Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2816032

EP2816032 - AROMATIC RING COMPOUND [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  09.02.2018
Database last updated on 17.06.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  25.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip09.02.2018Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 14.03.2018  [2018/11]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Takeda Pharmaceutical Company Limited
1-1 Doshomachi 4-chome Chuo-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-0045 / JP
[2014/52]
Inventor(s)01 / MIWATASHI, Seiji
c/o TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY LIMITED
12-10, Nihonbashi 2-chome
Chuo-ku
Tokyo 103-0027 / JP
02 / SUZUKI, Hideo
c/o TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY LIMITED
26-1 Muraoka-Higashi 2-chome
Fujisawa-shi Kanagawa 251-0012 / JP
03 / OKAWA, Tomohiro
c/o TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY LIMITED
26-1 Muraoka-Higashi 2-chome
Fujisawa-shi Kanagawa 251-0012 / JP
04 / MIYAMOTO, Yasufumi
c/o TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY LIMITED
26-1 Muraoka-Higashi 2-chome
Fujisawa-shi Kanagawa 251-0012 / JP
05 / YAMASAKI, Takeshi
c/o TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY LIMITED
26-1 Muraoka-Higashi 2-chome
Fujisawa-shi Kanagawa 251-0012 / JP
06 / HITOMI, Yuko
c/o TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY LIMITED
26-1 Muraoka-Higashi 2-chome
Fujisawa-shi Kanagawa 251-0012 / JP
07 / HIRATA, Yasuhiro
c/o TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY LIMITED
26-1 Muraoka-Higashi 2-chome
Fujisawa-shi Kanagawa 251-0012 / JP
 [2014/52]
Representative(s)Held, Stephan , et al
Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte
Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Widenmayerstraße 47
80538 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/52]Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR
Widenmayerstrasse 47
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date13749562.812.02.2013
WO2013JP53197
Priority number, dateJP2012002894313.02.2012         Original published format: JP 2012028943
[2014/52]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013122029
Date:22.08.2013
Language:JA
[2013/34]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2816032
Date:24.12.2014
Language:EN
[2014/52]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP22.08.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.08.2015
ClassificationInternational:C07D213/64, A61K31/4418, A61K31/444, A61K31/506, A61P1/00, A61P1/04, A61P1/16, A61P1/18, A61P3/00, A61P3/04, A61P3/10, A61P5/00, A61P5/48, A61P5/50, A61P7/00, A61P7/10, A61P9/10, A61P11/00, A61P11/04, A61P13/10, A61P13/12
[2014/52]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/52]
TitleGerman:AROMATISCHE RINGVERBINDUNG[2014/52]
English:AROMATIC RING COMPOUND[2014/52]
French:COMPOSÉ À NOYAUX AROMATIQUES[2014/52]
Entry into regional phase13.08.2014Translation filed 
13.08.2014National basic fee paid 
13.08.2014Search fee paid 
13.08.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
13.08.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure13.08.2014Examination requested  [2014/52]
18.03.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
02.08.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
13.02.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.05.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
06.10.2017Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2018/11]
02.11.2017Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2018/11]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  02.08.2016
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.02.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
26.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
27.02.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[ID]WO2009048527  (AMGEN INC [US], et al) [ID] 1-15 * abstract * * claim 1 *
International search[A]JP2007509999  (F. HOFFMANN-LA ROCHE AG.);
 [A]WO2009153496  (GENFIT [FR], et al);
 [A]WO2005095338  (TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICAL [JP], et al);
 [A]JP2006083154  (TAKEDA CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES LTD);
 [A]JP2005015461  (TAKEDA CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES LTD);
 [A]JP2009280595  (TAKEDA CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES LTD)
by applicantWO2009048527
 WO2004041266
 WO2004106276
 WO2005063729
 WO2007013689
 WO2007056497
 EP0434034
 WO02088084
 JPH08333287
 WO2007013694
 WO2007018314
 WO2008093639
 WO2008099794
 WO2005063725
 WO2005087710
 WO2005095338
 WO2008001931
 WO2006112549
 WO2007028135
 WO2008047821
 WO2008050821
 WO2008136428
 WO2008156757
 WO0114372
 WO2004039365
 WO9710224
 WO0206234
 WO2004048363
 WO2005030740
 WO2005058823
 WO2005113504
 JP2012028943
    - JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, (2010), vol. 53, no. 1, pages 77 - 105,
    - JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, (1992), vol. 35, no. 19, pages 3483 - 3497,
    - BIOORGANIC & MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, (2007), vol. 15, no. 21, pages 6692 - 6704,
    - "Development of Pharmaceuticals", Design of Molecules, HIROKAWA SHOTEN, (1990), vol. 7, pages 163 - 198,
    - Protective Groups in Organic Synthesis, JOHN WILEY AND SONS, (1980),