blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2882436

EP2882436 - ARRY-520 FOR USE IN TREATING CANCER IN A PATIENT WITH LOW AAG [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  02.02.2018
Database last updated on 18.05.2024
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  17.03.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip02.02.2018Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 07.03.2018  [2018/10]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Array Biopharma, Inc.
3200 Walnut Street
Boulder, CO 80301 / US
[2015/25]
Inventor(s)01 / BROWN, Karin
c/o Array BioPharma Inc.
3200 Walnut Street
Boulder, Colorado 80301 / US
02 / FRANKLIN, Ronald B.
c/o Array BioPharma Inc.
3200 Walnut Street
Boulder, Colorado 80301 / US
03 / HINGORANI, Gary P.
c/o Array BioPharma Inc.
3200 Walnut Street
Boulder, Colorado 80301 / US
04 / LITWILER, Kevin S.
c/o Array BioPharma Inc.
3200 Walnut Street
Boulder, Colorado 80301 / US
05 / TUNQUIST, Brian J.
c/o Array BioPharma Inc.
3200 Walnut Street
Boulder, Colorado 80301 / US
06 / WALKER, Duncan H.
c/o Array BioPharma Inc.
3200 Walnut Street
Boulder, Colorado 80301 / US
[N/P]
Former [2015/25]01 / BROWN, Karin
c/o Array BioPharma Inc.
3200 Walnut Street
Boulder, Colorado 80301 / US
02 / FRANKLIN, Ronald B.
c/o Array BioPharma Inc.
3200 Walnut Street
Boulder, Colorado 80301 / US
03 / HINGORANI, Gary P.
c/o Array BioPharma Inc.
Boulder, Colorado 80301 / US
04 / LITWILER, Kevin S.
c/o Array BioPharma Inc.
Boulder, Colorado 80301 / US
05 / TUNQUIST, Brian J.
c/o Array BioPharma Inc.
3200 Walnut Street
Boulder, Colorado 80301 / US
06 / WALKER, Duncan H.
c/o Array BioPharma Inc.
3200 Walnut Street
Boulder, Colorado 80301 / US
Representative(s)Office Freylinger
P.O. Box 48
8001 Strassen / LU
[2015/25]
Application number, filing date13750489.013.08.2013
WO2013US54807
Priority number, dateUS201261682682P13.08.2012         Original published format: US 201261682682 P
US201261734149P06.12.2012         Original published format: US 201261734149 P
US201361829779P31.05.2013         Original published format: US 201361829779 P
[2015/25]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2014028543
Date:20.02.2014
Language:EN
[2014/08]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2882436
Date:17.06.2015
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.02.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2015/25]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP20.02.2014
ClassificationIPC:A61K31/433, A61K31/45, A61K31/4965, A61K31/5377, A61K31/573, A61P35/00
[2015/25]
CPC:
A61K31/433 (EP,KR,US); A61K31/45 (EP,KR,RU,US); A61K31/454 (EP,US);
A61K31/4965 (EP,KR,US); A61K31/5377 (EP,KR,US); A61K31/573 (EP,KR,US);
A61K38/05 (EP,US); A61K38/07 (EP,US); A61K38/193 (EP,US);
A61P35/00 (EP,KR); A61P35/02 (EP); G01N33/57488 (US);
A61K2300/00 (KR); G01N2333/4728 (US) (-)
C-Set:
A61K31/433, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/45, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/4965, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/5377, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/573, A61K2300/00 (US,EP)
(-)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/25]
Extension statesBA13.03.2015
ME13.03.2015
TitleGerman:ARRY-520 ZUR VERWENDUNG BEI DER BEHANDLUNG VON KREBS BEI PATIENTEN MIT NIEDRIGEM AAG[2015/25]
English:ARRY-520 FOR USE IN TREATING CANCER IN A PATIENT WITH LOW AAG[2015/25]
French:ARRY-520 DESTINÉ À ÊTRE UTILISÉ DANS LE TRAITEMENT DU CANCER CHEZ UN PATIENT AYANT UN FAIBLE TAUX DE AAG[2015/25]
Entry into regional phase13.03.2015National basic fee paid 
13.03.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
13.03.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure13.03.2015Examination requested  [2015/25]
21.10.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
20.03.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
03.10.2017Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2018/10]
30.10.2017Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2018/10]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  20.03.2017
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.08.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
29.08.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
28.08.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[XI]  - P Goncalves ET AL, "A Phase 1 Safety and Pharmacokinetic Study of ARRY-520 in Solid Tumors", (20100607), URL: http://www.arraybiopharma.com/_documents/Publication/PubAttachment387.pdf, (20131031), XP055086253 [X] 20-28 * the whole document * * in particular Summary * [I] 1-13,16-26,29-33
 [XI]  - Z Estrov ET AL, "A Phase 1 Dose-Escalation Study of the Novel KSP Inhibitor ARRY-520 in Advanced Leukemias", (20090529), URL: http://www.arraybiopharma.com/_documents/Publication/PubAttachment347.pdf, (20131031), XP055086256 [X] 20-28 * the whole document * * in particular Summary * [I] 1-13,16-26,29-33
 [XI]  - S Lonial, "The Novel KSP Inhibitor ARRY-520 Demonstrates Single-Agent Activity in Refractory Myeloma: Results From a Phase 2 Trial in Patients with Relapsed/Refractory Multiple Myeloma (MM)", (20111112), URL: http://www.arraybiopharma.com/_documents/Publication/PubAttachment494.pdf, (20131031), XP055086283 [X] 20-28 * the whole document * * in particular Summary * [I] 1-13,16-26,29-33
 [IP]  - Jatin J Shah ET AL, "Phase 1 study of the novel kinesin spindle protein inhibitor ARRY-520 + carfilzomib in patients with relapsed and/or refractory multiple myeloma", Anticancer Res. Tunquist BJ Mol Cancer Ther. Blood. Vij R Blood. Onyx Pharmaceuticals Hematology Annual Meeting, (20121210), URL: http://www.arraybiopharma.com/_documents/Publication/PubAttachment555.pdf, (20131031), XP055086276 [IP] 1-13,16-26,29-33 * the whole document * * in particular Conclusions *
 [XP]  - S Lonial, "Single-Agent Activity of the Novel KSP Inhibitor ARRY-520 in Patients with Relapsed or Refractory Multiple Myeloma (RRMM): Results from Subgroup Analyses", (20130404), URL: http://www.arraybiopharma.com/_documents/Publication/PubAttachment563.pdf, (20131031), XP055086286 [XP] 1-33 * the whole document * * in particular Conclusions *
 [XP]  - Brian Tunquist, "Identification of Alpha 1-Acid Glycoprotein (AAG) as a Potential Patient Selection Biomarker for Improved Clinical Activity of the Novel KSP Inhibitor ARRY-520 in Relapsed and Refractory Multiple Myeloma (MM).", (20121208), URL: http://www.arraybiopharma.com/_documents/Publication/PubAttachment552.pdf, (20131031), XP055086274 [XP] 1-33 * the whole document * * in particular Conclusions *
 [XP]  - J J Shah ET AL, "The Novel KSP Inhibitor ARRY-520 Is Active Both with and without Low-Dose Dexamethasone in Patients with Multiple Myeloma Refractory to Bortezomib and Lenalidomide: Results From a Phase 2 Study", (20121210), URL: http://www.arraybiopharma.com/_documents/Publication/PubAttachment556.pdf, (20131031), XP055086265 [XP] 1-33 * the whole document * * in particular Conclusions *
 [XP]  - Brian Tunquist, "ALPHA 1-ACID GLYCOPROTEIN (AAG) IS A POTENTIAL PATIENT SELECTION MARKER FOR CLINICAL ACTIVITY OF ARRY-520 IN RELAPSED AND REFRACTORY MULTIPLE MYELOMA (MM)", (20130617), URL: http://www.arraybiopharma.com/_documents/Publication/PubAttachment569.pdf, (20131113), XP055088051 [XP] 1-33 * the whole document * * in particular Summary *
 [A]  - BRUNO RENÉ ET AL, "Alpha-1-acid glycoprotein as an independent predictor for treatment effects and a prognostic factor of survival in patients with non-small cell lung cancer treated with docetaxel", CLINICAL CANCER RESEARCH, THE AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR CANCER RESEARCH, US, (20030301), vol. 9, no. 3, ISSN 1078-0432, pages 1077 - 1082, XP009174120 [A] 1-33 * abstract *
 [A]  - Karin D Brown, "An Effective Screening Approach to Assess the Impact of [alpha]-1 Acid Glycoprotein Binding on the Fraction Unbound of a Drug", (20111018), URL: http://www.arraybiopharma.com/_documents/Publication/PubAttachment479.pdf, (20131104), XP055086495 [A] 1-33 * abstract * * Summary and Conclusions *
by applicantUS7449486
 US2010099697
 WO2010045624
    - BRUNO, RENE, "a-1-Acid Glycoprotein As an Independent Predictor for Treatment Effects and a Prognostic Factor of Survival in Patients with Non-small Cell Lung Cancer Treated with Docetaxel.", CLIN. CANCER RES., (2003), vol. 9, pages 1077 - 1082, XP009174120
    - FELLINIEMI TARJA-TERTTU ET AL., "Immunoreactive Interleukin-6 and Acute Phase Proteins as Prognostic Factors in Multiple Myeloma", BLOOD, (19950201), vol. 85, no. 3, pages 765 - 771, XP002429850
    - BROWN, KARIN D. ET AL., "An Effective Screening Approach to Assess the Impact of a- Acid Glycoprotein Binding on the Fraction Unbound of a Drug", 17TH NORTH AMERICAN REGIONAL INTERNATIONAL SOCIETY FOR THE STUDY OF XENOBIOTICS MEETING, (20111018), URL: www.arraybiopharma.com/documents/Publication/PubAttachment479.pdf
    - GONCALVES, P. ET AL., "A Phase 1 Safety and Pharmacokinetic Study of ARRY-520 in Solid Tumors", AMERICAN SOCIETY OF CLINICAL ONCOLOGY ANNUAL MEETING, (2010), URL: www.arraybiopharmacom/_documents/Publication/PubAttachment387.pdf
    - GARCIA-MANERO, GUILLERMO ET AL., "A Phase 1 Dose-Escalation Study of the Novel KSP Inhibitor ARRY-520 in Advanced Leukemias", 51ST AMERICAN SOCIETY OF HEMATOLOGY ANNUAL MEETING AND EXPOSITION, (2009), URL: www.arraybiopharma.com/-documents/Publication/PubAttachment368.pdf
    - ESTROV, Z. ET AL., "A Phase 1 Dose-Escalation Study of the Novel KSP Inhibitor ARRY-520 in Advanced Leukemias", AMERICAN SOCIETY OF CLINICAL ONCOLOGY ANNUAL MEETING, (2009), URL: www.arraybiopharma.com/-documents/Publication/PubAttachment347.pdf
    - SHAH, J.J. ET AL., "A Phase 1/2 Trial of the KSP Inhibitor ARRY-520 in Relapsed/Refractory Multiple Myeloma", AMERICAN SOCIETY OF HEMATOLOGY MEETING, (2010), URL: www.arraybiopharma.com/ documents/Publication/PubAttachment428.pdf
    - SHAH, J.J. ET AL., "ARRY-520 Shows Durable Responses in Patients with Relapsed/Refractory Multiple Myeloma in a Phase 1 Dose-Escalation Study", AMERICAN SOCIETY OF HEMATOLOGY ANNUAL MEETING, (2011), URL: www.arraybiopharma.com/_documents/Publication/PubAttachment493 .pdf
    - LONIAL, S. ET AL., "The Novel KSP Inhibitor ARRY-520 Demonstrates Single-Agent Activity in Refractory Myeloma: Results From a Phase 2 Trial in Patients with Relapsed/Refractory Multiple Myeloma", AMERICAN SOCIETY OF HEMATOLOGY ANNUAL MEETING, (2011), URL: www.arraybiopharma.com/_documents/Publication/PubAttachment563.pdf
    - SHAH, J.J. ET AL., "The Novel KSP Inhibitor ARRY-520 Is Active Both with and without Low-Dose Dexamethasone in Patients with Multiple Myeloma Refractory to Bortezomib and Lenalidomide: Results From a Phase 2 Study", AMERICAN SOCIETY OF HEMATOLOGY MEETING, (2012), URL: www.arraybiopharma.com/-documents/Publication/PubAttachment556.pdf
    - LONIAL, S. ET AL., "The Novel KSP Inhibitor ARRY-520 Demonstrates Single-Agent Activity in Refractory Myeloma: Results From a Phase 2 Trial in Patients with Relapsed/Refractory Multiple Myeloma", AMERICAN SOCIETY OF HEMATOLOGY ANNUAL MEETING, (2011), URL: www.arraybiopharma.com/-documents/Publication/PubAttachment563.pdf
    - LONIAL, SAGAR ET AL., "Single-Agent Activity of the Novel KSP Inhibitor ARRY-520 in Patients with Relapsed or Refractory Multiple Myeloma (RRMM): Results from Subgroup Analyses", INTERNATIONAL MYELOMA WORKSHOP, (2013), URL: www.arraybiopharma.com/ documents/Publication/PubAttachment563.pdf
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.