Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2816964

EP2816964 - HYDROGEL SYSTEM COMPRISING SPATIALLY SEPARATED BIOACTIVE POLYPEPTIDES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  07.04.2017
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  16.12.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip22.02.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Ben-Gurion University of The Negev Research and Development Authority
P.O. Box 653
84105 Beer Sheva / IL
[2015/01]
Inventor(s)01 / COHEN, Smadar
6 Bentoiz Street
8486619 Beer Sheva / IL
02 / RE'EM, Tali
22 Remez Street
6219205 Tel Aviv / IL
03 / RUVINOV, Emil
26 A/2 Yehuda Street
8902703 Arad / IL
 [2015/01]
Representative(s)Pearl Cohen Zedek Latzer Baratz UK LLP
The Gridiron Building
One Pancras Square
London N1C 4AG / GB
[N/P]
Former [2015/01]Cabinet Laurent & Charras
Le Contemporain
50 Chemin de la Bruyère
69574 Dardilly Cedex / FR
Application number, filing date13752115.921.02.2013
WO2013IL50161
Priority number, dateUS201261601220P21.02.2012         Original published format: US 201261601220 P
[2015/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013124855
Date:29.08.2013
Language:EN
[2013/35]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2816964
Date:31.12.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.08.2013
[2015/01]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:IL29.08.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP01.10.2015
ClassificationInternational:A61B17/56, A61K9/70, A61K47/36, A61K38/18
[2015/01]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/01]
TitleGerman:HYDROGELSYSTEM MIT RÄUMLICH GETRENNTEN BIOAKTIVEN POLYPEPTIDEN[2015/01]
English:HYDROGEL SYSTEM COMPRISING SPATIALLY SEPARATED BIOACTIVE POLYPEPTIDES[2015/01]
French:SYSTÈME HYDROGEL COMPRENANT DES POLYPEPTIDES BIOACTIFS SÉPARÉS DANS L'ESPACE[2015/01]
Entry into regional phase19.09.2014National basic fee paid 
19.09.2014Search fee paid 
19.09.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
19.09.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure19.09.2014Examination requested  [2015/01]
28.04.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
10.04.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
16.10.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  10.04.2017
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.02.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
07.04.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
27.02.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
14.02.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
19.02.2019Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
29.02.201604   M06   Fee paid on   07.04.2016
Documents cited:Search[Y]WO2007043050  (UNIV BEN GURION [IL]; COHEN SMADAR [IL]; FREEMAN INBAR [IL]) [Y] 1-15 * the whole document * * page 14; example -; claim - *;
 [Y]WO2008082766  (UNIV MICHIGAN [US]; WISCONSIN ALUMNI RES FOUND [US]; LIN CHIA-YING [US) [Y] 1-15 * the whole document * * paragraph [0047]; claim - *;
 [Y]  - DANIEL L. COHEN ET AL, "Direct Freeform Fabrication of Seeded Hydrogels in Arbitrary Geometries", TISSUE ENGINEERING, (20060501), vol. 12, no. 5, doi:10.1089/ten.2006.12.1325, ISSN 1076-3279, pages 1325 - 1335, XP055215331 [Y] 1-15 * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1089/ten.2006.12.1325
 [Y]  - KENNETH W. NG ET AL, "Zonal Chondrocytes Seeded in a Layered Agarose Hydrogel Create Engineered Cartilage with Depth-Dependent Cellular and Mechanical Inhomogeneity", TISSUE ENGINEERING PART A, (20090901), vol. 15, no. 9, doi:10.1089/ten.tea.2008.0391, ISSN 1937-3341, pages 2315 - 2324, XP055215440 [Y] 1-15 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1089/ten.tea.2008.0391
 [Y]  - DANIEL L. COHEN ET AL, "Direct Freeform Fabrication of Seeded Hydrogels in Arbitrary Geometries", TISSUE ENGINEERING, (20060501), vol. 12, no. 5, doi:10.1089/ten.2006.12.1325, ISSN 1076-3279, pages 1325 - 1335, XP055215331 [Y] 1-15 * the whole document * * pages 1325,26, paragraph Results *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1089/ten.2006.12.1325
 [Y]  - LINDA KOCK ET AL, "Tissue engineering of functional articular cartilage: the current status", CELL AND TISSUE RESEARCH, SPRINGER, BERLIN, DE, (20111027), vol. 347, no. 3, doi:10.1007/S00441-011-1243-1, ISSN 1432-0878, pages 613 - 627, XP035031348 [Y] 1-15 * the whole document * * pages 619-20 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s00441-011-1243-1
 [Y]  - TALI RE EM ET AL, "Chondrogenesis of hMSC in affinity-bound TGF-beta scaffolds", BIOMATERIALS, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS BV., BARKING, GB, vol. 33, no. 3, doi:10.1016/J.BIOMATERIALS.2011.10.007, ISSN 0142-9612, (20111004), pages 751 - 761, (20111006), XP028112147 [Y] 1-15 * the whole document * * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.biomaterials.2011.10.007
 [Y]  - JABBARI E, "Engineering bone formation with peptidomimetic hybrid biomaterials", PROCEEDINGS OF THE 31ST ANNUAL INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE OF THE IEEE ENGINEERING IN MEDICINE AND BIOLOGY SOCIETY: ENGINEERING THE FUTURE OF BIOMEDICINE, EMBC 2009, IEEE, (20090903), doi:10.1109/IEMBS.2009.5332681, ISBN 978-1-4244-3296-7, pages 1172 - 1175, XP031881228 [Y] 1-15 * the whole document * * abstract * * pages 1173-74 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/IEMBS.2009.5332681
 [T]  - TALI RE'EM ET AL, "Simultaneous regeneration of articular cartilage and subchondral bone induced by spatially presented TGF-beta and BMP-4 in a bilayer affinity binding system", ACTA BIOMATERIALIA, (20120901), vol. 8, no. 9, doi:10.1016/j.actbio.2012.05.014, ISSN 1742-7061, pages 3283 - 3293, XP055082018 [T] 1-15 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.actbio.2012.05.014
International search[XP]WO2012113812  (INSTITUT NATIONAL DE LA SANTE ET DE LA RECHERCHE MEDICALE (INSERM), ;);
 [Y]WO2007043050  (BEN-GURION UNIVERSITY OF THE NEGEV RESEARCH AND DEVELOPMENT AUTHORITY,);
 [Y]WO2008082766  (THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF MICHIGAN, ; WISCONSIN ALUMNI RESEARCH)
 [XP]  - RE'EM, TALI ET AL., "Simultaneous regeneration of articular cartilage and subchondral bone induced by spatially presented TGF-beta and BMP-4 in a bilayer affinity binding system.", ACTA BIOMATERIALIA, vol. 8, no. 9, (201209), pages 3283 - 3293, URL: http://www.sciencedirect.com/science/article/pii/S1742706112002188, (20120930), XP055082018

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.actbio.2012.05.014
 [Y]  - ELISSEEFF, JENNIFER., "Regenerating organized tissues and understanding cell-cell interactions.", FASEB JOURNAL, (20041231), vol. 18, no. 4-5, page ABST. 310.2., XP008174306
 [Y]  - TALI RE'EM ET AL., "Chondrogenesis of hMSC in affmity-bound TGF-beta scaffolds.", BIOMATERIALS, vol. 33, no. 3, (20120103), pages 751 - 761, URL: http://www.sciencedirect.com/science/article/pii/S014296121101194X, (20120103), XP028112147

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.biomaterials.2011.10.007
 [Y]  - JABBARI, ESMAIEL., "Engineering bone formation with peptidomimetic hybrid biomaterials.", CONFERENCE PROCEEDINGS: IEEE ENGINEERING IN MEDICINE AND BIOLOGY SOCIETY. 31 ST ANNUAL INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE OF THE IEE EMBS, vol. 2009, (20090902), pages 1172 - 1175., URL: https://www2.lirmm.fr/lirmm/interne/BIBLI/ CDROM/ROB/2009/EMB_2009/PDFs/Papers/03071370.pdt., (20091231), XP031881228

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/IEMBS.2009.5332681