EP2816643 - NEGATIVE-ELECTRODE ACTIVE MATERIAL FOR NON-AQUEOUS SECONDARY BATTERY, AND NEGATIVE ELECTRODE AND NON-AQUEOUS SECONDARY BATTERY USING SAID ACTIVE MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.02.2019 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 09.03.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.11.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.10.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 30.05.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.04.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mitsubishi Chemical Corporation 1-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8251 / JP | [2017/35] |
Former [2014/52] | For all designated states Mitsubishi Chemical Corporation 1-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8251 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ARIKAWA, Yuuya c/o Mitsubishi Chemical Group Science and Technology Research Center, Inc. 1000, Kamoshida-cho Aoba-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 227-8502 / JP | 02 /
OKAYASU, Teruyuki c/o Mitsubishi Chemical Group Science and Technology Research Center, Inc. 1000, Kamoshida-cho Aoba-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 227-8502 / JP | 03 /
FUJITA, Rie c/o Mitsubishi Chemical Group Science and Technology Research Center, Inc. 1000, Kamoshida-cho Aoba-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 227-8502 / JP | 04 /
SAKAI, Aoi c/o Mitsubishi Chemical Group Science and Technology Research Center, Inc. 1000, Kamoshida-cho Aoba-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 227-8502 / JP | 05 /
FUJIMORI, Naomi c/o Mitsubishi Chemical Group Science and Technology Research Center, Inc. 1000, Kamoshida-cho Aoba-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 227-8502 / JP | 06 /
UENO, Nobuhiko c/o Mitsubishi Chemical Group Science and Technology Research Center, Inc. 1000, Kamoshida-cho Aoba-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 227-8502 / JP | 07 /
MARU, Naoto c/o Mitsubishi Chemical Group Science and Technology Research Center, Inc. 3-1, Chuo 8 chome Ami-machi Inashiki-gun Ibaraki 300-0332 / JP | [2014/52] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [2018/15] |
Former [2014/52] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 13749883.8 | 13.02.2013 | [2018/15] | WO2013JP53433 | Priority number, date | JP20120029988 | 14.02.2012 Original published format: JP 2012029988 | JP20120080655 | 30.03.2012 Original published format: JP 2012080655 | JP20120112317 | 16.05.2012 Original published format: JP 2012112317 | JP20120141100 | 22.06.2012 Original published format: JP 2012141100 | JP20120167659 | 27.07.2012 Original published format: JP 2012167659 | JP20120183037 | 22.08.2012 Original published format: JP 2012183037 | JP20120275819 | 18.12.2012 Original published format: JP 2012275819 | JP20120275820 | 18.12.2012 Original published format: JP 2012275820 | JP20130005457 | 16.01.2013 Original published format: JP 2013005457 | [2014/52] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013122114 | Date: | 22.08.2013 | Language: | JA | [2013/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2816643 | Date: | 24.12.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2816643 | Date: | 11.04.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 22.08.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.04.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H01M4/587, H01M4/133, H01M4/62, // H01M10/0525 | [2015/22] | CPC: |
H01M4/628 (EP,US);
H01M4/587 (EP,CN,US);
H01M10/0525 (EP,CN,US);
H01M4/133 (EP,US);
H01M4/60 (CN);
H01M4/62 (CN);
H01M4/622 (EP,US);
H01M2220/20 (EP,CN,US);
Y02E60/10 (EP,US);
Y02P70/50 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2014/52] | H01M4/587, H01M4/36 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/52] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AKTIVES MATERIAL FÜR EINE NEGATIVE ELEKTRODE FÜR EINE NICHTWÄSSRIGE SEKUNDÄRBATTERIE UND NEGATIVE ELEKTRODE UND NICHTWÄSSRIGE SEKUNDÄRBATTERIE, DIE DAS AKTIVE MATERIAL VERWENDET | [2018/14] | English: | NEGATIVE-ELECTRODE ACTIVE MATERIAL FOR NON-AQUEOUS SECONDARY BATTERY, AND NEGATIVE ELECTRODE AND NON-AQUEOUS SECONDARY BATTERY USING SAID ACTIVE MATERIAL | [2014/52] | French: | MATÉRIAU ACTIF POUR ANODE DE BATTERIE SECONDAIRE NON AQUEUSE AINSI QU'ANODE ET BATTERIE SECONDAIRE NON AQUEUSE METTANT EN OEUVRE CE MATÉRIAU ACTIF | [2014/52] |
Former [2014/52] | NEGATIVELEKTRODENAKTIVMATERIAL FÜR WASSERFREIE SEKUNDÄRBATTERIE SOWIE NEGATIVELEKTRODE UND WASSERFREIE SEKUNDÄRBATTERIE MIT DEM BESAGTEN AKTIVMATERIAL | Entry into regional phase | 12.08.2014 | Translation filed | 11.09.2014 | National basic fee paid | 11.09.2014 | Search fee paid | 11.09.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.09.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.09.2014 | Examination requested [2014/52] | 11.11.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.12.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.04.2017 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 19.04.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 19.04.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 31.05.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.10.2017 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 15.11.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.02.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.12.2016 | Opposition(s) | 14.01.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 13.02.2013 | AL | 11.04.2018 | AT | 11.04.2018 | CY | 11.04.2018 | CZ | 11.04.2018 | DK | 11.04.2018 | EE | 11.04.2018 | ES | 11.04.2018 | FI | 11.04.2018 | HR | 11.04.2018 | IT | 11.04.2018 | LT | 11.04.2018 | LV | 11.04.2018 | MC | 11.04.2018 | MK | 11.04.2018 | NL | 11.04.2018 | PL | 11.04.2018 | RO | 11.04.2018 | RS | 11.04.2018 | SE | 11.04.2018 | SI | 11.04.2018 | SK | 11.04.2018 | SM | 11.04.2018 | TR | 11.04.2018 | BG | 11.07.2018 | NO | 11.07.2018 | GR | 12.07.2018 | IS | 11.08.2018 | PT | 13.08.2018 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/32] | HU | 13.02.2013 | |
AL | 11.04.2018 | ||
AT | 11.04.2018 | ||
CY | 11.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 11.04.2018 | ||
DK | 11.04.2018 | ||
EE | 11.04.2018 | ||
ES | 11.04.2018 | ||
FI | 11.04.2018 | ||
HR | 11.04.2018 | ||
IT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LV | 11.04.2018 | ||
MC | 11.04.2018 | ||
NL | 11.04.2018 | ||
PL | 11.04.2018 | ||
RO | 11.04.2018 | ||
RS | 11.04.2018 | ||
SE | 11.04.2018 | ||
SI | 11.04.2018 | ||
SK | 11.04.2018 | ||
SM | 11.04.2018 | ||
TR | 11.04.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
NO | 11.07.2018 | ||
GR | 12.07.2018 | ||
IS | 11.08.2018 | ||
PT | 13.08.2018 | ||
Former [2021/31] | AL | 11.04.2018 | |
AT | 11.04.2018 | ||
CY | 11.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 11.04.2018 | ||
DK | 11.04.2018 | ||
EE | 11.04.2018 | ||
ES | 11.04.2018 | ||
FI | 11.04.2018 | ||
HR | 11.04.2018 | ||
IT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LV | 11.04.2018 | ||
MC | 11.04.2018 | ||
NL | 11.04.2018 | ||
PL | 11.04.2018 | ||
RO | 11.04.2018 | ||
RS | 11.04.2018 | ||
SE | 11.04.2018 | ||
SI | 11.04.2018 | ||
SK | 11.04.2018 | ||
SM | 11.04.2018 | ||
TR | 11.04.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
NO | 11.07.2018 | ||
GR | 12.07.2018 | ||
IS | 11.08.2018 | ||
PT | 13.08.2018 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 11.04.2018 | |
AT | 11.04.2018 | ||
CY | 11.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 11.04.2018 | ||
DK | 11.04.2018 | ||
EE | 11.04.2018 | ||
ES | 11.04.2018 | ||
FI | 11.04.2018 | ||
HR | 11.04.2018 | ||
IT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LV | 11.04.2018 | ||
MC | 11.04.2018 | ||
NL | 11.04.2018 | ||
PL | 11.04.2018 | ||
RO | 11.04.2018 | ||
RS | 11.04.2018 | ||
SE | 11.04.2018 | ||
SI | 11.04.2018 | ||
SK | 11.04.2018 | ||
SM | 11.04.2018 | ||
TR | 11.04.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
NO | 11.07.2018 | ||
GR | 12.07.2018 | ||
PT | 13.08.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 11.04.2018 | |
AT | 11.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 11.04.2018 | ||
DK | 11.04.2018 | ||
EE | 11.04.2018 | ||
ES | 11.04.2018 | ||
FI | 11.04.2018 | ||
HR | 11.04.2018 | ||
IT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LV | 11.04.2018 | ||
MC | 11.04.2018 | ||
NL | 11.04.2018 | ||
PL | 11.04.2018 | ||
RO | 11.04.2018 | ||
RS | 11.04.2018 | ||
SE | 11.04.2018 | ||
SI | 11.04.2018 | ||
SK | 11.04.2018 | ||
SM | 11.04.2018 | ||
TR | 11.04.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
NO | 11.07.2018 | ||
GR | 12.07.2018 | ||
PT | 13.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/45] | AL | 11.04.2018 | |
AT | 11.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 11.04.2018 | ||
DK | 11.04.2018 | ||
EE | 11.04.2018 | ||
ES | 11.04.2018 | ||
FI | 11.04.2018 | ||
HR | 11.04.2018 | ||
IT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LV | 11.04.2018 | ||
MC | 11.04.2018 | ||
NL | 11.04.2018 | ||
PL | 11.04.2018 | ||
RO | 11.04.2018 | ||
RS | 11.04.2018 | ||
SE | 11.04.2018 | ||
SI | 11.04.2018 | ||
SK | 11.04.2018 | ||
SM | 11.04.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
NO | 11.07.2018 | ||
GR | 12.07.2018 | ||
PT | 13.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 11.04.2018 | |
AT | 11.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 11.04.2018 | ||
DK | 11.04.2018 | ||
EE | 11.04.2018 | ||
ES | 11.04.2018 | ||
FI | 11.04.2018 | ||
HR | 11.04.2018 | ||
IT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LV | 11.04.2018 | ||
NL | 11.04.2018 | ||
PL | 11.04.2018 | ||
RO | 11.04.2018 | ||
RS | 11.04.2018 | ||
SE | 11.04.2018 | ||
SI | 11.04.2018 | ||
SK | 11.04.2018 | ||
SM | 11.04.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
NO | 11.07.2018 | ||
GR | 12.07.2018 | ||
PT | 13.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | AL | 11.04.2018 | |
AT | 11.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 11.04.2018 | ||
DK | 11.04.2018 | ||
EE | 11.04.2018 | ||
ES | 11.04.2018 | ||
FI | 11.04.2018 | ||
HR | 11.04.2018 | ||
IT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LV | 11.04.2018 | ||
NL | 11.04.2018 | ||
PL | 11.04.2018 | ||
RO | 11.04.2018 | ||
RS | 11.04.2018 | ||
SE | 11.04.2018 | ||
SK | 11.04.2018 | ||
SM | 11.04.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
NO | 11.07.2018 | ||
GR | 12.07.2018 | ||
PT | 13.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | AL | 11.04.2018 | |
AT | 11.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 11.04.2018 | ||
DK | 11.04.2018 | ||
EE | 11.04.2018 | ||
ES | 11.04.2018 | ||
FI | 11.04.2018 | ||
HR | 11.04.2018 | ||
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LV | 11.04.2018 | ||
NL | 11.04.2018 | ||
PL | 11.04.2018 | ||
RO | 11.04.2018 | ||
RS | 11.04.2018 | ||
SE | 11.04.2018 | ||
SK | 11.04.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
NO | 11.07.2018 | ||
GR | 12.07.2018 | ||
PT | 13.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | AL | 11.04.2018 | |
DK | 11.04.2018 | ||
EE | 11.04.2018 | ||
ES | 11.04.2018 | ||
FI | 11.04.2018 | ||
HR | 11.04.2018 | ||
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LV | 11.04.2018 | ||
NL | 11.04.2018 | ||
PL | 11.04.2018 | ||
RS | 11.04.2018 | ||
SE | 11.04.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
NO | 11.07.2018 | ||
GR | 12.07.2018 | ||
PT | 13.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | AL | 11.04.2018 | |
DK | 11.04.2018 | ||
ES | 11.04.2018 | ||
FI | 11.04.2018 | ||
HR | 11.04.2018 | ||
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LV | 11.04.2018 | ||
NL | 11.04.2018 | ||
PL | 11.04.2018 | ||
RS | 11.04.2018 | ||
SE | 11.04.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
NO | 11.07.2018 | ||
GR | 12.07.2018 | ||
PT | 13.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/03] | AL | 11.04.2018 | |
ES | 11.04.2018 | ||
FI | 11.04.2018 | ||
HR | 11.04.2018 | ||
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LV | 11.04.2018 | ||
NL | 11.04.2018 | ||
PL | 11.04.2018 | ||
RS | 11.04.2018 | ||
SE | 11.04.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
NO | 11.07.2018 | ||
GR | 12.07.2018 | ||
PT | 13.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AL | 11.04.2018 | |
ES | 11.04.2018 | ||
FI | 11.04.2018 | ||
HR | 11.04.2018 | ||
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LV | 11.04.2018 | ||
NL | 11.04.2018 | ||
PL | 11.04.2018 | ||
RS | 11.04.2018 | ||
SE | 11.04.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
NO | 11.07.2018 | ||
GR | 12.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | AL | 11.04.2018 | |
ES | 11.04.2018 | ||
FI | 11.04.2018 | ||
HR | 11.04.2018 | ||
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LV | 11.04.2018 | ||
NL | 11.04.2018 | ||
PL | 11.04.2018 | ||
RS | 11.04.2018 | ||
SE | 11.04.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
NO | 11.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | AL | 11.04.2018 | |
ES | 11.04.2018 | ||
FI | 11.04.2018 | ||
HR | 11.04.2018 | ||
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
NL | 11.04.2018 | ||
PL | 11.04.2018 | ||
SE | 11.04.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
NO | 11.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/49] | AL | 11.04.2018 | |
ES | 11.04.2018 | ||
FI | 11.04.2018 | ||
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
NL | 11.04.2018 | ||
PL | 11.04.2018 | ||
SE | 11.04.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
NO | 11.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | AL | 11.04.2018 | |
ES | 11.04.2018 | ||
FI | 11.04.2018 | ||
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
NL | 11.04.2018 | ||
NO | 11.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/46] | AL | 11.04.2018 | |
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
NL | 11.04.2018 | ||
NO | 11.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/43] | NL | 11.04.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]JPH04248258 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [X] 1-4,7,8,10-12 * abstract; paragraphs [0010] , [0017]; claim 1 * [I] 5,6,9; | [XI]EP1090956 (NISSHIN SPINNING [JP]) [X] 1-4,7,8,10-12 * paragraphs [0079] , [0081] , [0082] , [0087]; claims 1-9 *[I] 5,6,9 | International search | [X]JPH04248258 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [A]JP2003012311 (KAWASAKI STEEL CO); | [X]JP2007095494 (OSAKA GAS CO LTD); | [A]JP2011134572 (HITACHI POWDERED METALS) | by applicant | JPH11120992 | JP2002117851 | JP2007095494 |