Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2819031

EP2819031 - NON-FACTOID QUESTION ANSWERING SYSTEM AND COMPUTER PROGRAM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  07.04.2017
Database last updated on 19.10.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  22.12.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip07.04.2017Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 10.05.2017  [2017/19]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
National Institute of Information and Communications Technology
4-2-1, Nukui-Kitamachi Koganei-shi
Tokyo 184-8795 / JP
[2015/01]
Inventor(s)01 / OH, Jonghoon
c/o National Institute of Information and
Communications Technology
4-2-1 Nukui-Kitamachi
Koganei-shi Tokyo 184-8795 / JP
02 / TORISAWA, Kentaro
c/o National Institute of Information and
Communications Technology
4-2-1 Nukui-Kitamachi
Koganei-shi Tokyo 184-8795 / JP
03 / HASHIMOTO, Chikara
c/o National Institute of Information and
Communications Technology
4-2-1 Nukui-Kitamachi
Koganei-shi Tokyo 184-8795 / JP
04 / KAWADA, Takuya
c/o National Institute of Information and
Communications Technology
4-2-1 Nukui-Kitamachi
Koganei-shi Tokyo 184-8795 / JP
05 / DE SAEGER, Stijn
c/o National Institute of Information and
Communications Technology
4-2-1 Nukui-Kitamachi
Koganei-shi Tokyo 184-8795 / JP
06 / KAZAMA, Junichi
c/o National Institute of Information and
Communications Technology
4-2-1 Nukui-Kitamachi
Koganei-shi Tokyo 184-8795 / JP
07 / WANG, Yiou
c/o National Institute of Information and
Communications Technology
4-2-1 Nukui-Kitamachi
Koganei-shi Tokyo 184-8795 / JP
 [2015/01]
Representative(s)Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2015/01]Vossius & Partner
Siebertstrasse 4
81675 München / DE
Application number, filing date13751215.823.01.2013
WO2013JP51327
Priority number, dateJP2012003697223.02.2012         Original published format: JP 2012036972
[2015/01]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013125286
Date:29.08.2013
Language:JA
[2013/35]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2819031
Date:31.12.2014
Language:EN
[2015/01]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP29.08.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.04.2016
ClassificationInternational:G06F17/30
[2015/01]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/01]
TitleGerman:SYSTEM ZUR BEANTWORTUNG VON ANFRAGEN OHNE FAKTOIDE SOWIE COMPUTERPROGRAMM DAFÜR[2015/01]
English:NON-FACTOID QUESTION ANSWERING SYSTEM AND COMPUTER PROGRAM[2015/01]
French:SYSTÈME DE QUESTIONS-RÉPONSES NON FACTOÏDES ET PROGRAMME D'ORDINATEUR[2015/01]
Entry into regional phase11.08.2014Translation filed 
03.09.2014National basic fee paid 
03.09.2014Search fee paid 
03.09.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
03.09.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure03.09.2014Examination requested  [2015/01]
17.11.2016Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2017/19]
23.12.2016Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2017/19]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
27.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.01.201705   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[I]JP2009116662  (NAT INST INF & COMM TECH) [I] 1-6 * the whole document *
International search[A]JP2009116662  (NATIONAL INSTITUTE OF INFORMATION AND COMMUNICATIONS TECHNOLOGY);
 [A]JP2009157791  (NIPPON TELEGRAPH AND TELEPHONE CORP.);
 [A]  - KYOSUKE YOSHIDA, "Introduction of a Probabilistic Language Model to Non-Factoid Question-Answering Using Examples of Q&A Pairs", IPSJ SIG NOTES 2011 (HEISEI 23) NENDO 1, (20110615), pages 1 - 10, XP055159624
by applicant   - MASAKI MURATA; SACHIYO TSUKAWAKI; TOSHIYUKI KANAMARU; QING MA; HITOSHI ISAHARA, "A System for Answering Non-factoid Japanese Questions by Using Passage Retrieval Weighted Based on Type of Answer", PROC. OF NTCIR-6
    - RYUICHIRO HIGASHINAKA; HIDEKI ISOZAKI, "Corpus-based Question Answering for Why-Questions", PROC. OFIJCNLP, pages 418 - 425
    - "Dependency Tree-based Sentiment Classification Using CRFs with Hidden Variables", TETSUJI NAKAGAWA; KENTARO INUI; SADAO KUROHASHI, Proc. of Human Language Technologies: The 2010 Annual Conference of Computational Linguistics, ASSOCIATION FOR COMPUTATIONAL LINGUISTICS, (201006), pages 786 - 794