Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2817119

EP2817119 - COLLET ADAPTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  07.04.2017
Database last updated on 19.07.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip28.06.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): HU
published on 31.07.2019 [2019/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Anca Pty Ltd
25 Gatwick Road
Bayswater North
Victoria 3153 / AU
[2015/01]
Inventor(s)01 / MCCLUSKEY, Pat
c/o Anca Pty Ltd
25 Gatwick Road
Bayswater North
Victoria 3153 / AU
02 / SAVANUR, Sateesh
c/o Anca Pty Ltd
25 Gatwick Road
Bayswater North
Victoria 3153 / AU
 [2015/01]
Representative(s)dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB
Deichmannhaus am Dom
Bahnhofsvorplatz 1
50667 Köln / DE
[N/P]
Former [2016/22]dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB
Deichmannhaus am Dom
Bahnhofsvorplatz 1
50667 Köln / DE
Former [2015/01]Von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patentanwälten und Rechtsanwälten mbB
Deichmannhaus am Dom
Bahnhofsvorplatz 1
50667 Köln / DE
Application number, filing date13751517.720.02.2013
[2016/22]
WO2013AU00154
Priority number, dateAU2012090061620.02.2012         Original published format: AU 2012900616
[2015/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013123556
Date:29.08.2013
Language:EN
[2013/35]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2817119
Date:31.12.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.08.2013
[2015/01]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2817119
Date:01.06.2016
Language:EN
[2016/22]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:AU29.08.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.01.2015
ClassificationInternational:B23B31/20, B23Q3/00, B43K21/22
[2015/10]
Former International [2015/01]B23B31/20, B23Q3/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/01]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:SPANNZANGENADAPTER[2015/01]
English:COLLET ADAPTOR[2015/01]
French:ADAPTATEUR POUR PINCE DE SERRAGE[2015/01]
Entry into regional phase03.09.2014National basic fee paid 
03.09.2014Search fee paid 
03.09.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
03.09.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure06.08.2013Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: AU
03.09.2014Examination requested  [2015/01]
26.08.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
22.12.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.04.2016Fee for grant paid
16.04.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
16.04.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  22.12.2015
Opposition(s)02.03.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/19]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.02.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
24.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU20.02.2013
AL01.06.2016
AT01.06.2016
BE01.06.2016
CZ01.06.2016
DK01.06.2016
EE01.06.2016
ES01.06.2016
FI01.06.2016
HR01.06.2016
IT01.06.2016
LT01.06.2016
LV01.06.2016
MC01.06.2016
NL01.06.2016
PL01.06.2016
RO01.06.2016
RS01.06.2016
SE01.06.2016
SI01.06.2016
SK01.06.2016
SM01.06.2016
NO01.09.2016
GR02.09.2016
IS01.10.2016
PT03.10.2016
IE20.02.2017
LU20.02.2017
MT20.02.2017
[2019/31]
Former [2018/46]AL01.06.2016
AT01.06.2016
BE01.06.2016
CZ01.06.2016
DK01.06.2016
EE01.06.2016
ES01.06.2016
FI01.06.2016
HR01.06.2016
IT01.06.2016
LT01.06.2016
LV01.06.2016
MC01.06.2016
NL01.06.2016
PL01.06.2016
RO01.06.2016
RS01.06.2016
SE01.06.2016
SI01.06.2016
SK01.06.2016
SM01.06.2016
NO01.09.2016
GR02.09.2016
IS01.10.2016
PT03.10.2016
IE20.02.2017
LU20.02.2017
MT20.02.2017
Former [2018/43]AT01.06.2016
BE01.06.2016
CZ01.06.2016
DK01.06.2016
EE01.06.2016
ES01.06.2016
FI01.06.2016
HR01.06.2016
IT01.06.2016
LT01.06.2016
LV01.06.2016
MC01.06.2016
NL01.06.2016
PL01.06.2016
RO01.06.2016
RS01.06.2016
SE01.06.2016
SI01.06.2016
SK01.06.2016
SM01.06.2016
NO01.09.2016
GR02.09.2016
IS01.10.2016
PT03.10.2016
IE20.02.2017
LU20.02.2017
MT20.02.2017
Former [2018/13]AT01.06.2016
BE01.06.2016
CZ01.06.2016
DK01.06.2016
EE01.06.2016
ES01.06.2016
FI01.06.2016
HR01.06.2016
IT01.06.2016
LT01.06.2016
LV01.06.2016
MC01.06.2016
NL01.06.2016
PL01.06.2016
RO01.06.2016
RS01.06.2016
SE01.06.2016
SI01.06.2016
SK01.06.2016
SM01.06.2016
NO01.09.2016
GR02.09.2016
IS01.10.2016
PT03.10.2016
IE20.02.2017
LU20.02.2017
Former [2018/04]AT01.06.2016
BE01.06.2016
CZ01.06.2016
DK01.06.2016
EE01.06.2016
ES01.06.2016
FI01.06.2016
HR01.06.2016
IT01.06.2016
LT01.06.2016
LV01.06.2016
MC01.06.2016
NL01.06.2016
PL01.06.2016
RO01.06.2016
RS01.06.2016
SE01.06.2016
SI01.06.2016
SK01.06.2016
SM01.06.2016
NO01.09.2016
GR02.09.2016
IS01.10.2016
PT03.10.2016
LU20.02.2017
Former [2017/48]AT01.06.2016
BE01.06.2016
CZ01.06.2016
DK01.06.2016
EE01.06.2016
ES01.06.2016
FI01.06.2016
HR01.06.2016
IT01.06.2016
LT01.06.2016
LV01.06.2016
MC01.06.2016
NL01.06.2016
PL01.06.2016
RO01.06.2016
RS01.06.2016
SE01.06.2016
SI01.06.2016
SK01.06.2016
SM01.06.2016
NO01.09.2016
GR02.09.2016
IS01.10.2016
PT03.10.2016
Former [2017/37]AT01.06.2016
BE01.06.2016
CZ01.06.2016
DK01.06.2016
EE01.06.2016
ES01.06.2016
FI01.06.2016
HR01.06.2016
IT01.06.2016
LT01.06.2016
LV01.06.2016
NL01.06.2016
PL01.06.2016
RO01.06.2016
RS01.06.2016
SE01.06.2016
SI01.06.2016
SK01.06.2016
SM01.06.2016
NO01.09.2016
GR02.09.2016
IS01.10.2016
PT03.10.2016
Former [2017/11]AT01.06.2016
BE01.06.2016
CZ01.06.2016
EE01.06.2016
ES01.06.2016
FI01.06.2016
HR01.06.2016
IT01.06.2016
LT01.06.2016
LV01.06.2016
NL01.06.2016
PL01.06.2016
RO01.06.2016
RS01.06.2016
SE01.06.2016
SK01.06.2016
SM01.06.2016
NO01.09.2016
GR02.09.2016
IS01.10.2016
PT03.10.2016
Former [2017/10]BE01.06.2016
CZ01.06.2016
EE01.06.2016
ES01.06.2016
FI01.06.2016
HR01.06.2016
IT01.06.2016
LT01.06.2016
LV01.06.2016
NL01.06.2016
PL01.06.2016
RO01.06.2016
RS01.06.2016
SE01.06.2016
SK01.06.2016
NO01.09.2016
GR02.09.2016
IS01.10.2016
Former [2017/09]CZ01.06.2016
EE01.06.2016
ES01.06.2016
FI01.06.2016
HR01.06.2016
IT01.06.2016
LT01.06.2016
LV01.06.2016
NL01.06.2016
RO01.06.2016
RS01.06.2016
SE01.06.2016
NO01.09.2016
GR02.09.2016
Former [2016/52]ES01.06.2016
FI01.06.2016
HR01.06.2016
LT01.06.2016
LV01.06.2016
NL01.06.2016
RS01.06.2016
SE01.06.2016
NO01.09.2016
GR02.09.2016
Former [2016/51]ES01.06.2016
FI01.06.2016
HR01.06.2016
LT01.06.2016
LV01.06.2016
RS01.06.2016
NO01.09.2016
GR02.09.2016
Former [2016/50]ES01.06.2016
FI01.06.2016
HR01.06.2016
LT01.06.2016
LV01.06.2016
RS01.06.2016
NO01.09.2016
Former [2016/49]FI01.06.2016
LT01.06.2016
NO01.09.2016
Former [2016/46]LT01.06.2016
NO01.09.2016
Documents cited:Search[XAY]WO2004103619  (WESTWIND AIR BEARINGS LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1-5,7,9,10,14,15 * figure 1 * [A] 6,8 [Y] 13;
 [XA]US3643969  (FINLEY ROBERT L, et al) [X] 1-5,7,9,14,15 * figures 1,3 * [A] 6,8;
 [XA]EP0213075  (TORNOS SA FABRIQUE DE MACHINE [CH]) [X] 1-5,9,14 * figure 1 * [A] 15;
 [X]FR2042090  (PITTLER AG MASCHF) [X] 1-4,7,9-14 * figures 1-3 *;
 [XA]US3094102  (MARIA SCHWARZAUGL JOSEF) [X] 1-3,6-9,14 * column 2, line 28 - line 53; figure 1 * [A] 5;
 [X]EP2014396  (FISCHER AG PRAEZ SSPINDELN [CH]) [X] 1-3,7-9,14,15 * paragraphs [0067] , [0068]; figure 1 *;
 [YA]CH355671  (SOLER ALBERTO CHAVES [ES]) [Y] 13 * figure 2 * [A] 1,2,9,10,14,15
International search[X]JPH06218607  (OKUMA MACHINERY WORKS LTD);
 [X]GB1456611  (DECKEL AG FRIEDRICH);
 [X]US4396320  (BELLMANN BERNHARD G [DE], et al)