Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2814985

EP2814985 - HIGHLY SENSITIVE METHOD FOR DETECTING LOW FREQUENCY MUTATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  11.05.2018
Database last updated on 11.11.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  09.03.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip11.05.2018Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 13.06.2018  [2018/24]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Janssen Diagnostics, LLC
700 US Highway Route 202
Raritan, NJ 08869 / US
[2014/52]
Inventor(s)01 / WANG, Haiying
5 Lockwood Drive
Bridgewater, NJ 08807 / US
02 / JIANG, Yuqiu
5 Stirrup Lane
Flemington, NJ 08822 / US
03 / WANG, Yixin
1 Johnston Circle
Basking Ridge, NJ 07920 / US
 [2014/52]
Representative(s)Carpmaels & Ransford LLP
One Southampton Row
London WC1B 5HA / GB
[2014/52]
Application number, filing date13749733.513.02.2013
WO2013US25913
Priority number, dateUS201261599074P15.02.2012         Original published format: US 201261599074 P
[2014/52]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2013123031
Date:22.08.2013
Language:EN
[2013/34]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2814985
Date:24.12.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.08.2013
[2014/52]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US12.03.2015
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.03.2016
ClassificationInternational:C07H21/04, C12Q1/68
[2015/18]
Former International [2014/52]C12Q1/68
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/52]
TitleGerman:HOCHSENSIBLES VERFAHREN FÜR DEN NACHWEIS VON NIEDERFREQUENTEN MUTATIONEN[2014/52]
English:HIGHLY SENSITIVE METHOD FOR DETECTING LOW FREQUENCY MUTATIONS[2014/52]
French:PROCÉDÉ EXTRÊMEMENT SENSIBLE DE DÉTECTION DE MUTATIONS À FAIBLE FRÉQUENCE[2014/52]
Entry into regional phase15.09.2014National basic fee paid 
15.09.2014Search fee paid 
15.09.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
15.09.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure15.09.2014Examination requested  [2014/52]
28.09.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
09.03.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
04.05.2018Application withdrawn by applicant  [2018/24]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  09.03.2018
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.02.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
10.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
10.02.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
14.02.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[A]US2010285478  (CHEN CAIFU [US] ET AL) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2010099110  (WILL STEPHEN G [CH] ET AL) [A] 1-15 * abstract *;
 [Y]  - PARSONS B L ET AL, "ALLELE-SPECIFIC COMPETITIVE BLOCKER-PCR DETECTION OF RARE BASE SUBSTITUTION", METHODS IN MOLECULAR BIOLOGY, HUMANA PRESS, INC, US, (20050101), vol. 291, ISSN 1064-3745, pages 235 - 245, XP008061211 [Y] 1-15 * abstract * * page 236 * * page 238 - page 241 * * page 244 - page 245 *
 [Y]  - JOHN MORLAN ET AL, "Mutation Detection by Real-Time PCR: A Simple, Robust and Highly Selective Method", PLOS ONE, (20090225), vol. 4, no. 2, doi:10.1371/journal.pone.0004584, page e4584, XP055111534 [Y] 1-15 * abstract * * page 3 * * page 5; figures 1-2 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1371/journal.pone.0004584
 [Y]  - OROU A ET AL, "ALLELE-SPECIFIC COMPETITIVE BLOCKER PCR: A ONE-STEP METHOD WITH APPLICABILITY TO POOL SCREENING", HUMAN MUTATION, JOHN WILEY & SONS, INC, US, (19950101), vol. 6, no. 2, doi:10.1002/HUMU.1380060209, ISSN 1059-7794, pages 163 - 169, XP000891995 [Y] 1-15 * abstract * * page 168 * * page 165 - page 166 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/humu.1380060209
 [A]  - MCKINZIE PAGE B ET AL, "Detection of rare K-ras codon 12 mutations using allele-specific competitive blocker PCR", MUTATION RESEARCH, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20020527), vol. 517, no. 1-2, ISSN 0027-5107, pages 209 - 220, XP002332580 [A] 1-15 * the whole document *
International search[X]US2010285478  (CHEN, C ET AL.);
 [Y]WO02068684  (LUNDEBERG, J ET AL.);
 [Y]  - PARSONS, BL ET AL., "Allel-Specific Competitive Blocker-PCR Detection Of Rare Base Substiution.", METHODS IN MOLECULAR BIOLOGY., (2005), vol. 291, pages 235 - 245, XP008061211
 [Y]  - MORLAN, J ET AL., "Mutation Detection By Real-Time PCR: A Simple, Robust And Highly Selective Method.", PLOS ONE., (2009), vol. 4, no. 2, pages 1 - 8, XP055111534

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1371/journal.pone.0004584
 [Y]  - WANG, Y ET AL., "Aristolochic Acid-Induced Carcinogenesis Examined By ACB-PCR Quantification Of H-Ras And K-Ras Mutant Fraction.", MUTAGENESIS., (20110603), vol. 26, no. 5, pages 619 - 628, XP055184985

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/mutage/ger023
 [A]  - MCKINZIE, PB ET AL., "Detection Of Rare K-Ras Codon 12 Mutations Using Allele-Specific Competitive Blocker PCR.", MUTATION RESEARCH., (20020321), vol. 517, pages 209 - 220, XP002332580