING LUO ET AL, "Human Retinal Progenitor Cell Transplantation Preserves Vision", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, US, (20140109), vol. 289, no. 10, doi:10.1074/jbc.M113.513713, ISSN 0021-9258, pages 6362 - 6371, XP055389044

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.M113.513713
by applicantUS7514259
 US6468794
 US7015037
 US6908763
 US7749754
 US7781179
 US4683195
    - CARTER et al., BMC Ophthalmology, (20090000), vol. 9, page 1
    - YUAN et al., Plos One, (20110300), vol. 6, no. 3, page e17540
    - KLASSEN et al., Journal of Neuroscience Research, (20040800), vol. 77, no. 3
    - Methods in Enzymology, Academic Press, Inc.
    - WARD et al., Nature, (19890000), vol. 341, pages 544 - 546
    - BIRD et al., Science, (19880000), vol. 242, pages 423 - 426
    - HUSTON et al., Proc. Natl. Acad Sci., (19880000), vol. 85, pages 5879 - 5883
    - KLASSEN, H.J. et al., "Multipotent Retinal Progenitors Express Developmental Markers, Differentiate into Retinal Neurons, and Preserve Light-Mediated Behavior", Invest. Opthalmol. Vis. Sci., (20040000), vol. 45, no. 11, doi:doi:10.1167/iovs.04-0511, pages 4167 - 4173, XP055153656

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1167/iovs.04-0511
    - KLASSEN, H. et al., "Isolation of Retinal Progenitor Cells from Post-Mortem Human Tissue and comparison with Autologous Brain Progenitors", J. Neuroscience Research, (20040000), vol. 77, no. 3, doi:doi:10.1002/jnr.20183, pages 334 - 343, XP055080904

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/jnr.20183
    - KLASSEN, H. et al., "Progenitor Cells from the Porcine Neural Retina Express Photoreceptor Markers after Transplantation to the Subretinal Space of Allorecipients", Stem Cells, (20070000), vol. 25, no. 5, doi:doi:10.1634/stemcells.2006-0541, pages 1222 - 1230, XP055137270

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1634/stemcells.2006-0541