Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2895659

EP2895659 - ASSEMBLY FOR CARRYING OUT THE HYGIENIC FLUSHING OF A WATER INSTALLATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  27.06.2016
Database last updated on 09.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip28.08.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Hans Sasserath GmbH & Co. KG.
Mühlenstrasse 62
41352 Korschenbroich / DE
[2015/30]
Inventor(s)01 / HECKING, Willi
An der Beeck 46
41372 Niederkrüchten-Elmpt / DE
 [2015/30]
Representative(s)Weisse, Renate
Bleibtreustrasse 38
10623 Berlin / DE
[N/P]
Former [2015/30]Weisse, Renate
Patentanwälte Weisse & Wolgast Bleibtreustrasse 38
10623 Berlin / DE
Application number, filing date13750562.416.08.2013
WO2013EP67157
Priority number, dateDE201220103132U20.08.2012         Original published format: DE 202012103132 U
DE201220103128U20.08.2012         Original published format: DE 202012103128 U
EP2013015882712.03.2013         Original published format: EP 13158827
DE201320102154U16.05.2013         Original published format: DE 202013102154 U
[2015/30]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014040823
Date:20.03.2014
Language:DE
[2014/12]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2895659
Date:22.07.2015
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.03.2014
[2015/30]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP20.03.2014
ClassificationInternational:E03B7/08
[2015/30]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/30]
TitleGerman:ANORDNUNG ZUR DURCHFÜHRUNG EINER HYGIENESPÜLUNG IN EINER WASSERINSTALLATION[2015/30]
English:ASSEMBLY FOR CARRYING OUT THE HYGIENIC FLUSHING OF A WATER INSTALLATION[2015/30]
French:DISPOSITIF POUR RÉALISER UN RINÇAGE HYGIÉNIQUE DANS UNE INSTALLATION HYDRAULIQUE[2015/30]
Entry into regional phase21.01.2015National basic fee paid 
21.01.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
21.01.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure20.03.2014Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
21.01.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
21.01.2015Examination requested  [2015/30]
24.02.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.06.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.10.2016Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
Appeal following examination15.12.2016Appeal received No.  T0662/17
20.02.2017Statement of grounds filed
09.01.2020Date of oral proceedings
Divisional application(s)EP15175515.4  / EP2960384
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  24.02.2016
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.08.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
26.08.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
25.08.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
24.08.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
26.08.2019Renewal fee patent year 07
Cited inInternational search[XY]DE202008002822U  (KEMPER GEBR GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [X] 1-3,9,10,13,16-18 * the whole document * [Y] 5-8,11,12,15;
 [XY]EP2466019  (HONEYWELL TECHNOLOGIES SARL [CH]) [X] 1-3,9,10 * the whole document * [Y] 5-8,11,12,15;
 [X]DE202011105696U  (PAREDES BENJAMIN [DE]) [X] 1-3,9,10,15 * the whole document *;
 [Y]DE9405348U  (HONEYWELL AG [DE]) [Y] 5-8 * the whole document *;
 [Y]GB2452311  (RADIO TECH LTD [GB]) [Y] 11,12 * the whole document *;
 [Y]GB2213238  (WATKINS GRAHAM DENNIS) [Y] 11,12 * the whole document *;
 [Y]EP1964983  (GEBERIT TECHNIK AG [CH]) [Y] 15 * figures 1-3 *
by applicantDE202005002415U
 DE202008003055U