blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2817119 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

CN201380020086 EP13751517



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US9586268Global Dossier 07.03.2017B2
US2015014947 15.01.2015A1
Priority number Date
WO2013AU00154 20.02.2013
AU2012900616 20.02.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
KR20140125859Global Dossier 29.10.2014A
Priority number Date
WO2013AU00154 20.02.2013
AU2012900616 20.02.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP6178804BGlobal Dossier 09.08.2017B2
JP2015506853 05.03.2015A
Priority number Date
WO2013AU00154 20.02.2013
AU2012900616 20.02.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN104245195BGlobal Dossier 19.12.2017B
CN104245195 24.12.2014A
Priority number Date
WO2013AU00154 20.02.2013
AU2012900616 20.02.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2817119Global Dossier 01.06.2016B1
EP2817119 04.03.2015A4
EP2817119 31.12.2014A1
Priority number Date
WO2013AU00154 20.02.2013
AU2012900616 20.02.2012
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2013123556Global Dossier 29.08.2013A1
Priority number Date
AU2012900616 20.02.2012