Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2816905

EP2816905 - JAM AND JELLY MAKER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  30.09.2016
Database last updated on 26.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip30.09.2016Change: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit 
30.09.2016Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 02.11.2016  [2016/44]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Hearthmark, LLC
14611 W. Commerce Road
Daleville, IN 47334 / US
[2015/01]
Inventor(s)01 / HAGER, Scott
13840 Oak Haven Drive
McCordsville, IN 46055 / US
02 / KAYALAR, Gokce
Room 9d Block C Ocean City
Ian Tian Road
Houhai Street
Nanshan District
Shekou Shenzhen 518067 / CN
 [2015/01]
Representative(s)Vossius, Tilman
Barkhoff Reimann Vossius
Prinzregentenstrasse 74
81675 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2015/01]Vossius, Tilman
BARKHOFF - REIMANN - VOSSIUS Grosjeanstr. 2
81925 München / DE
Application number, filing date13751567.222.02.2013
WO2013US27368
Priority number, dateUS201261601955P22.02.2012         Original published format: US 201261601955 P
[2015/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013126734
Date:29.08.2013
Language:EN
[2013/35]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2816905
Date:31.12.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.08.2013
[2015/01]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR29.08.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP10.09.2015
ClassificationInternational:A23L1/06, A47J43/04
[2015/01]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/01]
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON MARMELADE ODER GELEE[2015/01]
English:JAM AND JELLY MAKER[2015/01]
French:DISPOSITIF DE FABRICATION DE CONFITURE ET DE GELÉE[2015/01]
Entry into regional phase11.08.2014National basic fee paid 
11.08.2014Search fee paid 
11.08.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
11.08.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedCommunication of intention to grant the patent
11.08.2014Examination requested  [2015/01]
09.04.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
12.04.2016Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2016/44]
13.05.2016Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2016/44]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.02.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
25.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[X]EP1969978  (SEB SA [FR]) [X] 1-15 * paragraphs [0004] , [0050] - [0052] - [0058] , [0059]; figure -; claim - *;
 [X]US2396924  (PAUL MONATH) [X] 1-15 * page 1, column l, lines 11-46; figure -; claim - *
International search[X]US6845707  (XU ZHAOXIA [US], et al);
 [A]WO2006107310  (ROTO COOKWARE LLC [US], et al);
 [A]US2008190301  (PENG ZHENG [US]);
 [A]US2004245238  (DE LONGHI GIUSEPPE [IT]);
 [A]US2008257168  (WOLFE AMY [US]);
 [A]US5228381  (VIRGILIO PALLOTTI [IT], et al)