Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2814985 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2814985



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 187
16.05.2018 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
11.05.2018 Acknowledgement of withdrawal of the European patent application Search / examination 1
07.05.2018 Closing of application Search / examination 1
04.05.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
04.05.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
04.05.2018 Withdrawal of application Search / examination 1
09.03.2018 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
09.03.2018 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
05.03.2018 Examination started Search / examination 1
28.09.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
28.09.2016 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
28.09.2016 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
28.09.2016 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 3
28.09.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
18.03.2016 Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
02.03.2016 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
02.03.2016 European search opinion Search / examination 3
02.03.2016 Information on Search Strategy Search / examination 1
02.03.2016 Supplementary European search report Search / examination 3
17.02.2016 Search started Search / examination 1
20.03.2015 Communication regarding possible amendment of the application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 3
12.03.2015 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 1
12.03.2015 International publication of the international search report Search / examination 1
13.02.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
13.02.2015 Converted Sequence Listing Search / examination 7
13.02.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
13.02.2015 Reply to the invitation to remedy deficiencies Search / examination 1
10.02.2015 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 8
03.02.2015 Enquiry with the International Bureau Search / examination 1
03.02.2015 Reply by International Bureau Search / examination 1
02.02.2015 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 1
28.01.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
28.01.2015 Converted Sequence Listing Search / examination 7
28.01.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
28.01.2015 Reply to the invitation to remedy deficiencies Search / examination 1
09.12.2014 Deficiencies in sequence listing Search / examination 2
26.11.2014 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
20.10.2014 Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor Search / examination 1
14.10.2014 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
02.10.2014 Enquiry with the International Bureau Search / examination 1
02.10.2014 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
02.10.2014 Priority document Search / examination 38
24.09.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
24.09.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
24.09.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
15.09.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
15.09.2014 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
15.09.2014 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
15.09.2014 Converted Sequence Listing Search / examination 6
15.09.2014 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
18.08.2014 Notification of the recording of a change Search / examination 1
27.06.2014 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
22.08.2013 International publication of the A2 Pamphlet Search / examination 39
22.08.2013 Sequence listing Search / examination 6