blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2819262 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2819262



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 126
04.02.2015 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
04.02.2015 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
04.02.2015 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
03.02.2015 Confirmation of withdrawal of application/closure of proceedings Search / examination 1
27.01.2015 Final instructions in case of withdrawal of application Search / examination 1
27.01.2015 Withdrawal of application Search / examination 1
26.01.2015 Withdrawal of application Search / examination 1
03.12.2014 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
17.11.2014 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
31.10.2014 Communication regarding possible amendment of the application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 3
29.10.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
29.10.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
29.10.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
09.09.2014 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 5
09.09.2014 Translation of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 6
03.09.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
03.09.2014 Abstract Search / examination 1
03.09.2014 Claims Search / examination 2
03.09.2014 Description Search / examination 17
03.09.2014 Drawings Search / examination 11
03.09.2014 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
03.09.2014 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
02.07.2014 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
01.10.2013 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 26
29.08.2013 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 1
29.08.2013 Copy of the translated international search report Search / examination 1
29.08.2013 International publication pamphlet Search / examination 30