Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2819262

EP2819262 - CABLE HOUSING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  30.01.2015
Database last updated on 22.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip30.01.2015Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 04.03.2015  [2015/10]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Chuo Hatsujo Kabushiki Kaisha
68 Aza Kamishiota
Narumi-cho
Midori-ku
Nagoya-shi, Aichi 458-8505 / JP
[2015/01]
Inventor(s)01 / DOHARA, Hisashi
c/o CHUO HATSUJO KABUSHIKI KAISHA
68 Aza-Kamishiota
Narumi-cho
Midori-ku
Nagoya-shi Aichi 458-8505 / JP
02 / MIZUNO, Eiji
c/o CHUO HATSUJO KABUSHIKI KAISHA
68 Aza-Kamishiota
Narumi-cho
Midori-ku
Nagoya-shi Aichi 458-8505 / JP
03 / IWAMI, Kenji
c/o CHUO HATSUJO KABUSHIKI KAISHA
68 Aza-Kamishiota
Narumi-cho
Midori-ku
Nagoya-shi Aichi 458-8505 / JP
 [2015/01]
Representative(s)Kramer Barske Schmidtchen Patentanwälte PartG mbB
European Patent Attorneys
Landsberger Strasse 300
80687 München / DE
[2015/01]
Application number, filing date13752002.920.02.2013
WO2013JP54153
Priority number, dateJP2012003663522.02.2012         Original published format: JP 2012036635
[2015/01]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013125573
Date:29.08.2013
Language:JA
[2013/35]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2819262
Date:31.12.2014
Language:EN
[2015/01]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP29.08.2013
ClassificationInternational:H02J7/00, H02G11/02
[2015/01]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/01]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:KABELHÜLLENVORRICHTUNG[2015/01]
English:CABLE HOUSING DEVICE[2015/01]
French:DISPOSITIF DE LOGEMENT DE CÂBLE[2015/01]
Entry into regional phase03.09.2014Translation filed 
03.09.2014National basic fee paid 
03.09.2014Search fee paid 
03.09.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
03.09.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure03.09.2014Examination requested  [2015/01]
26.01.2015Application withdrawn by applicant  [2015/10]
Cited inInternational search[X]JPS5533346  (NISSAN MOTOR);
 [Y]JP2001035621  (HATAYA SEISAKUSHO KK)
by applicantJP2010115037