Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2815359

EP2815359 - AGGREGATING AVAILABILITY STATUS INFORMATION ON SHARED CALENDARS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  07.07.2017
Database last updated on 22.05.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  01.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip07.07.2017Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 09.08.2017  [2017/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Microsoft Technology Licensing, LLC
One Microsoft Way
Redmond, WA 98052 / US
[2015/19]
Former [2014/52]For all designated states
Microsoft Corporation
One Microsoft Way
Redmond, WA 98052-6399 / US
Inventor(s)01 / MACKENZIE, Mark
c/o Microsoft Corporation
LCA - International Patents
One Microsoft Way
Redmond, WA 98052-6399 / US
02 / COOK, Jason
c/o Microsoft Corporation
LCA - International Patents
One Microsoft Way
Redmond, WA 98052-6399 / US
03 / TISCHHAUSER, Paul
c/o Microsoft Corporation
LCA - International Patents
One Microsoft Way
Redmond, WA 98052-6399 / US
 [2014/52]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstraße 4
80802 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/52]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
Application number, filing date13749346.611.02.2013
WO2013US25481
Priority number, dateUS20121339997917.02.2012         Original published format: US201213399979
[2014/52]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013122842
Date:22.08.2013
Language:EN
[2013/34]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2815359
Date:24.12.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.08.2013
[2014/52]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR22.08.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.10.2015
ClassificationInternational:G06Q10/10
[2014/52]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/52]
TitleGerman:AGGREGIEREN VON VERFÜGBARKEITSZUSTANDSINFORMATIONEN ÜBER GEMEINSAME KALENDER[2014/52]
English:AGGREGATING AVAILABILITY STATUS INFORMATION ON SHARED CALENDARS[2014/52]
French:AGRÉGATION D'INFORMATIONS D'ÉTAT DE DISPONIBILITÉ SUR DES AGENDAS PARTAGÉS[2014/52]
Entry into regional phase06.08.2014National basic fee paid 
06.08.2014Search fee paid 
06.08.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
06.08.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure06.08.2014Examination requested  [2014/52]
20.04.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
20.10.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
01.03.2017Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2017/32]
27.03.2017Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2017/32]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  20.10.2016
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.02.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
10.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
10.02.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search   [] - No further relevant documents disclosed,
International search[Y]US2009255153  (MORI YASUHIKO [JP], et al);
 [Y]US2008141142  (LYLE RUTHIE D [US], et al);
 [A]US2005102245  (EDLUND STEFAN B [US], et al);
 [A]US2011137992  (MICHEL THEODORE L [US], et al);
 [A]US2009248480  (MIKSOVSKY JAN THOMAS [US])