Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2814497

EP2814497 - METHODS FOR TREATING PSORIASIS AND VASCULAR INFLAMMATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  28.10.2016
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip28.10.2016Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 30.11.2016  [2016/48]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Vascular Biogenics Ltd.
6 Jonathan Netanyahu Street
60376 Or Yehuda / IL
[2014/52]
Inventor(s)01 / SHER, Naamit
3 Paldi Street
76248 Rechovot / IL
02 / LEUBITZ, Andrea
7 Haktoret Street
90435 Efrat / IL
03 / BREITBART, Eyal
27 Ha Yitzhar Street
73127 Hashmonaim / IL
 [2014/52]
Representative(s)Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/52]Vossius & Partner
Siebertstrasse 4
81675 München / DE
Application number, filing date13749412.615.02.2013
WO2013IB00780
Priority number, dateUS201261599493P16.02.2012         Original published format: US 201261599493 P
US201261611276P15.03.2012         Original published format: US 201261611276 P
US201261723605P07.11.2012         Original published format: US 201261723605 P
[2014/52]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2013121300
Date:22.08.2013
Language:EN
[2013/34]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2814497
Date:24.12.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.08.2013
[2014/52]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US27.12.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.11.2015
ClassificationInternational:A61K31/685, A61P17/06, A61P9/10, A61P29/00, A61P37/00
[2015/33]
Former International [2014/52]A61K31/685
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/52]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON PSORIASIS UND GEFÄSSENTZÜNDUNG[2014/52]
English:METHODS FOR TREATING PSORIASIS AND VASCULAR INFLAMMATION[2014/52]
French:PROCÉDÉS DE TRAITEMENT DU PSORIASIS ET DE L'INFLAMMATION VASCULAIRE[2014/52]
Entry into regional phase10.09.2014National basic fee paid 
10.09.2014Search fee paid 
10.09.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
10.09.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedCommunication of intention to grant the patent
10.09.2014Examination requested  [2014/52]
08.04.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
07.06.2016Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2016/48]
13.07.2016Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2016/48]
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.02.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
29.02.201604   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]WO2004106486  (VASCULAR BIOGENICS LTD [IL]; HARATS DROR [IL]; GEORGE JACOB [IL]; HALP) [X] 16 * Examples VII, X, XI, XII; claims 19, 68, 71 *;
 [E]WO2013088245  (VASCULAR BIOGENICS LTD [IL]) [E] 16 * example 7 *;
 [X]  - FEIGE EREZ ET AL, "Modified phospholipids as anti-inflammatory compounds", CURRENT OPINION IN LIPIDOLOGY, LIPPINCOTT WILLIAMS AND WILKINS, LONDON, GB, (20101201), vol. 21, no. 6, doi:10.1097/MOL.0B013E32833F2FCB, ISSN 0957-9672, pages 525 - 529, XP008176887 [X] 16 * page 528 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1097/MOL.0b013e32833f2fcb
 [A]  - MAIRA M SILVA ET AL, "Systemic Inflammatory Reaction After Silicone Breast Implant", AESTHETIC PLASTIC SURGERY, SPRINGER-VERLAG, NE, (20110318), vol. 35, no. 5, doi:10.1007/S00266-011-9688-X, ISSN 1432-5241, pages 789 - 794, XP019963681 [A] 1-15 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s00266-011-9688-x
 [T]  - I. MENDEL ET AL, "VB-201, an oxidized phospholipid small molecule, inhibits CD14- and Toll-like receptor-2-dependent innate cell activation and constrains atherosclerosis", CLINICAL AND EXPERIMENTAL IMMUNOLOGY, GB, (20131203), vol. 175, no. 1, doi:10.1111/cei.12212, ISSN 0009-9104, pages 126 - 137, XP055225132 [T] * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/cei.12212
International search[X]WO2011083469  (MENDEL, I ET AL.);
 [Y]WO2011083467  (COHEN, Y ET AL.);
 [A]WO2011083465  (COHEN, Y ET AL.)