Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2800312

EP2800312 - DATA TRANSMISSION METHOD, ACCESS POINT, RELAY NODE, AND DATA NODE FOR PACKET AGGREGATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  05.04.2019
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  19.11.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  24.02.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip05.04.2019(Expected) grantpublished on 08.05.2019  [2019/19]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd.
Huawei Administration Building
Bantian
Longgang District
Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN
[2019/19]
Former [2014/45]For all designated states
Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd.
Huawei Administration Building
Bantian, Longgang
Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN
Inventor(s)01 / WU, Tianyu
Huawei Administration Building
Bantian
Longgang District
Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN
02 / CHEN, Chen
Huawei Administration Building
Bantian
Longgang District
Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN
03 / DAI, Zhiwei
Huawei Administration Building
Bantian
Longgang District
Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN
04 / LI, Changle
Huawei Administration Building
Bantian
Longgang District
Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN
 [2019/19]
Former [2014/45]01 / WU, Tianyu
Huawei Administration Building
Bantian
Longgang
Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN
02 / CHEN, Chen
Huawei Administration Building
Bantian
Longgang
Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN
03 / DAI, Zhiwei
Huawei Administration Building
Bantian
Longgang
Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN
04 / LI, Changle
Huawei Administration Building
Bantian
Longgang
Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN
Representative(s)Gill Jennings & Every LLP
The Broadgate Tower
20 Primrose Street
London EC2A 2ES / GB
[2019/19]
Former [2014/45]Lord, Michael , et al
Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street
London EC2A 2ES / GB
Application number, filing date13751673.825.02.2013
[2019/19]
WO2013CN71812
Priority number, dateCN2012104342424.02.2012         Original published format: CN201210043424
[2014/45]
Filing languageZH
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013123901
Date:29.08.2013
Language:ZH
[2013/35]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2800312
Date:05.11.2014
Language:EN
[2014/45]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2800312
Date:08.05.2019
Language:EN
[2019/19]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CN29.08.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.12.2014
ClassificationInternational:H04L12/28, H04W40/12, H04W40/22, H04W28/02
[2018/49]
Former International [2014/45]H04L12/28
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/45]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:DATENÜBERTRAGUNGSVERFAHREN, ZUGANGSPUNKT, RELAISKNOTEN UND DATENKNOTEN ZUR PAKETAGGREGATION[2014/45]
English:DATA TRANSMISSION METHOD, ACCESS POINT, RELAY NODE, AND DATA NODE FOR PACKET AGGREGATION[2014/45]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE TRANSMISSION DE DONNÉES, POINT D'ACCÈS, NOEUD DE RELAIS ET NOEUD DE DONNÉES POUR UNE AGRÉGATION DE PAQUET[2018/50]
Former [2014/45]PROCÉDÉ DE TRANSMISSION DE DONNÉES, POINT D'ACCÈS, N UD DE RELAIS ET N UD DE DONNÉES POUR UNE AGRÉGATION DE PAQUETS
Entry into regional phase30.07.2014Translation filed 
30.07.2014National basic fee paid 
30.07.2014Search fee paid 
30.07.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
30.07.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure30.07.2014Examination requested  [2014/45]
23.02.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
24.02.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.06.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.09.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
01.12.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.03.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.06.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.09.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
24.10.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.11.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
28.03.2019Fee for grant paid
28.03.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
28.03.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  24.02.2017
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.02.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
29.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
28.02.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
15.02.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
28.02.2019Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[XA]WO2006120650  (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL]; PHILIPS CORP [US]; REUMERMAN HANS) [X] 1-4,9-20,25-32 * paragraph [0038] - paragraph [0039]; figure 1; claims 1-4 * [A] 5-8,21-24;
 [A]US2009285192  (SHIBA YOUICHIROU [JP] ET AL) [A] 1-32 * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0013] *;
 [X]WO2005112355  (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL]; OTAL BEGONYA [DE]; HABETHA JOERG) [X] 1-32 * claim 1 *
International search[X]CN101536433  (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORPORATION);
 [A]CN1898912  (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORPORATION);
 [A]CN1753381  (HUAWEI TECHNOLOGIES CO., LTD.);
 [A]US2011002337  (AKAHANE, SHINICHI ET AL.)
ExaminationUS2009086663
 WO2012148061