|
30.11.2022 |
Refund of fees |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.11.2022 |
F3324 Closure of the appeal proceedings: withdrawal of the appeal/ application/ opposition |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.11.2022 |
F3324 Closure of the appeal proceedings: withdrawal of the appeal/ application/ opposition |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.11.2022 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
2 |
|
24.11.2022 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
2 |
|
23.11.2022 |
F3014 Oral Proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.11.2022 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.10.2022 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
3 |
|
27.10.2022 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.10.2022 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.10.2022 |
Withdrawal of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.10.2022 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.10.2022 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Appeal |
2 |
|
10.10.2022 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
15 |
|
10.10.2022 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
15 |
|
11.10.2021 |
Standard Communication Rule 103 (2) EPC |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.10.2021 |
Standard Communication Rule 103 (2) EPC |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.09.2021 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
6 |
|
24.09.2021 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.09.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.09.2021 |
Authorisation |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.09.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.09.2021 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.08.2021 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.08.2021 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.08.2021 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
3 |
|
05.08.2021 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
3 |
|
02.08.2021 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.03.2021 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.05.2019 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.02.2019 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.02.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.02.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
06.02.2019 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.02.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.02.2019 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
06.12.2018 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.11.2018 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
29.11.2018 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
29.11.2018 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
29.11.2018 |
Reply to appeal |
Appeal |
14 |
|
27.11.2018 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
27.11.2018 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
27.11.2018 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
27.11.2018 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
27.11.2018 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
27.11.2018 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
27.11.2018 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
27.11.2018 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
27.11.2018 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
27.11.2018 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
27.11.2018 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
27.11.2018 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
27.11.2018 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
27.11.2018 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
27.11.2018 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
27.11.2018 |
Reply to appeal |
Appeal |
15 |
|
27.11.2018 |
Reply to appeal |
Appeal |
15 |
|
27.11.2018 |
Reply to appeal |
Appeal |
15 |
|
27.11.2018 |
Reply to appeal |
Appeal |
15 |
|
27.11.2018 |
Reply to appeal |
Appeal |
15 |
|
23.11.2018 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.07.2018 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.07.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.07.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
24.07.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
24.07.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
24.07.2018 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
24.07.2018 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
24.07.2018 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
24.07.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.07.2018 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
11 |
|
19.06.2018 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.06.2018 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.06.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.06.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
13.06.2018 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
13.06.2018 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.04.2018 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative (Legal Division) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.04.2018 |
Communication confirming withdrawal from representation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.04.2018 |
Notification of termination of representative's authorisation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.04.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.04.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.04.2018 |
Letter concerning the inventor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.04.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.04.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.04.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.04.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.04.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.04.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.04.2018 |
Submission concerning representation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.04.2018 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.04.2018 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.04.2018 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.04.2018 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
14 |
|
06.04.2018 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.04.2018 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.04.2018 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.04.2018 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.04.2018 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.04.2018 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
15.03.2018 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.01.2018 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.01.2018 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.01.2018 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
12 |
|
15.01.2018 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
15.01.2018 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.01.2018 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
12.01.2018 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
12.01.2018 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.01.2018 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
12.01.2018 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
12 |
|
09.01.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.01.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.01.2018 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.08.2017 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.08.2017 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.08.2017 |
Letter concerning the inventor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.07.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.07.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.07.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.07.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.07.2017 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
17.07.2017 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
17.07.2017 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.07.2017 |
Submission concerning representation |
Opposition |
3 |
|
17.07.2017 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.07.2017 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.02.2017 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
09.02.2017 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.01.2017 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
25.01.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.01.2017 |
Authorisation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.01.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.01.2017 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
77 |
|
13.01.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.01.2017 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
30 |
|
13.01.2017 |
Claims |
Opposition |
30 |
|
13.01.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.01.2017 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
13 |
|
13.01.2017 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.12.2016 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.12.2016 |
Rejection of request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.12.2016 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.11.2016 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.11.2016 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.11.2016 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.11.2016 |
Submission concerning representation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.11.2016 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
31.10.2016 |
Communication confirming withdrawal from representation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.10.2016 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.10.2016 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.09.2016 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
05.09.2016 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.09.2016 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.08.2016 |
Authorisation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.08.2016 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.08.2016 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.08.2016 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.07.2016 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.07.2016 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
29.07.2016 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
16 |
|
29.07.2016 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
29.07.2016 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
28 |
|
29.07.2016 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
29.07.2016 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
29.07.2016 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.07.2016 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.07.2016 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.07.2016 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
2 |
|
27.07.2016 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
27.07.2016 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
16 |
|
27.07.2016 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
27.07.2016 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
27.07.2016 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
28 |
|
27.07.2016 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
27.07.2016 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.07.2016 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.11.2015 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.11.2015 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.11.2015 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
29.10.2015 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.10.2015 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.09.2015 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.09.2015 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
11.09.2015 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
11.09.2015 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.09.2015 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.07.2015 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.07.2015 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
10.07.2015 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.07.2015 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
13 |
|
02.06.2015 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.11.2014 |
Letter concerning the inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.11.2014 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.11.2014 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
17 |
|
30.10.2014 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
30.10.2014 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
25.08.2014 |
Letter concerning the inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.06.2014 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.06.2014 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.06.2014 |
Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
25.06.2014 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
25.06.2014 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.06.2014 |
Communication concerning correction of deficiencies in written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.04.2014 |
Cover sheet for fax transmission |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.04.2014 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.04.2014 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.04.2014 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.04.2014 |
Priority search results |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
25.04.2014 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
13.12.2013 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
13.12.2013 |
Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
13.12.2013 |
Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
13.12.2013 |
Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
16.09.2013 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
16.09.2013 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
21.08.2013 |
Abstract |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
21.08.2013 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.08.2013 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.08.2013 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
21.08.2013 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.08.2013 |
Claims |
PCT receiving Office |
2 |
|
21.08.2013 |
Description |
PCT receiving Office |
9 |
|
21.08.2013 |
Drawings |
PCT receiving Office |
2 |
|
10.07.2013 |
Payment of fees and costs |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |