Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2814985
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2016130641Global Dossier 12.05.2016A1
Priority number Date
WO2013US25913 13.02.2013
US201314375894 13.02.2013
US201261599074 15.02.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP2015517798Global Dossier 25.06.2015A
Priority number Date
WO2013US25913 13.02.2013
US201261599074 15.02.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2814985Global Dossier 30.03.2016A4
EP2814985 24.12.2014A2
Priority number Date
WO2013US25913 13.02.2013
US201261599074 15.02.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU2013221642 25.09.2014A1
Priority number Date
WO2013US25913 13.02.2013
US201261599074 15.02.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
IL234021D 30.09.2014D0
Priority number Date
WO2013US25913 13.02.2013
US201261599074 15.02.2012
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2013123031Global Dossier 12.03.2015A3
WO2013123031 22.08.2013A2
Priority number Date
US201261599074 15.02.2012