blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2817119 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2817119



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 157
05.04.2017 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
02.06.2016 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
06.05.2016 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
16.04.2016 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
16.04.2016 French translation of claims Search / examination 3
16.04.2016 German translation of the claims Search / examination 3
16.04.2016 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
22.12.2015 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
22.12.2015 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
22.12.2015 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
22.12.2015 Text intended for grant Search / examination 20
19.11.2015 Examination started Search / examination 1
22.10.2015 Statement of non-availability of priority search results Search / examination 1
04.09.2015 Invitation to file a copy of search results(priority) Search / examination 1
27.08.2015 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
27.08.2015 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
27.08.2015 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 9
26.08.2015 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
26.08.2015 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
26.08.2015 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 9
17.02.2015 Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
29.01.2015 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
29.01.2015 European search opinion Search / examination 4
29.01.2015 Supplementary European search report Search / examination 2
21.01.2015 Search started Search / examination 1
03.12.2014 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
24.09.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
24.09.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
03.09.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
03.09.2014 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
03.09.2014 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
26.08.2014 Annexes to the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 12
26.08.2014 Copy of the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 3
02.07.2014 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
01.10.2013 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 19
11.09.2013 Notification of election of EPO Search / examination 1
29.08.2013 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 3
29.08.2013 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 21