Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2815158

EP2815158 - SLIDE RING SEAL [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  05.04.2018
Database last updated on 19.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 14.11.2018  [2018/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Carl Freudenberg KG
Höhnerweg 2-4
69469 Weinheim / DE
[2014/52]
Inventor(s)01 / NEUBERGER, Sören
Gerhart-Hauptmann-Strasse 15
68766 Hockenheim / DE
02 / LANG, Klaus
Alpenblickstrasse 31
82547 Eurasburg / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/52]01 / NEUBERGER, Soeren
Schwetzinger Str. 71
68766 Hockenheim / DE
02 / LANG, Klaus
Alpenblickstrasse 31
82547 Eurasburg / DE
Representative(s)(deleted)
...
[N/P]
Former [2014/52]Wesch, Arno
European Patent Attorney
Carl Freudenberg KG
Patent und Marken
Höhnerweg 2-4
69469 Weinheimm / DE
Application number, filing date13750844.610.07.2013
[2015/44]
WO2013EP02031
Priority number, dateDE2013100683922.04.2013         Original published format: DE102013006839
[2014/52]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014173424
Date:30.10.2014
Language:EN
[2014/44]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2815158
Date:24.12.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.10.2014
[2014/52]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2815158
Date:28.10.2015
Language:EN
[2015/44]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP30.10.2014
ClassificationInternational:F16J15/18, F16J15/32, F16J15/34, F16J15/36
[2014/52]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/52]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:GLEITRINGDICHTUNG[2014/52]
English:SLIDE RING SEAL[2014/52]
French:JOINT D'ÉTANCHÉITÉ À ANNEAU DE GLISSEMENT[2014/52]
Entry into regional phase25.04.2014National basic fee paid 
25.04.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
25.04.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure25.04.2014Examination requested  [2014/52]
25.06.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
10.07.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.09.2015Fee for grant paid
11.09.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
11.09.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  10.07.2015
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  27.07.2016  04.08.2016  ADMISSIBLE
KACO GmbH & Co. KG
Rosenbergstrasse 22
74072 Heilbronn / DE
Opponent's representative
Jackisch-Kohl, Anna-Katharina
Patentanwälte
Jackisch-Kohl & Kohl
Stuttgarter Strasse 115
70469 Stuttgart / DE
 [2016/36]
05.09.2016Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
13.01.2017Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
15.03.2018Date of oral proceedings
06.04.2018Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
06.04.2018Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition13.06.2018Appeal received No.  T1495/18
24.07.2018Statement of grounds filed
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.07.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL28.10.2015
AT28.10.2015
BE28.10.2015
BG28.10.2015
CY28.10.2015
DK28.10.2015
EE28.10.2015
FI28.10.2015
HR28.10.2015
LT28.10.2015
LV28.10.2015
MC28.10.2015
MK28.10.2015
NL28.10.2015
RO28.10.2015
RS28.10.2015
SE28.10.2015
SI28.10.2015
SM28.10.2015
TR28.10.2015
NO28.01.2016
GR29.01.2016
IS28.02.2016
PT29.02.2016
IE10.07.2016
LU10.07.2016
CH31.07.2016
LI31.07.2016
MT31.07.2016
[2018/46]
Former [2018/45]AT28.10.2015
BE28.10.2015
BG28.10.2015
CY28.10.2015
DK28.10.2015
EE28.10.2015
FI28.10.2015
HR28.10.2015
LT28.10.2015
LV28.10.2015
MC28.10.2015
MK28.10.2015
NL28.10.2015
RO28.10.2015
RS28.10.2015
SE28.10.2015
SI28.10.2015
SM28.10.2015
TR28.10.2015
NO28.01.2016
GR29.01.2016
IS28.02.2016
PT29.02.2016
IE10.07.2016
LU10.07.2016
CH31.07.2016
LI31.07.2016
MT31.07.2016
Former [2018/38]AT28.10.2015
BE28.10.2015
BG28.10.2015
CY28.10.2015
DK28.10.2015
EE28.10.2015
FI28.10.2015
HR28.10.2015
LT28.10.2015
LV28.10.2015
MC28.10.2015
MK28.10.2015
NL28.10.2015
RO28.10.2015
RS28.10.2015
SE28.10.2015
SI28.10.2015
SM28.10.2015
NO28.01.2016
GR29.01.2016
IS28.02.2016
PT29.02.2016
IE10.07.2016
LU10.07.2016
CH31.07.2016
LI31.07.2016
MT31.07.2016
Former [2018/32]AT28.10.2015
BE28.10.2015
CY28.10.2015
DK28.10.2015
EE28.10.2015
FI28.10.2015
HR28.10.2015
LT28.10.2015
LV28.10.2015
MC28.10.2015
MK28.10.2015
NL28.10.2015
RO28.10.2015
RS28.10.2015
SE28.10.2015
SI28.10.2015
SM28.10.2015
NO28.01.2016
GR29.01.2016
IS28.02.2016
PT29.02.2016
IE10.07.2016
LU10.07.2016
CH31.07.2016
LI31.07.2016
MT31.07.2016
Former [2017/41]AT28.10.2015
BE28.10.2015
DK28.10.2015
EE28.10.2015
FI28.10.2015
HR28.10.2015
LT28.10.2015
LV28.10.2015
MC28.10.2015
NL28.10.2015
RO28.10.2015
RS28.10.2015
SE28.10.2015
SI28.10.2015
SM28.10.2015
NO28.01.2016
GR29.01.2016
IS28.02.2016
PT29.02.2016
IE10.07.2016
LU10.07.2016
CH31.07.2016
LI31.07.2016
Former [2017/25]AT28.10.2015
BE28.10.2015
DK28.10.2015
EE28.10.2015
FI28.10.2015
HR28.10.2015
LT28.10.2015
LV28.10.2015
MC28.10.2015
NL28.10.2015
RO28.10.2015
RS28.10.2015
SE28.10.2015
SI28.10.2015
SM28.10.2015
NO28.01.2016
GR29.01.2016
IS28.02.2016
PT29.02.2016
CH31.07.2016
LI31.07.2016
Former [2017/03]AT28.10.2015
BE28.10.2015
DK28.10.2015
EE28.10.2015
FI28.10.2015
HR28.10.2015
LT28.10.2015
LV28.10.2015
NL28.10.2015
RO28.10.2015
RS28.10.2015
SE28.10.2015
SI28.10.2015
SM28.10.2015
NO28.01.2016
GR29.01.2016
IS28.02.2016
PT29.02.2016
Former [2016/49]AT28.10.2015
DK28.10.2015
EE28.10.2015
FI28.10.2015
HR28.10.2015
LT28.10.2015
LV28.10.2015
NL28.10.2015
RO28.10.2015
RS28.10.2015
SE28.10.2015
SI28.10.2015
SM28.10.2015
NO28.01.2016
GR29.01.2016
IS28.02.2016
PT29.02.2016
Former [2016/39]AT28.10.2015
DK28.10.2015
EE28.10.2015
FI28.10.2015
HR28.10.2015
LT28.10.2015
LV28.10.2015
NL28.10.2015
RO28.10.2015
RS28.10.2015
SE28.10.2015
SM28.10.2015
NO28.01.2016
GR29.01.2016
IS28.02.2016
PT29.02.2016
Former [2016/38]AT28.10.2015
EE28.10.2015
FI28.10.2015
HR28.10.2015
LT28.10.2015
LV28.10.2015
NL28.10.2015
RO28.10.2015
RS28.10.2015
SE28.10.2015
SM28.10.2015
NO28.01.2016
GR29.01.2016
IS28.02.2016
PT29.02.2016
Former [2016/36]AT28.10.2015
EE28.10.2015
FI28.10.2015
HR28.10.2015
LT28.10.2015
LV28.10.2015
NL28.10.2015
RO28.10.2015
RS28.10.2015
SE28.10.2015
NO28.01.2016
GR29.01.2016
IS28.02.2016
PT29.02.2016
Former [2016/25]AT28.10.2015
FI28.10.2015
HR28.10.2015
LT28.10.2015
LV28.10.2015
NL28.10.2015
RS28.10.2015
SE28.10.2015
NO28.01.2016
GR29.01.2016
IS28.02.2016
PT29.02.2016
Former [2016/24]AT28.10.2015
FI28.10.2015
HR28.10.2015
LT28.10.2015
NL28.10.2015
RS28.10.2015
SE28.10.2015
NO28.01.2016
GR29.01.2016
IS28.02.2016
PT29.02.2016
Former [2016/23]HR28.10.2015
LT28.10.2015
NL28.10.2015
RS28.10.2015
SE28.10.2015
NO28.01.2016
IS28.02.2016
Former [2016/22]LT28.10.2015
NL28.10.2015
NO28.01.2016
IS28.02.2016
Former [2016/21]LT28.10.2015
NO28.01.2016
Former [2016/20]LT28.10.2015
Cited inInternational search[XAI]GB2061411  (RUBBER & PLASTIC RES ASS) [X] 1-5,9,11 * figures 1-4 * [A] 6-8 [I] 10,12;
 [A]US2004245729  (BOCK EBERHARD [DE] ET AL) [A] 1,9 * figure 6 *;
 [AD]DE102011114349  (FREUDENBERG CARL KG [DE]) [AD] 1,9 * the whole document *;
 [A]ES2159958T  (BURGMANN DICHTUNGSWERKE GMBH) [A] 1,9 * figures 2,3 *;
 [A]US2004070151  (KLENK THOMAS [DE] ET AL) [A] 1,9 * figures 1-3 *
OppositionGB2061411
 US2004070151
 DE102011114349
 WO2005010412