Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2817485

EP2817485 - FIBER REINFORCED ELASTOMERIC STATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  28.11.2014
Database last updated on 19.07.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip16.02.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For:FR 
Services Pétroliers Schlumberger
42, rue Saint Dominique
75007 Paris / FR
For:AL  AT  BE  BG  CH  CY  CZ  DE  DK  EE  ES  FI  GB  GR  HR  HU  IE  IS  IT  LI  LT  LU  LV  MC  MK  MT  NL  NO  PL  PT  RO  RS  SE  SI  SK  SM  TR 
Schlumberger Holdings Limited
P.O. Box 71
Craigmuir Chambers
Road Town, Tortola 1110 / VG
[N/P]
Former [2015/01]For:FR 
Services Pétroliers Schlumberger
42, rue Saint Dominique
75007 Paris / FR
For:AL  AT  BE  BG  CH  CY  CZ  DE  DK  EE  ES  FI  GB  GR  HR  HU  IE  IS  IT  LI  LT  LU  LV  MC  MK  MT  NL  NO  PL  PT  RO  RS  SE  SI  SK  SM  TR 
Schlumberger Holdings Limited
P.O. Box 71
Craigmuir Chambers
Road Town
Tortola, British Virgin Islands 1110 / VG
Inventor(s)01 / MENG, Scott
1310 Rankin Road
Houston, TX 77073 / US
02 / CARIVEAU, Peter, Thomas
8833 Larston St.
Houston, TX 77055 / US
 [2015/15]
Former [2015/01]01 / MENG, Scott
1310 Rankin Road
Houston, TX 77073 / US
02 / CARIVEAU, Peter, Thomas
6311 Cobble Manor Lane
Spring, TX 77379 / US
Representative(s)Schlumberger Intellectual Property Department
Parkstraat 83
2514 JG Den Haag / NL
[N/P]
Former [2015/01]Ljungberg, Robert
Murgitroyd & Company
Scotland House
165-169 Scotland Street
Glasgow Strathclyde G5 8PL / GB
Application number, filing date13751460.021.02.2013
WO2013US27098
Priority number, dateUS201261601445P21.02.2012         Original published format: US 201261601445 P
[2015/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013126546
Date:29.08.2013
Language:EN
[2013/35]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2817485
Date:31.12.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.08.2013
[2015/01]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR29.08.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.04.2016
ClassificationInternational:E21B43/12, E21B4/02, C08L9/02, F04C2/107, F04C13/00
[2016/21]
Former International [2015/01]E21B43/12, E21B4/02
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/01]
TitleGerman:FASERVERSTÄRKTER ELASTOMERER STATOR[2015/01]
English:FIBER REINFORCED ELASTOMERIC STATOR[2015/01]
French:STATOR ÉLASTOMÈRE RENFORCÉ DE FIBRES[2015/01]
Entry into regional phase12.09.2014National basic fee paid 
12.09.2014Search fee paid 
12.09.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
12.09.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure12.09.2014Examination requested  [2015/01]
10.11.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.02.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
10.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
27.02.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
27.02.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
13.02.2019Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[A]EP1892416  (DYNA DRILL TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2009152009  (SLAY JEREMY BUC [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * claims 1,8,12 *
International search[X]US2010098569  (ROBISSON AGATHE [US], et al);
 [Y]US6417271  (NISHIHARA HAJIME [JP], et al);
 [A]US2003192184  (HACHE JEAN-MICHEL [US]);
 [A]US2006153724  (DELPASSAND MAJID S [US]);
 [A]US5759019  (WOOD STEVEN M [US], et al)