Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2819236

EP2819236 - BATTERY PACK TEMPERATURE CONTROL STRUCTURE FOR ELECTRIC VEHICLES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  07.09.2018
Database last updated on 18.05.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  29.09.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  12.07.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip15.02.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): BE
published on 20.03.2019  [2019/12]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NISSAN MOTOR CO., LTD.
2 Takara-cho
Kanagawa-ku
Yokohama-shi
Kanagawa 221-0023 / JP
[2017/32]
Former [2015/01]For all designated states
Nissan Motor Company, Limited
2 Takara-cho
Kanagawa-ku
Yokohama-shi
Kanagawa 221-0023 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / TANIGAKI, Tatsunori
c/o Nissan Motor Co., Ltd.
Intellectual Property Department
1-1, Morinosatoaoyama
Atsugi-shi Kanagawa 243-0123 / JP
02 / HATTA, Kentaro
c/o Nissan Motor Co., Ltd.
Intellectual Property Department
1-1, Morinosatoaoyama
Atsugi-shi Kanagawa 243-0123 / JP
03 / TSUJIMURA, Norihisa
c/o Nissan Motor Co., Ltd.
Intellectual Property Department
1-1, Morinosatoaoyama
Atsugi-shi Kanagawa 243-0123 / JP
04 / IWASA, Makoto
c/o Nissan Motor Co., Ltd.
Intellectual Property Department
1-1, Morinosatoaoyama
Atsugi-shi Kanagawa 243-0123 / JP
 [2015/01]
Representative(s)Hoefer & Partner Patentanwälte mbB
Pilgersheimer Straße 20
81543 München / DE
[2017/44]
Former [2015/01]Hoefer & Partner
Pilgersheimer Straße 20
81543 München / DE
Application number, filing date13751957.507.02.2013
[2017/44]
WO2013JP52792
Priority number, dateJP2012003412820.02.2012         Original published format: JP 2012034128
[2015/01]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013125354
Date:29.08.2013
Language:JA
[2013/35]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2819236
Date:31.12.2014
Language:EN
[2015/01]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2819236
Date:01.11.2017
Language:EN
[2017/44]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP29.08.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.12.2014
ClassificationInternational:H01M10/63, H01M10/617, B60L11/18, H01M2/10, H01M10/6566, H01M10/6563, H01M10/647, H01M10/625, H01M10/613
[2017/26]
Former International [2015/04]B60K1/04, H01M2/10, H01M10/615, H01M10/6565, H01M10/6566, B60L11/18, H01M10/60, H01M10/6563, H01M10/647, H01M10/625, H01M10/613
Former International [2015/01]H01M10/50, B60K1/04, H01M2/10
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/01]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:BATTERIEPACK-TEMPERATURREGELUNGSSTRUKTUR FÜR ELEKTROFAHRZEUGE[2015/01]
English:BATTERY PACK TEMPERATURE CONTROL STRUCTURE FOR ELECTRIC VEHICLES[2015/01]
French:STRUCTURE DE COMMANDE DE LA TEMPÉRATURE D'UNE BATTERIE POUR DES VÉHICULES ÉLECTRIQUES[2015/01]
Entry into regional phase11.07.2014Translation filed 
11.07.2014National basic fee paid 
11.07.2014Search fee paid 
11.07.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
11.07.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure11.07.2014Examination requested  [2015/01]
13.05.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
13.07.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.09.2017Fee for grant paid
20.09.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
20.09.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  13.07.2017
Opposition(s)02.08.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/41]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.02.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
29.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
28.02.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT01.11.2017
CY01.11.2017
CZ01.11.2017
DK01.11.2017
EE01.11.2017
ES01.11.2017
FI01.11.2017
HR01.11.2017
IT01.11.2017
LT01.11.2017
LV01.11.2017
MC01.11.2017
NL01.11.2017
PL01.11.2017
RO01.11.2017
RS01.11.2017
SE01.11.2017
SI01.11.2017
SK01.11.2017
SM01.11.2017
BG01.02.2018
NO01.02.2018
GR02.02.2018
IE07.02.2018
LU07.02.2018
BE28.02.2018
CH28.02.2018
LI28.02.2018
IS01.03.2018
[2019/12]
Former [2019/09]AT01.11.2017
CY01.11.2017
CZ01.11.2017
DK01.11.2017
EE01.11.2017
ES01.11.2017
FI01.11.2017
HR01.11.2017
IT01.11.2017
LT01.11.2017
LV01.11.2017
MC01.11.2017
NL01.11.2017
PL01.11.2017
RO01.11.2017
RS01.11.2017
SE01.11.2017
SI01.11.2017
SK01.11.2017
SM01.11.2017
BG01.02.2018
NO01.02.2018
GR02.02.2018
IE07.02.2018
LU07.02.2018
CH28.02.2018
LI28.02.2018
IS01.03.2018
Former [2018/52]AT01.11.2017
CY01.11.2017
CZ01.11.2017
DK01.11.2017
EE01.11.2017
ES01.11.2017
FI01.11.2017
HR01.11.2017
IT01.11.2017
LT01.11.2017
LV01.11.2017
MC01.11.2017
NL01.11.2017
PL01.11.2017
RO01.11.2017
RS01.11.2017
SE01.11.2017
SI01.11.2017
SK01.11.2017
SM01.11.2017
BG01.02.2018
NO01.02.2018
GR02.02.2018
LU07.02.2018
CH28.02.2018
LI28.02.2018
IS01.03.2018
Former [2018/44]AT01.11.2017
CY01.11.2017
CZ01.11.2017
DK01.11.2017
EE01.11.2017
ES01.11.2017
FI01.11.2017
HR01.11.2017
IT01.11.2017
LT01.11.2017
LV01.11.2017
MC01.11.2017
NL01.11.2017
PL01.11.2017
RO01.11.2017
RS01.11.2017
SE01.11.2017
SK01.11.2017
SM01.11.2017
BG01.02.2018
NO01.02.2018
GR02.02.2018
IS01.03.2018
Former [2018/40]AT01.11.2017
CY01.11.2017
CZ01.11.2017
DK01.11.2017
EE01.11.2017
ES01.11.2017
FI01.11.2017
HR01.11.2017
IT01.11.2017
LT01.11.2017
LV01.11.2017
NL01.11.2017
PL01.11.2017
RO01.11.2017
RS01.11.2017
SE01.11.2017
SK01.11.2017
SM01.11.2017
BG01.02.2018
NO01.02.2018
GR02.02.2018
IS01.03.2018
Former [2018/39]AT01.11.2017
CY01.11.2017
CZ01.11.2017
DK01.11.2017
EE01.11.2017
ES01.11.2017
FI01.11.2017
HR01.11.2017
IT01.11.2017
LT01.11.2017
LV01.11.2017
NL01.11.2017
PL01.11.2017
RS01.11.2017
SE01.11.2017
SK01.11.2017
SM01.11.2017
BG01.02.2018
NO01.02.2018
GR02.02.2018
IS01.03.2018
Former [2018/37]AT01.11.2017
CY01.11.2017
CZ01.11.2017
DK01.11.2017
EE01.11.2017
ES01.11.2017
FI01.11.2017
HR01.11.2017
LT01.11.2017
LV01.11.2017
NL01.11.2017
PL01.11.2017
RS01.11.2017
SE01.11.2017
SK01.11.2017
SM01.11.2017
BG01.02.2018
NO01.02.2018
GR02.02.2018
IS01.03.2018
Former [2018/35]AT01.11.2017
CY01.11.2017
CZ01.11.2017
DK01.11.2017
EE01.11.2017
ES01.11.2017
FI01.11.2017
HR01.11.2017
LT01.11.2017
LV01.11.2017
NL01.11.2017
RS01.11.2017
SE01.11.2017
SK01.11.2017
BG01.02.2018
NO01.02.2018
GR02.02.2018
IS01.03.2018
Former [2018/24]AT01.11.2017
ES01.11.2017
FI01.11.2017
HR01.11.2017
LT01.11.2017
LV01.11.2017
NL01.11.2017
RS01.11.2017
SE01.11.2017
BG01.02.2018
NO01.02.2018
GR02.02.2018
IS01.03.2018
Former [2018/22]ES01.11.2017
FI01.11.2017
LT01.11.2017
NL01.11.2017
NO01.02.2018
Documents cited:Search[XA]US6828755  (IVERSON MICHAEL E [US], et al) [X] 1 * column 2, line 65 - column 4, line 58 * [A] 2-4;
 [A]US2008050645  (KAI TSUYOSHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-4 * the whole document *;
 [A]JP2006240502  (NISSAN MOTOR) [A] 1-4 * the whole document *
International search[A]JPH09104239  (NISSAN MOTOR);
 [A]JP2002313300  (MITSUBISHI MATERIALS CORP);
 [A]JP2010231907  (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD)
by applicantJPH09104239