Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2938789

EP2938789 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR DETECTING THE PRESENCE OF STONE CRUSHING TOOLS ON EARTHMOVING MACHINES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  29.06.2018
Database last updated on 21.09.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  26.03.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip29.06.2018Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 01.08.2018  [2018/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Identec Solutions AG
Millenium Park 2
6890 Lustenau / AT
[2015/45]
Inventor(s)01 / EGGER, Daniel
Augasse 42
A-6822 Satteins / AT
02 / ROBERTSON, Brian
Saentisstr. 23
CH-8810 Horgen / CH
 [2015/45]
Representative(s)Riebling, Peter
Patentanwalt, Rennerle 10
88131 Lindau / DE
[2015/45]
Application number, filing date13750505.303.08.2013
[2015/45]
WO2013EP02333
Priority number, dateDE2012101600411.08.2012         Original published format: DE102012016004
[2015/45]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014026742
Date:20.02.2014
Language:DE
[2014/08]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2938789
Date:04.11.2015
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.02.2014
[2015/45]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP20.02.2014
ClassificationInternational:E02F9/24, E02F9/26, E02F9/28
[2015/45]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/45]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR ERFASSUNG DER ANWESENHEIT VON STEINBRECHENDEN WERKZEUGEN AN ERDBEWEGUNGSMASCHINEN[2015/45]
English:METHOD AND DEVICE FOR DETECTING THE PRESENCE OF STONE CRUSHING TOOLS ON EARTHMOVING MACHINES[2015/45]
French:PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE DÉTECTION DE LA PRÉSENCE D'OUTILS DE CONCASSAGE DE PIERRES SUR DES ENGINS DE TERRASSEMENT[2015/45]
Biological materialThis application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details
Entry into regional phase14.08.2015National basic fee paid 
14.08.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
14.08.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDeletion: Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2015/45]
14.08.2015Examination requested  [2015/45]
01.03.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
01.03.2018Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2018/31]
27.03.2018Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2018/31]
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the filing fee
14.08.2015Request for further processing filed
14.08.2015Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
05.10.2015Decision despatched
The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the examination fee
14.08.2015Request for further processing filed
14.08.2015Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
05.10.2015Decision despatched
14.08.2015Request for further processing filed
14.08.2015Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
05.10.2015Decision despatched
The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of designation fees
TR, SM, SK, SI, SE, RS, RO, PT, PL, NO, NL, MT, MK, MC, LV, LU, LT, IT, IS, IE, HU, HR, GR, GB, FR, FI, ES, EE, DK, DE, CZ, CY, CH, BG, BE, AT, AL
14.08.2015Request for further processing filed
14.08.2015Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
05.10.2015Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.08.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
30.08.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.08.201705   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[XY]US2012098654  (EBERT WILLIAM [US]) [X] 1-3,9,10 * paragraphs [0016] , [0029] - [0032] - [0046] - [0047]; figure 5; claims 1,3,10,11,14 * [Y] 4-8;
 [Y]GB2436220  (NCODE INTERNAT LTD [GB] NCODE INTERNAT LTD [GB]; HBM UNITED KINGDOM LT) [Y] 4-8 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2004227645  (LUJAN KRAIG M [US] ET AL) [A] 1,9 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2009121895  (DENNY LAWRENCE A [US] ET AL) [A] 1,9 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2009055293  (MUELLER TIMOTHY J [US]) [A] 1,9 * the whole document *;
 [XP]WO2012116408  (ENCORE AUTOMATION PTY LTD [AU]; HAMILTON IAN HUGH [AU]) [XP] 1-3,9,10 * the whole document *;
 [AP]US2013049935  (MILLER LEE [US]) [AP] 1,9 * the whole document *;
 [A]DE102007004603  (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 4-8 * the whole document *;
 [XP]WO2012107848  (MONZON OSORIO SERGIO; UNIV CATOLICA DEL NORTE) [XP] 1,9 * the whole document *