blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2819262 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

CN201380009982 EP13752002



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2015014464Global Dossier 15.01.2015A1
Priority number Date
WO2013JP54153 20.02.2013
JP2012036635 22.02.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN104115362Global Dossier 22.10.2014A
Priority number Date
WO2013JP54153 20.02.2013
JP2012036635 22.02.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2819262Global Dossier 31.12.2014A1
Priority number Date
WO2013JP54153 20.02.2013
JP2012036635 22.02.2012
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2013125573Global Dossier 29.08.2013A1
Priority number Date
JP2012036635 22.02.2012
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
JP2013172618Global Dossier 02.09.2013A
Priority number Date
JP2012036635 22.02.2012