Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2815037

EP2815037 - HEIGHT ADJUSTABLE SHIPPING CONTAINER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  24.03.2017
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip22.11.2019New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Lifting Point Pty Ltd
81 Henry St
Penrith New South Wales 2750 / AU
[2014/52]
Inventor(s)01 / MULLANEY, Nicholas Bruce
50 Wool Shed Lane
Marulan New South Wales 2579 / AU
 [2014/52]
Representative(s)Lloyd, Robin , et al
Kilburn & Strode LLP
Lacon London
84 Theobalds Road
London WC1X 8NL / GB
[N/P]
Former [2014/52]Lloyd, Robin , et al
Kilburn & Strode LLP
20 Red Lion Street
London WC1R 4PJ / GB
Application number, filing date13749211.212.02.2013
WO2013AU00117
Priority number, dateAU2012090057017.02.2012         Original published format: AU 2012900570
[2014/52]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013120129
Date:22.08.2013
Language:EN
[2013/34]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2815037
Date:24.12.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.08.2013
[2014/52]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:AU22.08.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.11.2015
ClassificationInternational:E04B1/343, E04B1/18, E04H1/00, E04B1/36, E04H5/00, B65D88/12
[2014/52]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/52]
TitleGerman:HÖHENVERSTELLBARER TRANSPORTBEHÄLTER[2014/52]
English:HEIGHT ADJUSTABLE SHIPPING CONTAINER[2014/52]
French:CONTENEUR D'EXPÉDITION RÉGLABLE EN HAUTEUR[2014/52]
Entry into regional phase08.08.2014National basic fee paid 
08.08.2014Search fee paid 
08.08.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
08.08.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure15.11.2013Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: AU
08.08.2014Examination requested  [2014/52]
20.05.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
23.03.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
26.07.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.11.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  23.03.2017
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.02.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
10.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
02.02.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
22.02.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
21.02.2019Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[XI]US2005284035  (DEOVANDO MICHAEL J [US], et al) [X] 1,2 * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0064]; figures 1-16 * [I] 3-12,15;
 [XI]AU2010202450  (SCALES ALEXANDER PATRICK [AU]) [X] 1,2 * page 7, line 1 - page 18, line 13; figures 1-15 * [I] 3-12,15;
 [A]FR2557620  (LEPOITTEVIN YVES [FR]) [A] 1-12,15 * abstract *;
 [A]WO2011110725  (MARTELO MUNOZ PABLO [ES]) [A] 1-12,15 * abstract *;
 [A]US5829205  (CLARK RICK D [CA], et al) [A] 1-12,15 * abstract *;
 [E]EP2657414  (BIKKER MARCEL ADRIAAN DIRK [NL]) [E] 1,2 * the whole document *
International search[X]GB2085507  (PORTAKABIN LTD);
 [X]US2011023925  (JOHNSON BRIAN D [CA], et al);
 [X]US6112929  (OTA HIDEYUKI [JP])