Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2816542

EP2816542 - DISPLAY DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  03.11.2017
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  17.02.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip03.11.2017Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 06.12.2017  [2017/49]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Nippon Seiki Co., Ltd.
2-34 Higashi-Zaoh 2-chome
Nagaoka-shi, Niigata 940-8580 / JP
[2014/52]
Inventor(s)01 / FUJITA, Yutaka
c/o Nippon Seiki, Co., Ltd.
2-2-34 Higashi Zoah
Nagaoka, Niigata / JP
02 / OKAJI, Yusuke
c/o Nippon Seiki, Co., Ltd.
2-2-34 Higashi Zoah
Nagaoka, Niigata / JP
 [2014/52]
Representative(s)Carpmaels & Ransford LLP
One Southampton Row
London WC1B 5HA / GB
[2014/52]
Application number, filing date13749298.906.02.2013
WO2013JP52645
Priority number, dateJP2012003090715.02.2012         Original published format: JP 2012030907
[2014/52]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013121937
Date:22.08.2013
Language:JA
[2013/34]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2816542
Date:24.12.2014
Language:EN
[2014/52]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP22.08.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.02.2016
ClassificationInternational:H05K5/00, H05K7/14, H05K9/00, G02F1/1333
[2016/10]
Former International [2014/52]G09F9/00, G02F1/1333
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/52]
TitleGerman:ANZEIGEVORRICHTUNG[2014/52]
English:DISPLAY DEVICE[2014/52]
French:DISPOSITIF DE PRÉSENTATION[2014/52]
Entry into regional phase01.09.2014Translation filed 
01.09.2014National basic fee paid 
01.09.2014Search fee paid 
01.09.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
01.09.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure01.09.2014Examination requested  [2014/52]
15.08.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
20.02.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
04.07.2017Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2017/49]
27.07.2017Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2017/49]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  20.02.2017
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.02.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
10.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
10.02.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[X]US2006110949  (JEE AHN-HO [KR] ET AL) [X] 1-7 * the whole document *
International search[Y]JP2005209868  (CASIO COMPUTER CO., LTD.);
 [Y]JP2006067317  (KYOCERA CORP.);
 [Y]JP2009237220  (NIPPON SEIKI CO., LTD.);
 [Y]WO2008010280  (HITACHI, LTD.);
 [A]JP2000147545  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD.);
 [A]JP2001075485  (TOSHIBA CORP.)
by applicantJPS5188388