Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2815011

EP2815011 - COOLING POLYAMIDE YARN [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  22.06.2018
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip25.09.2019New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Nilit Ltd.
P.O.B. 276
Ramat Gabriel
23102 Migdal Ha'emek / IL
[2014/52]
Inventor(s)01 / WEISER, Alon
18 Tyomkin Street
42383 Netanya / IL
02 / ZUABI, Abed Alrahman
3011/15 Halet Aldeer Street
16124 Nazareth / IL
03 / AFEK, Uri
36 HaShomrim Street
36000 Kiryat Tivon / IL
 [2014/52]
Representative(s)Chevalier, Renaud Philippe , et al
Cabinet Germain & Maureau
BP 6153
69466 Lyon Cedex 06 / FR
[2014/52]
Application number, filing date13749149.410.02.2013
WO2013IL50122
Priority number, dateIL2012021808213.02.2012         Original published format: IL 21808212
[2014/52]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013121419
Date:22.08.2013
Language:EN
[2013/34]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2815011
Date:24.12.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.08.2013
[2014/52]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:IL22.08.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP16.09.2015
ClassificationInternational:D02G3/44, D01D5/08, D01F1/10, D01F6/90, D01H1/11, A41D13/005, D01D5/12, D01H1/115, D02G3/04, D03D15/00, D04B1/16, D01F6/60, D01D5/253
[2015/42]
Former International [2014/52]D02G3/44, D01D5/08, D01F1/10, D01F6/90, D01H1/11, A41D13/005
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/52]
TitleGerman:KÜHLUNG EINES POLYAMIDGARNS[2014/52]
English:COOLING POLYAMIDE YARN[2014/52]
French:FIL DE POLYAMIDE REFROIDISSANT[2014/52]
Entry into regional phase11.09.2014National basic fee paid 
11.09.2014Search fee paid 
11.09.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
11.09.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure12.12.2013Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: IL
11.09.2014Examination requested  [2014/52]
11.04.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
26.06.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
30.10.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.11.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.03.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.09.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  26.06.2018
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
26.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
10.02.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
14.02.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
13.02.2019Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[IY]US2004237598  (FUKURO TADAYUKI [JP], et al) [I] 1-8 * paragraphs [0110] - [0008] - [0017] , [0025] , [0026] , [0035] , [0036] , [0038] , [0041] , [0042] , [0045] , [0046] , [0057] , [0058] , [0090]; figures 1-3 * [Y] 1-8;
 [Y]US2009119822  (SUETO SOICHI [JP], et al) [Y] 1-8 * paragraphs [0011] , [0012] , [0021] , [0022] , [0023] , [0027] , [0062] , [0077] - [0084] *
International search[Y]US6886369  (FUKURO T. ET. AL);
 [A]EP1188853  (ASAHI CHEMICAL IND.);
 [A]JP2008285780  (UNITIKA FIBERS LTD);
 [A]US2009119822  (SUETO SOICHI ET. AL);
 [A]US6652965  (MERIGOLD R. J. ET. AL);
 [A]US2010021679  (ROBERT G.)