Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2815271

EP2815271 - ANAMORPHIC LIGHT GUIDE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  23.11.2018
Database last updated on 19.10.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  14.04.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip23.11.2018Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 26.12.2018  [2018/52]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
3M Innovative Properties Company
3M Center
P.O.Box 33427
St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US
[N/P]
Former [2014/52]For all designated states
3M Innovative Properties Company
3M Center Post Office Box 33427
Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US
Inventor(s)01 / OUDERKIRK, Andrew J.
3M Center
Post Office Box 33427
Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US
02 / LEE, Justina Sze Ying
1 Yishun Avenue 7
Singapore 768923 / SG
03 / PALANISWAMY, Ravi
1 Yishun Avenue 7
Singapore 768923 / SG
04 / JESUDOSS, Arokiaraj
1 Yishun Avenue 7
Singapore 768923 / SG
05 / INGHAM, Kelly Reed
3M Center
Post Office Box 33427
Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US
 [2014/52]
Representative(s)Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/52]Vossius & Partner
Siebertstrasse 4
81675 München / DE
Application number, filing date13749225.224.01.2013
WO2013US22923
Priority number, dateUS201261599971P17.02.2012         Original published format: US 201261599971 P
[2014/52]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013122728
Date:22.08.2013
Language:EN
[2013/34]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2815271
Date:24.12.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.08.2013
[2014/52]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR22.08.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.09.2015
ClassificationInternational:G02F1/13357, F21V8/00, G02B6/00, G02F1/1335
[2015/40]
Former International [2014/52]G02F1/13357, F21V8/00, G02B6/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/52]
TitleGerman:ANAMORPHER LICHTLEITER[2014/52]
English:ANAMORPHIC LIGHT GUIDE[2014/52]
French:GUIDE DE LUMIÈRE ANAMORPHIQUE[2014/52]
Entry into regional phase13.08.2014National basic fee paid 
13.08.2014Search fee paid 
13.08.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
13.08.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure13.08.2014Examination requested  [2014/52]
29.03.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
12.04.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
10.08.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.08.2018Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2018/52]
23.08.2018Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2018/52]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  12.04.2017
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
11.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
11.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.01.201806   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XI]US2010315833  (HOLMAN ROBERT L [US] ET AL) [X] 1-5,11 * paragraph [0197] - paragraph [0216] * * figure 3 * [I] 6-10,12-15;
 [XI]US2006239032  (OHKAWA SHINGO [JP]) [X] 1-4,6,11-13 * paragraph [0049] - paragraph [0138] * * figures 1-18 * [I] 5,7-10,14,15;
 [A]WO2007046100  (OMS DISPLAYS LTD [IL]; SHANI YOSI [IL]) [A] 1-15 * page 30, line 1 - page 41, line 29 * * page 60, line 13 - page 61, line 13 * * figures 3-27 *;
 [A]US2010289986  (SHIKII SHINICHI [JP] ET AL) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0068] - paragraph [0091] * * figures 2, 3 *
International search[X]JP2010103060  (PANASONIC ELECTRIC WORKS CO., LTD.);
 [Y]US2009316431  (TAKAYUKI NAGATA ET AL.);
 [Y]US2008304791  (KENICHI TAKATORI ET AL.);
 [A]WO2009099547  (DIGITAL OPTICS INTERNATIONAL, LLC.);
 [A]JP2008277078  (OPTREX CORP.)