Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2798779

EP2798779 - TRANSFERRING OF COMMUNICATION EVENT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  15.02.2019
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  09.03.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  01.11.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip04.10.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MC
published on 06.11.2019 [2019/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Microsoft Technology Licensing, LLC
One Microsoft Way
Redmond, WA 98052 / US
[2015/20]
Former [2014/45]For all designated states
Microsoft Corporation
One Microsoft Way
Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US
Inventor(s)01 / ROSENBERG, Jonathan
c/o Microsoft Corporation
LCA - International Patents
One Microsoft Way
Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US
 [2014/45]
Representative(s)Driver, Virginia Rozanne
Page White & Farrer
Bedford House
John Street
London WC1N 2BF / GB
[2014/45]
Application number, filing date13751888.220.02.2013
[2018/15]
WO2013US26916
Priority number, dateUS20121340040320.02.2012         Original published format: US201213400403
[2014/45]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013126435
Date:29.08.2013
Language:EN
[2013/35]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2798779
Date:05.11.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.08.2013
[2014/45]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2798779
Date:11.04.2018
Language:EN
[2018/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR29.08.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.07.2015
ClassificationInternational:H04L12/16, G06F3/01, H04M1/00, H04N7/14, H04M1/725, H04M3/54, H04N21/442, // H04M1/253
[2017/41]
Former International [2015/33]H04L12/16, G06F3/01, H04M1/00, H04N7/14, H04M1/725, H04M3/54, // H04M1/253
Former International [2014/45]H04L12/16, G06F3/01
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/45]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:ÜBERTRAGUNG EINES KOMMUNIKATIONSEREIGNISSES[2014/45]
English:TRANSFERRING OF COMMUNICATION EVENT[2014/45]
French:TRANSFERT D'UN ÉVÈNEMENT DE COMMUNICATION[2014/45]
Entry into regional phase30.07.2014National basic fee paid 
30.07.2014Search fee paid 
30.07.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
30.07.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure30.07.2014Examination requested  [2014/45]
26.01.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
02.11.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
01.03.2018Fee for grant paid
01.03.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
01.03.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  02.11.2017
Opposition(s)14.01.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/12]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.02.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
10.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
10.02.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
14.02.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL11.04.2018
AT11.04.2018
CZ11.04.2018
DK11.04.2018
EE11.04.2018
ES11.04.2018
FI11.04.2018
HR11.04.2018
IT11.04.2018
LT11.04.2018
LV11.04.2018
MC11.04.2018
PL11.04.2018
RO11.04.2018
RS11.04.2018
SE11.04.2018
SI11.04.2018
SK11.04.2018
SM11.04.2018
BG11.07.2018
NO11.07.2018
GR12.07.2018
PT13.08.2018
[2019/45]
Former [2019/26]AL11.04.2018
AT11.04.2018
CZ11.04.2018
DK11.04.2018
EE11.04.2018
ES11.04.2018
FI11.04.2018
HR11.04.2018
IT11.04.2018
LT11.04.2018
LV11.04.2018
PL11.04.2018
RO11.04.2018
RS11.04.2018
SE11.04.2018
SI11.04.2018
SK11.04.2018
SM11.04.2018
BG11.07.2018
NO11.07.2018
GR12.07.2018
PT13.08.2018
Former [2019/11]AL11.04.2018
AT11.04.2018
CZ11.04.2018
DK11.04.2018
EE11.04.2018
ES11.04.2018
FI11.04.2018
HR11.04.2018
IT11.04.2018
LT11.04.2018
LV11.04.2018
PL11.04.2018
RO11.04.2018
RS11.04.2018
SE11.04.2018
SK11.04.2018
SM11.04.2018
BG11.07.2018
NO11.07.2018
GR12.07.2018
PT13.08.2018
Former [2019/10]AL11.04.2018
AT11.04.2018
CZ11.04.2018
DK11.04.2018
EE11.04.2018
ES11.04.2018
FI11.04.2018
HR11.04.2018
LT11.04.2018
LV11.04.2018
PL11.04.2018
RO11.04.2018
RS11.04.2018
SE11.04.2018
SK11.04.2018
BG11.07.2018
NO11.07.2018
GR12.07.2018
PT13.08.2018
Former [2019/09]AL11.04.2018
DK11.04.2018
EE11.04.2018
ES11.04.2018
FI11.04.2018
HR11.04.2018
LT11.04.2018
LV11.04.2018
PL11.04.2018
RS11.04.2018
SE11.04.2018
BG11.07.2018
NO11.07.2018
GR12.07.2018
PT13.08.2018
Former [2019/08]AL11.04.2018
DK11.04.2018
ES11.04.2018
FI11.04.2018
HR11.04.2018
LT11.04.2018
LV11.04.2018
PL11.04.2018
RS11.04.2018
SE11.04.2018
BG11.07.2018
NO11.07.2018
GR12.07.2018
PT13.08.2018
Former [2019/03]AL11.04.2018
ES11.04.2018
FI11.04.2018
HR11.04.2018
LT11.04.2018
LV11.04.2018
PL11.04.2018
RS11.04.2018
SE11.04.2018
BG11.07.2018
NO11.07.2018
GR12.07.2018
PT13.08.2018
Former [2018/52]AL11.04.2018
ES11.04.2018
FI11.04.2018
HR11.04.2018
LT11.04.2018
LV11.04.2018
PL11.04.2018
RS11.04.2018
SE11.04.2018
BG11.07.2018
NO11.07.2018
GR12.07.2018
Former [2018/51]AL11.04.2018
ES11.04.2018
FI11.04.2018
HR11.04.2018
LT11.04.2018
LV11.04.2018
PL11.04.2018
RS11.04.2018
SE11.04.2018
BG11.07.2018
NO11.07.2018
Former [2018/50]AL11.04.2018
ES11.04.2018
FI11.04.2018
HR11.04.2018
LT11.04.2018
PL11.04.2018
SE11.04.2018
BG11.07.2018
NO11.07.2018
Former [2018/49]AL11.04.2018
ES11.04.2018
FI11.04.2018
LT11.04.2018
PL11.04.2018
SE11.04.2018
BG11.07.2018
NO11.07.2018
Former [2018/47]AL11.04.2018
ES11.04.2018
FI11.04.2018
LT11.04.2018
NO11.07.2018
Former [2018/46]AL11.04.2018
LT11.04.2018
NO11.07.2018
Documents cited:Search[Y]US2011243141  (BLACKBURN HELEN [GB] ET AL) [Y] 1-10 * abstract * * paragraphs [0007] , [0013] - [0015] - [0040] , [0047] , [0060] , [0064] - [0080] - [0084] *;
 [Y]US2012005632  (BROYLES III PAUL J [US] ET AL) [Y] 1-10 * abstract * * paragraphs [0001] , [0011] - [0015] - [0020] - [0022] - [0035] - [0041] - [0057] - [0059] - [0066] , [0070] - [0072] *;
 [A]US2010159981  (CHIANG CHING-LIANG [TW] ET AL) [A] 1,7,10 * abstract * * paragraphs [0028] - [0037] *;
 [A]US2006291474  (OLLIS JOSEPH K [US] ET AL) [A] 1,7,10 * paragraphs [0041] - [0047]; figures 3,5 *
International search[Y]US2010272250  (MICHAEL SHEN-YUAN YAP ET AL.);
 [Y]US2011163944  (BRETT BILBREY ET AL.);
 [A]US2011110371  (JARED S. FRY);
 [A]US2011219419  (RICHARD REISMAN);
 [A]EP1526457  (SONY INTERNATIONAL (EUROPE) GMBH)
by applicantUS2011243141
 US2009136016