Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2818728

EP2818728 - COMPRESSOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  14.12.2018
Database last updated on 19.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip06.04.2019New entry: Reply to examination report 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Mitsubishi Heavy Industries Compressor Corporation
34-6, Shiba 5-chome
Minato-ku
Tokyo 108-0014 / JP
[2018/33]
Former [2015/01]For all designated states
Mitsubishi Heavy Industries, Ltd.
16-5, Konan 2-chome Minato-ku
Tokyo 108-8215 / JP
For all designated states
Mitsubishi Heavy Industries Compressor Corporation
34-6, Shiba 5-chome
Minato-ku
Tokyo 108-0014 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / OKADA, Noriyuki
c/o MITSUBISHI HEAVY INDUSTRIES LTD.
16-5 Konan 2-chome
Minato-ku
Tokyo 108-8215 / JP
02 / KUROSAKI, Hikaru
c/o MITSUBISHI HEAVY INDUSTRIES LTD.
16-5 Konan 2-chome
Minato-ku
Tokyo 108-8215 / JP
03 / HIRATA, Naoki
c/o MITSUBISHI HEAVY INDUSTRIES LTD.
16-5 Konan 2-chome
Minato-ku
Tokyo 108-8215 / JP
04 / HAYASHI, Akira
c/o MITSUBISHI HEAVY INDUSTRIES LTD.
16-5 Konan 2-chome
Minato-ku
Tokyo 108-8215 / JP
05 / YOSHIDA, Satoru
c/o MITSUBISHI HEAVY INDUSTRIES COMPRESSOR
CORPORATION
6-22 Kan-on-Shin-machi 4-chome
Nishi-ku
Hiroshima-shi Hiroshima 733-8553 / JP
06 / YOSHIMUNE, Toru
c/o MITSUBISHI HEAVY INDUSTRIES COMPRESSOR
CORPORATION
6-22 Kan-on-Shin-machi 4-chome
Nishi-ku
Hiroshima-shi Hiroshima 733-8553 / JP
 [2015/01]
Representative(s)Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
[2015/01]
Application number, filing date13751270.321.02.2013
WO2013JP54389
Priority number, dateJP2012003772223.02.2012         Original published format: JP 2012037722
[2015/01]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013125649
Date:29.08.2013
Language:JA
[2013/35]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2818728
Date:31.12.2014
Language:EN
[2015/01]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP29.08.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.09.2015
ClassificationInternational:F04D29/62, F04D29/42, F16C33/36, F16C29/04
[2015/44]
Former International [2015/01]F04D29/62, F04D29/42
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/01]
TitleGerman:VERDICHTER[2015/01]
English:COMPRESSOR[2015/01]
French:COMPRESSEUR[2015/01]
Entry into regional phase20.08.2014Translation filed 
20.08.2014National basic fee paid 
20.08.2014Search fee paid 
20.08.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
20.08.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure20.08.2014Examination requested  [2015/01]
21.04.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
18.12.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
02.04.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  18.12.2018
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.02.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
24.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
17.02.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
21.02.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
18.02.2019Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[YDA]JP2011220307  (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD) [YD] 1,2,4-6 * figures 2,3 * [A] 3,7,8;
 [Y]US3910656  (PRICE CONNOR E ET AL) [Y] 1,2,4-6 * column 1, line 60 - column 2, line 20; figures 4,6-8 *;
 [A]GB1327646  (ROLLWAY BEARING CO INC) [A] 4-6 * the whole document *
International search[A]JP2011220307  (MITSUBISHI HEAVY INDUSTRIES, LTD.);
 [A]JP2000038988  (DRESSER-RAND CO.);
 [A]US4044442  (ARNE CARLSON)
by applicantJP2012037722
 JP2011220307