Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2819470

EP2819470 - METHOD, APPARATUS, AND SYSTEM FOR PERFORMING UNSOLICITED LOCATION-BASED DOWNLOAD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  02.02.2018
Database last updated on 19.10.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  24.02.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  20.01.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip28.09.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MC
published on 31.10.2018  [2018/44]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
LG Electronics Inc.
20, Yeouido-dong
Yeongdeungpo-gu
Seoul 150-721 / KR
[2015/01]
Inventor(s)01 / LEE, Minsoo
LG Electronics Inc.
Convergence R&D Lab.
221 Yangjae-dong
Seocho-gu
Seoul 137-130 / KR
02 / KIM, Kyungho
LG Electronics Inc.
Convergence R&D Lab.
221 Yangjae-dong
Seocho-gu
Seoul 137-130 / KR
 [2015/01]
Representative(s)Frenkel, Matthias Alexander
Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff
Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Schweigerstrasse 2
81541 München / DE
[2017/13]
Former [2015/01]Frenkel, Matthias Alexander
Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff
Schweigerstrasse 2
81541 München / DE
Application number, filing date13751655.525.02.2013
[2017/13]
WO2013KR01481
Priority number, dateUS201261602598P24.02.2012         Original published format: US 201261602598 P
[2015/01]
Filing languageKO
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013125920
Date:29.08.2013
Language:KO
[2013/35]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2819470
Date:31.12.2014
Language:EN
[2015/01]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2819470
Date:29.03.2017
Language:EN
[2017/13]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR29.08.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.07.2015
ClassificationInternational:H04W64/00, H04W4/02, H04L29/08
[2015/34]
Former International [2015/01]H04W64/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/01]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN, VORRICHTUNG UND SYSTEM ZUR DURCHFÜHRUNG UNAUFGEFORDERTER ORTSABHÄNGIGER DOWNLOADS[2015/01]
English:METHOD, APPARATUS, AND SYSTEM FOR PERFORMING UNSOLICITED LOCATION-BASED DOWNLOAD[2015/01]
French:PROCÉDÉ, APPAREIL ET SYSTÈME POUR EFFECTUER UN TÉLÉCHARGEMENT NON SOLLICITÉ BASÉ SUR UN EMPLACEMENT[2015/01]
Entry into regional phase12.09.2014Translation filed 
12.09.2014National basic fee paid 
12.09.2014Search fee paid 
12.09.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
12.09.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure12.09.2014Examination requested  [2015/01]
02.12.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
05.04.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01)
06.05.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.09.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.01.2017Fee for grant paid
16.01.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
16.01.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  05.04.2016
Opposition(s)03.01.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/10]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.02.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
22.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
17.02.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT29.03.2017
CZ29.03.2017
DK29.03.2017
EE29.03.2017
ES29.03.2017
FI29.03.2017
HR29.03.2017
IT29.03.2017
LT29.03.2017
LV29.03.2017
MC29.03.2017
NL29.03.2017
PL29.03.2017
RO29.03.2017
RS29.03.2017
SE29.03.2017
SI29.03.2017
SK29.03.2017
SM29.03.2017
BG29.06.2017
NO29.06.2017
GR30.06.2017
IS29.07.2017
PT31.07.2017
[2018/44]
Former [2018/25]AT29.03.2017
CZ29.03.2017
DK29.03.2017
EE29.03.2017
ES29.03.2017
FI29.03.2017
HR29.03.2017
IT29.03.2017
LT29.03.2017
LV29.03.2017
NL29.03.2017
PL29.03.2017
RO29.03.2017
RS29.03.2017
SE29.03.2017
SI29.03.2017
SK29.03.2017
SM29.03.2017
BG29.06.2017
NO29.06.2017
GR30.06.2017
IS29.07.2017
PT31.07.2017
Former [2018/15]AT29.03.2017
CZ29.03.2017
DK29.03.2017
EE29.03.2017
ES29.03.2017
FI29.03.2017
HR29.03.2017
IT29.03.2017
LT29.03.2017
LV29.03.2017
NL29.03.2017
PL29.03.2017
RO29.03.2017
RS29.03.2017
SE29.03.2017
SK29.03.2017
SM29.03.2017
BG29.06.2017
NO29.06.2017
GR30.06.2017
IS29.07.2017
PT31.07.2017
Former [2018/09]AT29.03.2017
CZ29.03.2017
DK29.03.2017
EE29.03.2017
ES29.03.2017
FI29.03.2017
HR29.03.2017
LT29.03.2017
LV29.03.2017
NL29.03.2017
PL29.03.2017
RO29.03.2017
RS29.03.2017
SE29.03.2017
SK29.03.2017
SM29.03.2017
BG29.06.2017
NO29.06.2017
GR30.06.2017
IS29.07.2017
PT31.07.2017
Former [2017/51]AT29.03.2017
CZ29.03.2017
EE29.03.2017
ES29.03.2017
FI29.03.2017
HR29.03.2017
LT29.03.2017
LV29.03.2017
NL29.03.2017
PL29.03.2017
RO29.03.2017
RS29.03.2017
SE29.03.2017
SK29.03.2017
SM29.03.2017
BG29.06.2017
NO29.06.2017
GR30.06.2017
IS29.07.2017
PT31.07.2017
Former [2017/50]AT29.03.2017
CZ29.03.2017
EE29.03.2017
ES29.03.2017
FI29.03.2017
HR29.03.2017
LT29.03.2017
LV29.03.2017
NL29.03.2017
PL29.03.2017
RO29.03.2017
RS29.03.2017
SE29.03.2017
SK29.03.2017
BG29.06.2017
NO29.06.2017
GR30.06.2017
IS29.07.2017
Former [2017/49]AT29.03.2017
CZ29.03.2017
EE29.03.2017
ES29.03.2017
FI29.03.2017
HR29.03.2017
LT29.03.2017
LV29.03.2017
NL29.03.2017
RO29.03.2017
RS29.03.2017
SE29.03.2017
SK29.03.2017
BG29.06.2017
NO29.06.2017
GR30.06.2017
IS29.07.2017
Former [2017/48]CZ29.03.2017
FI29.03.2017
HR29.03.2017
LT29.03.2017
LV29.03.2017
NL29.03.2017
RS29.03.2017
SE29.03.2017
BG29.06.2017
NO29.06.2017
GR30.06.2017
Former [2017/41]FI29.03.2017
HR29.03.2017
LT29.03.2017
LV29.03.2017
NL29.03.2017
RS29.03.2017
SE29.03.2017
BG29.06.2017
NO29.06.2017
GR30.06.2017
Documents cited:Search[Y]US2009298513  (HAMPEL KARL GEORG [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * paragraph [0003] - paragraph [0016] * * paragraph [0038] - paragraph [0045] * * paragraph [0050] - paragraph [0063] * * paragraph [0066] - paragraph [0081] *;
 [A]US2007296574  (SMITH MICHAEL R [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0023] * * paragraph [0047] - paragraph [0060] * * paragraph [0067] - paragraph [0088] * * paragraph [0102] - paragraph [0113] *;
 [Y]US2010120450  (HERZ SCOTT [US]) [Y] 1-15 * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0042] * * paragraph [0057] - paragraph [0066] * * paragraph [0070] - paragraph [0077] * * paragraph [0087] - paragraph [0089] *
International search[Y]KR20090004444  (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]);
 [Y]KR100651912B  (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]);
 [A]KR20080110593  (MICROSOFT CORP [US]);
 [A]KR20080049291  (KT CORP [KR]);
 [A]KR20100121650  (MICROSOFT CORP [US])