Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2817973

EP2817973 - SCREEN MIRRORING METHOD AND APPARATUS THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  22.03.2019
Database last updated on 09.12.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  05.11.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  14.04.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip05.12.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): PL
published on 01.01.2020 [2020/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.
129, Samsung-ro
Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 443-742 / KR
[2015/01]
Inventor(s)01 / HAN, Se-Hee
317-2303 Jamsil Siyeong Parkrio APT.
Jamsil 4-dong
Songpa-gu
Seoul 138-932 / KR
02 / PARK, Ho-Yeon
107-1102 Woosung APT.
Yangjae 1-dong
Seocho-gu
Seoul 137-793 / KR
 [2015/01]
Representative(s)HGF Limited
Saviour House
9 St. Saviourgate
York YO1 8NQ / GB
[2019/17]
Former [2015/01]Jenkins, Richard Gavin
HGF Limited
Saviour House
9 St Saviourgate
York YO1 8NQ / GB
Application number, filing date13751634.019.02.2013
[2019/17]
WO2013KR01284
Priority number, dateKR2012001702120.02.2012         Original published format: KR 20120017021
[2015/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013125829
Date:29.08.2013
Language:EN
[2013/35]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2817973
Date:31.12.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.08.2013
[2015/01]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2817973
Date:24.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR29.08.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.09.2015
ClassificationInternational:H04N21/4402, H04L29/06
[2015/44]
Former International [2015/01]H04N21/4402
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/01]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:BILDSCHIRMSPIEGELUNGSVERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG DAFÜR[2015/01]
English:SCREEN MIRRORING METHOD AND APPARATUS THEREOF[2015/01]
French:PROCÉDÉ D'ÉCRITURE MIROIR-ÉCRAN ET APPAREIL ASSOCIÉ[2015/01]
Entry into regional phase04.09.2014National basic fee paid 
04.09.2014Search fee paid 
04.09.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
04.09.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure04.09.2014Examination requested  [2015/01]
25.04.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
12.04.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
17.08.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.11.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.03.2019Fee for grant paid
12.03.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
12.03.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)EP19170704.1  / EP3537722
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  12.04.2017
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
03.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
30.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
29.01.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
22.02.2019Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL24.04.2019
ES24.04.2019
FI24.04.2019
HR24.04.2019
LT24.04.2019
LV24.04.2019
PL24.04.2019
RS24.04.2019
SE24.04.2019
BG24.07.2019
NO24.07.2019
GR25.07.2019
PT24.08.2019
[2019/52]
Former [2019/51]AL24.04.2019
ES24.04.2019
FI24.04.2019
HR24.04.2019
LT24.04.2019
LV24.04.2019
RS24.04.2019
SE24.04.2019
BG24.07.2019
NO24.07.2019
GR25.07.2019
PT24.08.2019
Former [2019/50]AL24.04.2019
ES24.04.2019
FI24.04.2019
HR24.04.2019
LT24.04.2019
LV24.04.2019
RS24.04.2019
SE24.04.2019
NO24.07.2019
GR25.07.2019
PT24.08.2019
Former [2019/49]AL24.04.2019
ES24.04.2019
FI24.04.2019
HR24.04.2019
LT24.04.2019
SE24.04.2019
NO24.07.2019
PT24.08.2019
Former [2019/48]ES24.04.2019
FI24.04.2019
LT24.04.2019
SE24.04.2019
NO24.07.2019
PT24.08.2019
Former [2019/47]ES24.04.2019
FI24.04.2019
LT24.04.2019
NO24.07.2019
Documents cited:Search[XAI]US2012042102  (CHUNG JINYONG [KR] ET AL) [X] 1,7 * paragraphs [0006] - [0012] - [0049] , [0051] , [0060] , [0157] - [0165] - [0168] , [0174] - [0175]; figures 1,11,12A,12B * [A] 4,5 [I] 2,3,6,8;
 [A]US2009019492  (GRASSET JEAN-FRANCOIS BENJAMIN [FR]) [A] 1-8 * paragraphs [0008] - [0042] *;
 [A]US2011107388  (LEE JAE-MIN [KR] ET AL) [A] 1,4,5,7 * paragraphs [0009] - [0013] - [0067] - [0102] *;
 [A]  - "Wi-Fi Alliance Member Symposium", (20110401), URL: http://www.wi-fi.org/files/20110421_China_Symposia_full_merge.pdf, (20121203), XP055046396 [A] 1,7 * page 192 - page 323 *
International search[X]KR20090022613  (SK TELECOM CO LTD [KR]);
 [A]US2012042102  (CHUNG JINYONG [KR], et al);
 [A]JP2009021698  (TOSHIBA CORP);
 [A]WO2010037104  (MFG RESOURCES INTERNAT INC [US], et al);
 [A]US2007229518  (KII MANABU [JP], et al)
by applicantUS2012042102