Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2819089

EP2819089 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR PROVIDING EDUCATION SERVICE BASED ON KNOWLEDGE UNIT, AND COMPUTER-READABLE RECORDING MEDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  17.11.2017
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip07.10.2019Change: Appeal number 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Knowre Korea Inc.
12F. 171 Saimdang-ro
Seocho-gu
Seoul 137-858 / KR
[2015/01]
Inventor(s)01 / KIM, Yong Jae
107-2503 35 Gomurae-ro
Seocho-gu
Seoul 137-761 / KR
02 / KIM, Seo Joon
D-205 79 Gukjegeumyung-ro
Yeongdeungpo-gu
Seoul 150-796 / KR
03 / SHIN, Jong Ho
59-16 Hyeonchung-ro 19-gil
Nam-gu
Daegu 705-809 / KR
04 / CHO, Seung Yun
104-1901 38-20 Yeonhui-ro
Seodaemun-gu
Seoul 120-733 / KR
 [2015/01]
Representative(s)Zardi, Marco
M. Zardi & Co. SA
Via Pioda 6
6900 Lugano / CH
[2015/01]
Application number, filing date13751928.620.02.2013
WO2013KR01349
Priority number, dateKR2012001674820.02.2012         Original published format: KR 20120016748
[2015/01]
Filing languageKO
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013125861
Date:29.08.2013
Language:KO
[2013/35]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2819089
Date:31.12.2014
Language:EN
[2015/01]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR29.08.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.08.2015
ClassificationInternational:G06Q50/20, G09B7/02, G09B7/04
[2015/39]
Former International [2015/01]G06Q50/20
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/01]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR BEREITSTELLUNG VON BILDUNGSDIENSTEN AUF BASIS EINER WISSENSEINHEIT UND COMPUTERLESBARES AUFZEICHNUNGSMEDIUM[2015/01]
English:METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR PROVIDING EDUCATION SERVICE BASED ON KNOWLEDGE UNIT, AND COMPUTER-READABLE RECORDING MEDIUM[2015/01]
French:PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME DE FOURNITURE D'UN SERVICE ÉDUCATIF SUR LA BASE D'UNE UNITÉ DE CONNAISSANCES, ET SUPPORT D'ENREGISTREMENT LISIBLE PAR ORDINATEUR[2015/01]
Entry into regional phase16.09.2014Translation filed 
16.09.2014National basic fee paid 
16.09.2014Search fee paid 
16.09.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
16.09.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure16.09.2014Examination requested  [2015/01]
02.03.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
21.11.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
15.05.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.07.2019Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 17.09.2019
17.07.2019Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
17.09.2019Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
Appeal following examination05.09.2019Appeal received No.  T2718/19
16.09.2019Statement of grounds filed
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  21.11.2017
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.02.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
08.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
10.02.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
16.01.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
18.02.2019Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[I]US2011151425  (SMITH CHARLES J [US], et al) [I] 1-16 * the whole document *;
 [I]US2010035225  (KERFOOT III BRANCH PRICE [US]) [I] 1-16 * the whole document *
International search[Y]KR20070078767  (KANG, MIM SOO);
 [Y]KR20100110518  (C&I CO. LTD);
 [Y]JP2005284122  (E-ZEN TECHNOLOGY CO., LTD.);
 [A]KR20050030387  (YI, MYUNG WON);
 [A]US2009111085  (RUDY, RAYMOND H. P. ET AL.)
by applicantKR20090036153